judyrecords
600 million+
United States Court Cases

Wyoming Supreme/Appellate Court Record

JAMES E. CORNELIUS v. POWDER RIVER ENERGY CORPORATION, INC., a Wyoming corporation, acting through their agents, officers, employees and representatives

Case Heading (06-186)
Case Number:06-186Case Docketed On:08/15/2006
Status:Closed
Original Court:Sixth Judicial District Campbell CountyCase Type:Direct Appeal - Civil - Labor and Employment (Title 27)
Short Title:JAMES E. CORNELIUS v. POWDER RIVER ENERGY CORPORATION, INC., a Wyoming corporation, acting through their agents, officers, employees and representatives
Full Title:JAMES E. CORNELIUS, Appellant (Plaintiff), v. POWDER RIVER ENERGY CORPORATION, INC., a Wyoming corporation, acting through their agents, officers, employees and representatives, Appellee (Defendant).

- Party Information
RoleParty NameAttorney(s)
AppellantJames E. CorneliusC. John Cotton
Kenneth E. Barker
AppelleePowder River Energy Corporation, Inc.Bruce A. Salzburg

- Case Decision Information
Issues:
Opinion Number:2007 WY 30
Citation:

Docketing Filter View
Display:

Docket Information
Filing DateDocument DescriptionDocket Entry TypeDocket Entry SubtypeStatus
08/15/2006Event - Docketed and indexedEventDocketed and indexedFinal
08/15/2006Notice-Incoming - Record completion notice from district courtNotice-IncomingRecord completion notice from district courtFinal
08/15/2006Fees - Docket fee receivedFeesDocket fee receivedFinal
08/15/2006Notice-Outgoing - Docketing letterNotice-OutgoingDocketing letterFinal
10/02/2006Brief - AppellantBriefAppellantFinal
10/20/2006Brief - Appellee; received copy of designation of record on appealBriefAppelleeFinal
11/06/2006Brief - Appellant replyBriefAppellant replyFinal
11/06/2006Notice-Outgoing - Request for transmitted record on appealNotice-OutgoingRequest for transmitted record on appealFinal
11/06/2006Order - Oral argument scheduledOrderOral argument scheduledFinal
11/09/2006Record - Record returned to district court, record inadvertently sent without being place in final, designated form.RecordRecord returned to district courtFinal
11/15/2006Record - Transmitted record on appeal from District Court Clerk, three volumes. Volumes I & II, Original Papers; Volume III, TranscriptsRecordTransmitted record on appealFinal
11/15/2006Notice-Outgoing - Record filedNotice-OutgoingRecord filedFinal
12/13/2006Event - Oral argument presented before full court (C. John Cotton and Kenneth Barker for appellant, argument by Messrs. Cotton and Barker; Bruce A. Salzburg for appellee) and taken under advisementEventOral argument presentedFinal
12/13/2006Notice-Internal - Oral argument noticeNotice-InternalOral argument noticeFinal
02/21/2007Opinion - Opinion and journal order, Chief Justice Voigt writing for the Court.OpinionOpinion and journal orderFinal
03/02/2007Petition - RehearingPetitionRehearingFinal
03/02/2007Brief - Other - in support of petition for rehearingBriefOtherFinal
03/20/2007Order - Petition for rehearing - denyOrderPetition for rehearing - denyFinal
03/20/2007Notice-Outgoing - Record return letterNotice-OutgoingRecord return letterFinal
03/20/2007Notice-Outgoing - MandateNotice-OutgoingMandateFinal
03/20/2007Event - Case closedEventCase closedFinal