Case: 04-10-00548-CR
04-10-00548-CR
07/27/2010
Aggravated Kidnapping
Kirk Anthony Gaither
The State of Texas
No
Appellate Briefs
Date | Event Type | Description | Document |
---|---|---|---|
05/23/2011 | Brief filed - oral argument requested | State | |
04/12/2011 | Brief filed - oral argument requested | Appellant | |
Case Events
Date | Event Type | Disposition | Document | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|
11/09/2011 | Mandate acknowledged by trial court clerk | | |||
11/08/2011 | Mandate issued | | |||
09/07/2011 | Memorandum opinion issued | Affirmed |
| ||
09/07/2011 | Submitted | | |||
08/04/2011 | Set for submission on briefs - oral argument denied | Motion or Writ Denied | | ||
06/15/2011 | Order entered | | |||
06/15/2011 | Motion for extension of time to file reply brief disposed | Motion or Writ Granted | | ||
06/06/2011 | Motion for extension of time to file reply brief filed | | |||
05/23/2011 | Case ready to be set | | |||
05/23/2011 | Brief filed - oral argument requested | | |||
05/12/2011 | Motion for extension of time to file brief disposed | Motion or Writ Granted | | ||
05/12/2011 | Motion for extension of time to file brief filed | | |||
04/12/2011 | Brief filed - oral argument requested | | |||
03/02/2011 | Order entered | | |||
03/02/2011 | Order entered | | |||
03/02/2011 | Order entered | | |||
03/02/2011 | Motion to withdraw attorney disposed | Filing is Moot | | ||
03/02/2011 | Motion disposed | Motion or Writ Granted | | ||
03/02/2011 | Motion for extension of time to file brief disposed | Motion or Writ Granted | | ||
02/24/2011 | Motion filed | | |||
02/23/2011 | Motion for extension of time to file brief filed | | |||
02/23/2011 | Appearance of counsel | | |||
02/17/2011 | Motion to withdraw attorney filed | | |||
01/21/2011 | Order entered | | |||
01/21/2011 | Motion for extension of time to file brief disposed | Motion or Writ Granted | | ||
01/20/2011 | Motion for extension of time to file brief filed | | |||
01/10/2011 | Notice of late brief | | |||
11/30/2010 | Reporters record filed | | |||
11/17/2010 | Order entered | | |||
11/17/2010 | Extension of time to file reporters record disposed | Motion or Writ Granted | | ||
11/15/2010 | Extension of time to file reporters record filed | | |||
10/15/2010 | Internal memo | | |||
10/14/2010 | Order entered | | |||
10/14/2010 | Extension of time to file reporters record disposed | Motion or Writ Granted | | ||
10/07/2010 | Extension of time to file reporters record filed | | |||
09/16/2010 | Prescreened | | |||
09/15/2010 | Clerks record filed | Abated | | ||
09/15/2010 | Extension of time to file reporters record disposed | Filing is Noted by Court | | ||
09/14/2010 | Extension of time to file reporters record filed | | |||
09/14/2010 | Letter filed | | |||
07/29/2010 | Letter filed | | |||
07/28/2010 | Court reporters information sheet sent | | |||
07/27/2010 | Notice of appeal filed in court of appeals | | |||
07/26/2010 | Notice of appeal filed in trial court | | |||
07/09/2010 | Sentence imposed in the trial court | |
Calendars
Set Date | Calendar Type | Reason Set |
---|---|---|
11/08/2011 | Case Stored | Permanent retention required in criminal case |
11/08/2011 | Case Stored | Case stored |
Parties
Party | PartyType | Representative |
---|---|---|
Gaither, Kirk | Criminal - Appellant | Kirk Gaither Brandon Hudson Graham Baker |
The State of Texas | Criminal - State of Texas | Jay Brandon |
Trial Court Information
186th Judicial District Court
Bexar
Honorable Maria Teresa Herr
2008CR8848A
25 years