judyrecords
search tips
630 million+
United States Court Cases

Wyoming Supreme/Appellate Court Record

ROBERT HUGH MYERS v. THE STATE OF WYOMING

Case Heading (06-191)
Case Number:06-191Case Docketed On:08/23/2006
Status:Closed
Original Court:Eighth Judicial District Converse CountyCase Type:Direct Appeal - Criminal - Offenses Against the Person 6-2-101 - 6-2-509
Short Title:ROBERT HUGH MYERS v. THE STATE OF WYOMING
Full Title:ROBERT HUGH MYERS, Appellant (Defendant), v. THE STATE OF WYOMING, Appellee (Plaintiff).

- Party Information
RoleParty NameAttorney(s)
AppellantRobert Hugh MyersKenneth M. Koski
Donna D. Domonkos
AppelleeThe State of WyomingPatrick J. Crank
Paul S. Rehurek
D. Michael Pauling

- Case Decision Information
Issues:
Opinion Number:
Citation:

Docketing Filter View
Display:

Docket Information
Filing DateDocument DescriptionDocket Entry TypeDocket Entry SubtypeStatus
08/23/2006Event - Docketed and indexedEventDocketed and indexedFinal
08/23/2006Notice-Incoming - Record completion notice from district courtNotice-IncomingRecord completion notice from district courtFinal
08/23/2006Notice-Outgoing - Docketing letterNotice-OutgoingDocketing letterFinal
10/06/2006Motion - Extension of time - brief of appellantMotionExtension of time - briefFinal
10/10/2006Order - Grant - extension of timeOrderGrant - extension of timeFinal
11/21/2006Motion - Extension of time - brief of appellantMotionExtension of time - briefFinal
11/22/2006Order - Grant - extension of timeOrderGrant - extension of timeFinal
01/08/2007Motion - Dismiss - voluntary with waiver (faxed)MotionDismiss - voluntary with waiverFinal
01/11/2007Notice-Incoming - Waiver of appeal (original)Notice-IncomingWaiver of appealFinal
01/11/2007Order - Dismiss - voluntary or stipulatedOrderDismiss - voluntary or stipulatedFinal
01/11/2007Event - Case closedEventCase closedFinal