judyrecords
600 million+
United States Court Cases

Nevada Supreme/Appellate Court Record

LUNDY VS. MALINOWKI

Case Information: 36256
Short Caption:LUNDY VS. MALINOWKICourt:Supreme Court
Lower Court Case(s):Clark Co. - Eighth Judicial District - A407026Classification:Civil Appeal - General - Other
Disqualifications:Case Status:Remittitur Issued/Case Closed
Replacement:Panel Assigned: Panel
To SP/Judge:06/15/2000 / Holland Johnson, SusanSP Status:Completed
Oral Argument:Oral Argument Location:
Submission Date:How Submitted:

+ Party Information

Docket Entries
DateTypeDescriptionPending?Document
06/09/2000Filing FeeReceived Filing Fee Paid on Filing. $200.00 from Allstate (Lundy)-check no. 73563729.
06/09/2000Notice of Appeal DocumentsFiled Certified Copy of Notice of Appeal. Appeal docketed in the Supreme Court this day. 00-09811
06/15/2000Settlement NoticeIssued Notice: Assignment to Settlement Program. Settlement Judge: Susan Holland Johnson. (Briefing and preparation of transcripts and docketing statement suspended pending further order of this court.)
11/03/2000Settlement Program ReportFiled Interim Settlement Program Report. The settlement conference is continued to the following date: November 22, 2000. 00-19321
11/27/2000Settlement Program ReportFiled Interim Settlement Program Report. The parties were unable to agree to a settlement of this matter. 00-20636
11/27/2000Notice/OutgoingIssued Notice to File Docketing Statement. (Docketing statement mailed to counsel for appellant.) Due Date: 15 days
12/07/2000Settlement Order/ProceduralFiled Order: No Settlement/Briefing Reinstated. The parties were unable to agree to a settlement of this appeal. Upon the filing of the docketing statement, this court shall conduct a preliminary jurisdictional review of this appeal. Appellant: 15 days to comply with NRAP 9(a); 120 days to file and serve opening brief and appendix. Briefing shall proceed in accordance with NRAP 31(a)(1). 00-21344
12/07/2000MotionFiled Motion to Dismiss Appeal. Motion to Dismiss and for Attorney's Fees and Costs. 00-21402
12/15/2000MotionFiled Response to Motion. with Errata (six exhibits to opposition received separately). 00-21936
03/29/2001Order/ProceduralFiled Order. To date, appellant has failed to file the docketing statement. Appellant shall have 10 days from the date of this order to file the required document. Failure to comply timely with this order may result in the immediate dismissal of this appeal as abandoned. On December 7, 2000, respondent filed a motion to dismiss this appeal. On December 15, 2000, appellant filed a response to respondent's motion. The briefing schedule and time deadlines for requeting and preparing transcripts shall be stayed pending the resolution of respondent's motion to dismiss. 01-05455
04/06/2001MotionFiled Response to Order to Show Cause. Response to Order Regarding Docketing Statement. 01-05938
05/25/2001Order/DispositionalFiled Order Dismissing Appeal. We grant respondent's moiton, and " . . . we dismiss this appeal." We conclude that costs and attorney fees are not warranted under NRAP 38. We deny respondent's request. fn3[On March 29, 2001, we ordered appellant to file the docketing statement within ten days. Rather than filing the docketing statement, appellant's counsel filed a response. We admonish appellant's counsel for disregarding our directive to file the docketing statement, and we caution counsel that future conduct in disregard of this court's orders may result in the imposition of sanctions.] NNP01A-MS/DA/RR 01-08797
06/20/2001RemittiturIssued Remittitur. 01-08976
06/20/2001Case Status Update Remittitur Issued/Case Closed.
07/05/2001RemittiturFiled Remittitur. Received by County Clerk on June 25, 2001. 01-08976