judyrecords
600 million+
United States Court Cases

District Of Columbia Court Of Appeals Record

KATHERINE FOSS MCCLINTIC V. HOWARD MCCLINTIC

Case Information: 10-FM-0933
Short Caption:KATHERINE FOSS MCCLINTIC V. HOWARD MCCLINTICClassification:Appeals - Family - Domestic Relations
Superior Court or Agency Case Number:DRB2910-07Filed Date:07/23/2010

Opening Event Date:07/23/2010Case Status:Decided/Dismissed
Record Completed:10/01/2010Post-Decision Matter Pending:
Briefs Completed:04/13/2011
Argued/Submitted:12/01/2011
Disposition:Next Scheduled Action:
Mandate Issued:04/13/2012
Costs Waived

Party Information
Appellate RoleParty NameIFPAttorney(s)Arguing AttorneyE-Filer
AppellantKatherine F. Mcclintic N
Christopher R. PudelskiYN
AppelleeHoward Mcclintic Y
Mark S. Carlin NN
Anne M. Jackson YN

Events
Event DateStatusDescriptionResult
07/23/2010NOTICE OF APPEAL
08/24/2010 On consideration of the notice of appeal filed in this case on June 23, 2010, it is ORDERED that appellant shall, within 20 days from the date of this order, complete and file with this court a single copy of the attached statement regarding transcript. Where transcript(s) necessary for this appeal have been ordered and completed for non-appeal purposes, appellant must advise the Court Reporting Division to forward said transcript(s) for inclusion in the record on appeal. If partial transcripts are being ordered, appellant must file a statement of issues to be raised on appeal with this court within 10 days from the date of this order. See D.C. App. R. 10 (b)(3)(A). It is FURTHER ORDERED appellant's failure to respond to any order of this court, including this order, shall subject this appeal to dismissal without further notice for lack of prosecution. See D.C. App. R. 13(a). (JAC)
09/27/2010RECEIVED - aplt's motion for leave to file statement regarding transcript ***waiting on SRT. Pleadings mailed separtely
10/01/2010SUPPLEMENTAL RECORD - #1 (42 pgs/tape) 10/8/08 proc.
10/01/2010SUPPLEMENTAL RECORD - #2 (73 pgs/tape) 3/2/09 proc.
10/01/2010SUPPLEMENTAL RECORD - #3 (150 pgs/tape) 3/3/09 proc.
10/01/2010SUPPLEMENTAL RECORD - #4 (17 pgs/tape) 3/5/09 proc.
10/01/2010SUPPLEMENTAL RECORD - #5 (115 pgs/tape) 3/6/09 proc.
10/01/2010SUPPLEMENTAL RECORD - #6 (27 pgs/tape) 3/18/09 proc.
10/01/2010SUPPLEMENTAL RECORD - #7 (28 pgs/tape) 5/29/09 proc.
10/01/2010SUPPLEMENTAL RECORD - #8 (22 pgs/tape) 7/24/09 proc.
10/01/2010RECORD COMPLETED
10/14/2010 It appearing that the complete record on appeal has been filed with this court, it is ORDERED that appellant's brief and the appendix including the documents required by D.C. App. R. 30 (a)(1), shall be filed within 40 days from the date of this order, and appellee's brief shall be filed within 30 days thereafter. See D.C. App. R. 31. (JAC)
10/19/2010RECORD INDEX
11/08/2010APPEARANCE- of Christopher Pudelski on behalf of aplt
11/08/2010APPELLANT'S MOTION TO EXTEND TIME TO FILE BRIEF no oppo to 1/14/11
11/08/2010APPEARANCE of Christopher Pudelski as retained counsel for aplt.
12/02/2010 On consideration of appellant's motion for an extension of time within which to file the brief, to which no opposition has been filed, it is ORDERED that the motion is granted and appellant's brief and appendix shall be filed on or before March 11, 2011. (JAC)
12/15/2010SUPPLEMENTAL RECORD - #9 (133 pgs/tape) 3/5/09 proc. w/cd
12/17/2010APPEARANCE of Anne Marie Jackson as counsel for aple.
02/16/2011APPELLANT'S BRIEF
02/16/2011APPENDIX (volume I - II)
02/16/2011APPELLEE'S MOTION TO EXTEND TIME TO FILE BRIEF no oppo to 4/13/11
02/18/2011 On consideration of appellee's motion for an extension of time within which to file the brief, to which no opposition has been filed, it is ORDERED that the motion is granted and appellee's brief shall be filed on or before April 13, 2011. (JAC)
04/13/2011APPELLEE'S BRIEF
04/13/2011BRIEFS COMPLETED
04/26/2011APPELLANT'S REPLY BRIEF
04/28/2011FiledFinal Screening - Regular
06/21/2011 It appearing that this appeal is likely to be calendared for argument during the month(s) of Sept 2011 through Nov 2011, it is ORDERED that counsel shall advise this court in writing by July 15, 2011, of specific dates du ring that period when they are unavailable so that the court can attempt to avoid such dates in scheduling argument. (Please see the attached instruction sheet.) (aj) Julio Castillo Clerk
07/18/2011FiledLetter From Counsel/Party Re Future Calendaring (Appellee)
11/03/2011FiledACTION - Calendar notice sent
11/16/2011FiledLetter From Counsel/Party Re Future Calendaring (Appellant)
12/01/2011FiledArgued before Judges Glickman, Oberly, Nebeker
03/22/2012FiledReversed (OPINION) (Glickman and Oberly, Associate Judges, and Nebeker, Senior Judge.)
04/04/2012FiledMotion For Costs And/Or Attorney Fees (Appellant)Granted
04/05/2012FiledTMC//MOTION FOR FEES
04/13/2012FiledMandate
04/26/2012FiledORDER GRANTING APPELLANT'S MOTION FOR COSTS to the EXTENT that COSTS are AWARDED in the AMOUNT OF $2,515.07