judyrecords
search tips
630 million+
United States Court Cases

District Of Columbia Court Of Appeals Record

FRANSISCO VALERIO V. UNITED STATES

Case Information: 10-CF-0945
Short Caption:FRANSISCO VALERIO V. UNITED STATESClassification:Appeals - Criminal Felony - Sexual Abuse
Superior Court or Agency Case Number:CF1-24874-09Filed Date:07/26/2010

Opening Event Date:07/26/2010Case Status:Decided/Dismissed
Record Completed:Post-Decision Matter Pending:
Briefs Completed:02/10/2012
Argued/Submitted:05/31/2012
Disposition:Next Scheduled Action:
Mandate Issued:10/22/2012

Party Information
Appellate RoleParty NameIFPAttorney(s)Arguing AttorneyE-Filer
AppelleeUnited StatesN
Elizabeth TrosmanNY
Roy W. McLeese, IIINN
Mark A. AzizYN

Events
Event DateStatusDescriptionResult
07/26/2010NOTICE OF APPEAL
08/11/2010 On consideration of the notice of appeal and it appearing that appellant has been found eligible for court appointed counsel, it is ORDERED that James W. Klein, Esquire, is hereby appointed to represent appellant in this appeal. It is FURTHER ORDERED that counsel for appellant shall immediately take the necessary steps to review the trial court record and to ensure that the transcripts necessary to the appeal have been ordered and shall, within 30 days from the date of this order complete and file with this court a single copy of the statement regarding transcript available for completion online. Where transcript(s) necessary for this appeal have been ordered and completed for non-appeal purposes, appellant must advise the Court Reporting and Recording Division to forward said transcript(s) for inclusion in the record on appeal. (JAC)
08/19/2010STATEMENT REGARDING TRANSCRIPT(S) (RT ordered/needed (pii))
10/07/2010LETTER from Associate Judge Ronna Lee Beck, reffering letter from appellant to this court regarding appointment of new counsel.
10/07/2010RECEIVED a copy of a letter to Judge Beck requesting a new counsel be appointed.
10/08/2010SUPPLEMENTAL RECORD - #1 (208 pgs/Richer) 3/2/10 proc.
10/08/2010SUPPLEMENTAL RECORD - #2 (209-259 pgs/Richer) 3/3/10 proc.
10/08/2010SUPPLEMENTAL RECORD - #3 (260-406 pgs/Richer) 3/4/10 proc.
10/08/2010SUPPLEMENTAL RECORD - #4 (407-598 pgs/Richer) 3/5/10 proc.
10/08/2010SUPPLEMENTAL RECORD - #5 (121 pgs/Armstrong) 3/8/10 proc.
10/08/2010SUPPLEMENTAL RECORD - #6 (11 pgs/Armstrong) 3/9/10 proc.
10/08/2010SUPPLEMENTAL RECORD - #7 (19 pgs/tape) 7/21/10 proc. cd attached
10/12/2010LETTER referring to counsel for appellant the Oct. 7 pro se letter from appellant requesting new counsel. (JAC)
10/12/2010RECORD INDEX
10/12/2010RECORD COPIES
10/18/2010COUNSEL'S MOTION TO WITHDRAW FOR BUSINESS REASONS Granted
10/19/2010SUPPLEMENTAL RECORD - #8 (4 pgs/tape) 3/8/10 proc. w/cd
11/01/2010FiledORDERED that the motion of counsel for appellant is granted and the appointment of James W. Klein, Esquire, is hereby vacated, and Stephen Riddell, Esquire, is appointed to represent appellant herein. James W. Klein, Esquire, shall transmit all documents pertaining to this appeal to newly-appointed counsel forthwith. F/O that appellant's brief and the limited appendix including the documents required by D.C. App. R. 30 (f), shall be filed within 90 dyas fromt he date of this order, and appellee's brief shall be filed within 30 days thereafter. See D.C. App. R. 31. (ETW)
01/28/2011APPELLANT'S MOTION TO EXTEND TIME TO FILE BRIEF to 3/17/11. no oppo
02/03/2011 On consideration of appellant's motion for an extension of time within which to file the brief, to which no opposition has been filed, it is ORDERED that the motion is granted, and appellant's brief and the limited appendix shall be filed on or before March 17, 2011. (JAC)
02/14/2011RECEIVED from appellant w/court appointed counsel a courtsey copy of the letter sent to counsel requesting case status . . .
03/16/2011APPELLANT'S MOTION TO EXTEND TIME TO FILE BRIEF to 5/2/11. no oppo
03/23/2011 On consideration of appellant's unopposed motion for extension of time within which to file the brief, it is ORDERED that the motion is granted and appellant's brief and the limited appendix shall be filed on or before May 2, 2011. Any further requests for extensions of time will be looked upon with disfavor and granted only upon a showing of good cause. (Castillo)
04/28/2011APPELLANT'S MOTION TO EXTEND TIME TO FILE BRIEF no oppo 6/30/11
05/06/2011 On consideration of appellant's unopposed motion for an extension of time within which to file the brief, it is ORDERED that the motion is granted and appellant's brief and the limited appendix shall be filed on or before June 30, 2011. No further re quests for extensions of time will be granted absent a showing of good cause.(ETW)
06/28/2011APPELLANT'S MOTION TO EXTEND TIME TO FILE BRIEF no oppo to 8/2/11
07/15/2011FiledGRANT - Order Granting MOET (Appellant) to 8/2/11
08/02/2011FiledMotion For Extension Of Time to File Brief (Appellant)
08/09/2011FiledGRANT - Order Granting appellant's motion for extension to 9/2/11.
09/02/2011FiledMotion For Extension Of Time to File Appendix, Brief until November 1, 2011 (Appellant)
09/13/2011FiledGRANT - Order Granting appellant's motion for extension of time to 11/1/11.
10/31/2011FiledMotion For Extension Of Time to File Appendix, Brief - until December 31, 2011 (Appellant)
11/10/2011FiledGRANT - Order Granting appellant's motion to the extent that the brief and limited appendix due 12/1/11.
11/30/2011FiledMotion For Extension Of Time to File Appendix, Brief (Appellant)Granted
12/05/2011FiledMotion To Supplement The Record (Appellant)Granted
12/09/2011FiledMotion to take judicial notice of the attached. (Appellant)Granted
12/09/2011FiledMotion For Leave to File Appendix, Brief (Appellant)Granted
01/10/2012FiledGRANT - Order Granting Appellant's motion to supplement the record, and appellant's motion for an extension of time, and Appellant's motion for leave to file the lodged brief and limited appendix.
01/10/2012FiledBrief (Appellant)
01/10/2012FiledAppendix (Appellant)
01/13/2012FiledMotion For Extension Of Time to File Brief (Appellee)Granted
01/24/2012FiledGRANT - Order Granting Appellee's motion for an extension of time within which to file the brief to 2/13/12.
02/06/2012FiledSupplemental Record specify - #9 (government's exhibit 40)
02/10/2012FiledBrief (Appellee)
02/10/2012FiledBriefing Completed
03/05/2012FiledACTION - Ready for Calendaring - Summary
03/29/2012FiledACTION - Calendar notice sent
05/31/2012FiledSubmitted to Glickman, Oberly, Pryor
09/28/2012FiledAffirmed (MOJ) (Glickman and Oberly, Associate Judges, and Pryor, Senior Judge.)
10/22/2012FiledMandate
10/26/2012LodgedQualls Letter Filed (Appellant)