judyrecords
600 million+
United States Court Cases

Wyoming Supreme/Appellate Court Record

SHANNON and VINCENT WILD v. KARENA D. ADRIAN

Case Heading (06-183)
Case Number:06-183Case Docketed On:08/11/2006
Status:Closed
Original Court:First Judicial District Laramie CountyCase Type:Direct Appeal - Civil - Guardian and Ward (Title 3)
Short Title:SHANNON and VINCENT WILD v. KARENA D. ADRIAN
Full Title:SHANNON and VINCENT WILD, Appellants (Petitioners), v. KARENA D. ADRIAN, Appellee (Defendant).

- Party Information
RoleParty NameAttorney(s)
AppellantShannon WildSean W. Scoggin
AppellantVincent WildSean W. Scoggin
AppelleeKarena AdrianRaymond D. Macchia
Juliana Hernandez

- Case Decision Information
Issues:
Opinion Number:2007 WY 61
Citation:

Docketing Filter View
Display:

Docket Information
Filing DateDocument DescriptionDocket Entry TypeDocket Entry SubtypeStatus
08/11/2006Event - Docketed and indexedEventDocketed and indexedFinal
08/11/2006Notice-Incoming - Record completion notice from district courtNotice-IncomingRecord completion notice from district courtFinal
08/11/2006Fees - Docket fee receivedFeesDocket fee receivedFinal
08/11/2006Notice-Outgoing - Docketing letterNotice-OutgoingDocketing letterFinal
09/21/2006Motion - Extension of time - brief of appellant (missing from Clerk's file)MotionExtension of time - briefFinal
09/22/2006Order - Grant - extension of timeOrderGrant - extension of timeFinal
10/10/2006Brief - AppellantBriefAppellantFinal
10/17/2006Motion - Dismiss - involuntary as mootMotionDismiss - involuntaryFinal
10/17/2006Memorandum - In support of motion to dismissMemorandumIn support of motionFinal
10/17/2006Motion - Extension of time - brief of appelleeMotionExtension of time - briefFinal
10/20/2006Order - Grant - extension of time (Given 30 days from the date of the order)OrderGrant - extension of timeFinal
11/03/2006Response/Objection - Motion to dismissResponse/ObjectionMotionFinal
11/03/2006Memorandum - Other in support of appellant's resistance to motion to dismissMemorandumOtherFinal
11/07/2006Order - Denying motion to dismiss appealOrderDenyFinal
12/06/2006Brief - AppelleeBriefAppelleeFinal
12/26/2006Order - Assigning to expedited docketOrderAssigning to brief only docketFinal
12/26/2006Notice-Outgoing - Request for transmitted record on appealNotice-OutgoingRequest for transmitted record on appealFinal
01/08/2007Record - Transmitted record on appeal from District Court Clerk, Volume I, Original PapersRecordTransmitted record on appealFinal
01/08/2007Notice-Outgoing - Transmitted record on appeal filedNotice-OutgoingTransmitted record on appeal filedFinal
04/13/2007Opinion - Opinion and journal order affirming, Justice Kite writing for the CourtOpinionOpinion and journal orderFinal
05/01/2007Notice-Outgoing - Record return letterNotice-OutgoingRecord return letterFinal
05/01/2007Notice-Outgoing - MandateNotice-OutgoingMandateFinal
05/01/2007Event - Case closedEventCase closedFinal