judyrecords
600 million+
United States Court Cases

Nevada Supreme/Appellate Court Record

HANSSON VS. SERVICE MANAGEMENT SYSTEMS

Case Information: 38141
Short Caption:HANSSON VS. SERVICE MANAGEMENT SYSTEMSCourt:Supreme Court
Lower Court Case(s):Clark Co. - Eighth Judicial District - A397045Classification:Civil Appeal - General - Other
Disqualifications:MaupinCase Status:Remittitur Issued/Case Closed
Replacement:Panel Assigned: Panel
To SP/Judge:07/19/2001 / Richitt, E.SP Status:Completed
Oral Argument:Oral Argument Location:
Submission Date:07/08/2002How Submitted:On Briefs

+ Party Information

Docket Entries
DateTypeDescriptionPending?Document
07/09/2001OtherDisqualification of Justice Maupin. Law firm of Thorndal Armstrong Delk Balkenbush & Eisinger.
07/09/2001Filing FeeReceived Filing Fee Paid on Filing. $200.00 from Hong & Hong--check no. 3426.
07/09/2001Notice of Appeal DocumentsFiled Certified Copy of Notice of Appeal/Settlement. Notice re: settlement conference program/suspension of rules mailed to all counsel. (Docketing statement mailed to counsel for appellant.) 01-11453
07/12/2001Notice of Appeal DocumentsFiled Notice of Entry of Judgment or Order. Filed in district court on: July 9, 2001. 01-11852
07/19/2001Settlement NoticeIssued Notice: Assignment to Settlement Program. Settlement Judge: E. Paul Richitt, Jr. (Briefing and preparation of transcripts suspended pending further order of this court.)
09/05/2001Order/ProceduralFiled Order. To date, appellant has failed to file the docketing statement. Appellant shall, within 10 days of the date of this order, file and serve the docketing statement. Failure to file a complete and accurate docketing statement in a timely manner may result in the imposition of sanctions. (Docketing statement mailed to counsel for appellant.) 01-14937
09/11/2001Settlement Program ReportFiled Interim Settlement Program Report. The parties were unable to agree to a settlement of this matter. 01-15297
09/17/2001Docketing StatementFiled Docketing Statement. 01-15633
09/24/2001Settlement Order/ProceduralFiled Order: No Settlement/Briefing Reinstated. The parties were unable to agree to a settlement of this matter. This court shall conduct a preliminary jurisdictional review of this appeal. Appellant: 15 days to comply with NRAP 9(a); 120 days to file and serve opening brief and appendix. Briefing shall proceed in accordance with NRAP 31(a)(1). 01-16055
10/10/2001Transcript RequestFiled Request for Transcript of Proceedings. Transcripts requested: May 16, 2001 and May 17, 2001. To Court Reporter: Paula Walsh. 01-17099
10/24/2001TranscriptFiled Transcript. Proceedings: May 16, 2001. Court Reporter: Liz Garcia. 01-17935
01/22/2002BriefFiled Opening Brief. Mailed on: 1/18/02. 02-01447
01/22/2002AppendixFiled Joint Appendix. 02-01448
02/20/2002BriefFiled Answering Brief. Mailed on: Fed Ex 02/19/02. Signed by: David P. Lane. 02-03197
04/01/2002Case Status Update Briefing Completed. No reply brief filed.
07/08/2002Order/ProceduralFiled Order/Submit on Briefs. Cause appearing, oral argument will not be scheduled and this appeal shall stand submitted for decision to the Northern Nevada Panel as of the date of this order on the briefs filed herein. 02-11554
07/08/2002Case Status Update Submitted for Decision.
09/10/2002Order/DispositionalFiled Order of Affirmance. "ORDER the judgment of the district court AFFIRMED." NNP02-MS/RR/NB 02-15629
10/08/2002RemittiturIssued Remittitur. 02-15824
10/08/2002Case Status Update Remittitur Issued/Case Closed.
10/21/2002RemittiturFiled Remittitur. Received by County Clerk on October 10, 2002. 02-15824