judyrecords
600 million+
United States Court Cases

Nevada Supreme/Appellate Court Record

WALKER, JR. (JOHNNY) VS. STATE

Case Information: 36252
Short Caption:WALKER, JR. (JOHNNY) VS. STATECourt:Supreme Court
Lower Court Case(s):Clark Co. - Eighth Judicial District - C149242BClassification:Criminal Appeal - Life - Direct
Disqualifications:Case Status:Remittitur Issued/Case Closed
Replacement:Panel Assigned: Panel
To SP/Judge:SP Status:
Oral Argument:06/04/2002 at 10:00 AMOral Argument Location:Carson City
Submission Date:06/04/2002How Submitted:After Oral Argument

+ Party Information

Docket Entries
DateTypeDescriptionPending?Document
06/09/2000Filing Fee Filing Fee Waived.
06/09/2000Notice of Appeal DocumentsFiled Certified Copy of Notice of Appeal. Appeal docketed in the Supreme Court this day. (Docketing statement mailed to counsel for appellant). 00-09796
06/15/2000Docketing StatementFiled Docketing Statement. 00-10178
06/20/2000Transcript RequestFiled Request for Transcript of Proceedings. Transcripts requested: 11/2/98, 5/14/99, 5/17/99, 2/22/00-3/9/00 and 4/12/00. To Court Reporters: Maureen Schorn, Dina Dalton and Joey D'Amato. 00-10544
06/26/2000TranscriptFiled Transcript. Proceedings: 11/02/98; 02/22/00; 02/23/00; 03/07/00; 03/08/00; 03/09/00; and 04/12/00; Court Reporter: Maureen Schorn. 00-10861
07/27/2000TranscriptFiled Transcript. Proceedings: 2/24/00; 2/28/00; 2/29/00; 3/1/00; 3/2/00; 3/3/00. Court Reporter: Joseph D'Amato. 00-13073
08/01/2000Transcript RequestFiled Request for Transcript of Proceedings. Amended Request. Transcripts requested: 11/2/98; 5/14/98; trial commencing 2/22/00 and ending 3/9/00; and 4/12/00. To Court Reporters: Maureen Schorn, Joe D'Amato, and Dina Dalton. 00-13259
08/10/2000Transcript RequestFiled Request for Transcript of Proceedings. Second Amended Request.m Transcripts requested: 11/2/98; trial commencing 2/22/00 and ending 3/9/00; and 4/12/00. To Court Reporters: Maureen Schorn, Joe D'Amato, and Dina Dalton. 00-13948
09/22/2000TranscriptFiled Transcript. Proceedings: March 6, 2000. Court Reporter: Dina Dee Dalton. 00-16817
10/03/2000MotionFiled Motion to Extend Time. (58 day extension) 00-17532
10/06/2000Order/Clerk'sFiled Clerk's Order Granting Motion. The motion filed October 3, 2000, is granted. Appellant's opening brief and appendix shall be served and filed on or before December 6, 2000. 00-17713
10/10/2000Order/ProceduralFiled Order. To date, all the transcripts requested by appellant have been filed in this court. We deem all necessay transcripts to be filed in this court, unless notified by appellant, in writing, within 10 days from the date of this order. 00-17877
12/07/2000MotionFiled Motion to Extend Time. 00-21434
12/11/2000Order/ProceduralFiled Order Granting Motion. Appellant shall have to and including January 22, 2001, to file and serve the opening brief and appendix. No further extensions of time shall be permitted in the absence of extreme and unforeseeable circumstances. 00-21657
01/24/2001MotionFiled Motion to Extend Time. 01-01595
01/29/2001Order/ProceduralFiled Order Granting Motion. The motion filed January 24, 2001, is granted. Appellant shall have to and including March 7, 2001, to file and serve the opening brief and appendix. We admonish appellant's counsel, however, that the court disapproves of repeated requests for lengthy extension of time to brief appeals in criminal cases. Consequently, no further extension of time shall be permitted in the absence of extreme and unforeseeable circumstances. 01-01838
05/02/2001Order/ProceduralFiled Order. To date, appellant has failed to file the opening brief and appendix. Appellant shall, within 10 days of the date of this order, file and serve the opening brief and appendix. Failure to comply timely with this order may result in the imposition of sanctions. 01-07356
05/16/2001MotionFiled Motion to Extend Time. Application for Four Day Extension of Time. 01-08157
05/18/2001Order/ProceduralFiled Order Granting Motion. Appellant shall have to and including May 18, 2001, to file and serve the opening brief and appendix. We admonish counsel, however, that the court disapproves of repeated requests for extensions of time to brief appeals in criminal cases. We caution counsel that failure to demonstrate extreme and unforeseeable circumstances for additional requests for extension of time may result in the denial of the motion and the imposition of sanctions. 01-08338
05/22/2001BriefFiled Opening Brief. Mailed on: Express-No postmark. 01-08563
05/22/2001AppendixFiled Appendix to Opening Brief. Vols. 1 through 6. 01-08564
05/24/2001MotionFiled Stipulation and Order. Brief due: July 18, 2001. 01-08739
07/20/2001MotionFiled Motion and Order/Excess Pages. Granted: 49 pages. 01-12349
07/20/2001BriefFiled Answering Brief. Mailed on: Express-No postmark. 01-12374
08/16/2001MotionFiled Stipulation and Order. Brief due: September 17, 2001. 01-13959
09/12/2001MotionFiled Motion to Extend Time. 01-15399
09/21/2001Order/ProceduralFiled Order Granting Motion. filed September 12, 2001. Appellant shall have to and including October 1, 2001, to file and serve the reply brief. No further extensions of time shall be permitted in the absence of extreme and unforeseeable circumstances. 01-15935
10/02/2001BriefFiled Reply Brief. Mailed on: Express-No postmark. 01-16597
02/25/2002Notice/OutgoingIssued Notice Scheduling Oral Argument. Oral Argument is scheduled for 30 minutes on April 8, 2002, at 10:30 a.m. (NNP02-MS/RR/NB)
03/19/2002MotionFiled Motion. 02-04924
04/01/2002Order/ProceduralFiled Order Granting Motion. We grant respondent's unopposed motion to continue the oral argument of this matter. We vacate the oral argument scheduled for April 8, 2002, at 10:30 a.m. and direct the clerk of this court to schedule this appeal for oral argument on the June calendar. 02-05690
04/23/2002Notice/OutgoingIssued Notice Scheduling Oral Argument. Oral Argument is scheduled for 30 minutes on June 4, 2002, at 9:00 a.m. (NNP02-MS/RR/NB)
05/17/2002Notice/OutgoingIssued Notice Rescheduling Oral Argument. Oral Argument is rescheduled for 30 minutes in Carson City on June 4, 2002, at 10:00 a.m. (NNP02-MS/RR/NB)
05/20/2002Notice/OutgoingIssued Oral Argument Reminder Notice.
06/04/2002Case Status Update Submitted for Decision. Before the Northern Nevada Panel. NNP02-MS/RR/NB.
09/10/2002Order/DispositionalFiled Order of Affirmance. "ORDER the judgment of conviction AFFIRMED." Shearing, J. Becker, J., concurring. Rose, J., dissenting. NNP02-MS/RR/NB 02-15670
09/30/2002Post-Judgment PetitionFiled Petition for Rehearing. Mailed on: Express Mail. 02-16817
10/08/2002Post-Judgment OrderFiled Order/Rehearing Denied. "Rehearing denied." NNP02-MS/RR/NB 02-17429
11/08/2002RemittiturIssued Remittitur. 02-19272
11/08/2002Case Status Update Remittitur Issued/Case Closed.
12/20/2002RemittiturFiled Remittitur. Received by County Clerk on November 12, 2002. 02-19272