judyrecords
600 million+
United States Court Cases

Nevada Supreme/Appellate Court Record

LOS PRADOS COMMUNITY ASSN VS. U.S. HOME CORP.

Case Information: 36255
Short Caption:LOS PRADOS COMMUNITY ASSN VS. U.S. HOME CORP.Court:Supreme Court
Lower Court Case(s):Clark Co. - Eighth Judicial District - A408718
Clark Co. - Eighth Judicial District - A407509
Classification:Civil Appeal - General - Other
Disqualifications:Case Status:Remittitur Issued/Case Closed
Replacement:Panel Assigned: Panel
To SP/Judge:06/15/2000 / Mendoza, JohnSP Status:Completed
Oral Argument:Oral Argument Location:
Submission Date:How Submitted:

+ Party Information

Docket Entries
DateTypeDescriptionPending?Document
06/09/2000Filing FeeReceived Filing Fee Paid on Filing. $200.00 from Burdman & Benson, LLP--check no. 9025.
06/09/2000Notice of Appeal DocumentsFiled Certified Copy of Notice of Appeal. Appeal docketed in the Supreme Court this day. 00-09816
06/15/2000Settlement NoticeIssued Notice: Assignment to Settlement Program. Settlement Judge: John F. Mendoza. (Briefing and preparation of transcripts and docketing statement suspended pending further order of this court.)
07/05/2000Filing FeeReceived Filing Fee Paid on Filing. $200.00 on cross-appeal from Perry & Spann--check no. 15433.
07/05/2000Notice of Appeal DocumentsFiled Certified Copy of Notice of Cross-Appeal. 00-11375
07/10/2000Notice/Outgoing Letter.
07/27/2000Settlement Program ReportFiled Interim Settlement Program Report. The settlement conference is continued to the following date: August 4, 2000. 00-13037
08/10/2000Settlement Program ReportFiled Interim Settlement Program Report. The settlement conference is continued to the following date: August 29, 2000. 00-13919
10/10/2000Settlement Program ReportFiled Interim Settlement Program Report. The parties were unable to agree to a settlement of this matter. 00-17915
10/10/2000Notice/OutgoingIssued Notice to File Docketing Statement. (Docketing statements mailed to counsel for appellant/cross-respondent and respondent/cross-appellant.) Due Date: 15 days
10/19/2000Settlement Order/ProceduralFiled Order: No Settlement/Briefing Reinstated. The parties were unable to agree to a settlement of this appeal. Upon the filing of the docketing statements, this court shall conduct a preliminary jurisdictional review of this appeal and cross-appeal. Appellant/cross-respondent and respondents/cross-appellants: 15 days to comply with NRAP 9(a). Appellant/cross-respondent: 120 days to file and serve opening brief and appendix. Briefing shall proceed in accordance with NRAP 31(a)(1). 00-18537
10/23/2000Docketing StatementFiled Docketing Statement. Respondent/Cross-Appellant. 00-18713
10/26/2000Docketing StatementFiled Docketing Statement. Appellant/Cross-Respondent. 00-18918
10/30/2000Transcript RequestFiled Certificate of No Transcript Request. Respondent/Cross-Appellant. 00-19039
10/30/2000Transcript RequestFiled Certificate of No Transcript Request. Appellant/Cross-Respondent. 00-19040
11/14/2000BriefFiled Opening Brief. Mailed on: LV Drop Box 11/9/00. 00-19904
11/14/2000AppendixFiled Appendix to Opening Brief. 00-19905
12/08/2000MotionFiled Stipulation and Order. Brief due: January 11, 2001. 00-21490
01/09/2001MotionFiled Motion to Extend Time. Motion for Extension of Time to File Respondents' Answering Brief (Second Request) and Respondent/Cross-Appellants' Motion for Extension of Time to File Opening Brief (First Request). 01-00505
01/16/2001Order/Clerk'sFiled Clerk's Order Granting Motion. Respondents/cross-appellants shall have to and including March 12, 2001, to file and serve a single, combined answering brief on appeal and opening brief on cross-appeal. 01-00830
01/31/2001Order/ProceduralFiled Order/Show Cause. The parties shall have 30 days from the date of this order to show cause why this appeal and cross-appeal should not be dismissed for lack of jurisdiction. The briefing schedule in this appeal is suspended pending further order of this court. 01-02110
02/26/2001MotionFiled Response to Order to Show Cause. Joint Reply to Order to Show Cause. 01-03621
04/12/2001Order/DispositionalFiled Order Dismissing Appeal. "ORDER this appeal and cross-appeal DISMISSED." SNP01A-CY/ML/NB 01-06351
05/08/2001RemittiturIssued Remittitur. 01-06422
05/08/2001Case Status Update Remittitur Issued/Case Closed.
06/01/2001RemittiturFiled Remittitur. Received by County Clerk on May 14, 2001. 01-06422