Case: 05-17-00398-CV
05-17-00398-CV
04/20/2017
Damages
Vanessa Swarovski
Randy Enger, Individually, and d/b/a Signature Motorcars
No
West Publishing
Appellate Briefs
Date | Event Type | Description | Document | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
07/05/2017 | Brief filed - oral argument not requested | Appellant |
|
Case Events
Date | Event Type | Disposition | Document | ||||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
05/30/2018 | Mandate issued |
| |||||||
05/07/2018 | Sent to publisher | | |||||||
03/16/2018 | Memorandum opinion issued | Reversed & Rendered |
| ||||||
03/16/2018 | Retention time case file will be retained | Destroy | | ||||||
02/22/2018 | Submitted | | |||||||
01/11/2018 | Set for submission on briefs |
| |||||||
08/04/2017 | Case ready to be set | | |||||||
08/04/2017 | Appellees brief due | | |||||||
07/05/2017 | Brief filed - oral argument not requested |
| |||||||
07/05/2017 | Appellants brief due | | |||||||
06/05/2017 | Electronic Reporter/Recorders Record Filed |
| |||||||
06/05/2017 | Electronic Clerks Record Filed |
| |||||||
06/05/2017 | Record due | | |||||||
06/02/2017 | No payment arrangements made with trial court clerk for record |
| |||||||
06/02/2017 | Clerks notice to court regarding status of record |
| |||||||
04/20/2017 | Fee paid |
| |||||||
04/20/2017 | Docketing statement filed |
| |||||||
04/20/2017 | Notice of appeal filed in court of appeals |
| |||||||
04/19/2017 | Notice of appeal filed in trial court | | |||||||
04/06/2017 | Judgment signed by trial court judge | |
Calendars
Set Date | Calendar Type | Reason Set |
---|---|---|
03/16/2024 | Retention | Date civil case will be destroyed (6 yrs after mandate) |
05/30/2018 | Case Stored | Case stored |
Parties
Party | PartyType | Representative |
---|---|---|
Swarovski, Vanessa | Appellant | C. Gregory Shamoun Kenneth J. Lambert Brandy N. Hoge |
Enger, Randy | Appellee | Randy Enger |
Trial Court Information
County Court at Law No. 1
Dallas
Honorable D'Metria Benson
CC-13-07017-A
Cathye Moreno