judyrecords
600 million+
United States Court Cases

District Of Columbia Court Of Appeals Record

WILLIAM E. WALLACE V. DEANNE R. UPSON

Case Information: 09-FM-1620
Short Caption:WILLIAM E. WALLACE V. DEANNE R. UPSONClassification:Appeals - Family - Other Family
Lead: 07-FM-0572 Consolidated: 08-FM-0435 , 08-FM-0436 , 08-FM-0450 , 08-FM-0555 , 09-FM-1151 , 09-FM-1620
Superior Court or Agency Case Number:PCS1375-04Filed Date:10/05/2009

Opening Event Date:10/05/2009Case Status:Closed
Record Completed:08/10/2010Post-Decision Matter Pending:
Briefs Completed:08/10/2010
Argued/Submitted:09/02/2010
Disposition:Next Scheduled Action:
Mandate Issued:02/04/2011

Party Information
Appellate RoleParty NameIFPAttorney(s)Arguing AttorneyE-Filer
Appellant-Cross-AppelleePatrick G. MerkleNPro SeN
Appellee-Cross-AppellantWilliam E. Wallace NPro SeN

Events
Event DateStatusDescriptionResult
10/05/2009NOTICE OF APPEAL
08/10/2010RECORD INDEX
08/10/2010RECORD COMPLETED
08/10/2010BRIEFS COMPLETED (Briefed along with lead case No. 07-FM-572)
09/02/2010FiledACTION - Argued / Submitted
09/02/2010SUBMITTED (KR,FI,KG)
09/02/2010On consideration of the cross-appeal filed on October 5, 2009, which was recently located in the trial court and is now docketed as appeal no. 09-FM-1620 and its record has been filed with this court, and it appearing that parties have briefed the issues raised in the briefs already filed with this court in the related matters and that no additional briefing is necessary, it is ORDERED, sua sponte, that appeal no. 09-FM-1620 is consolidated with previously consolidated appeals nos. 07-FM-572, 08-FM-435, 08-FM-436, 08-FM-450, 08-FM-555 & 09-FM-1151 for all purposes herein. it is FURTHER ORDERED that appeal no. 09-FM-1620 will be submitted for a decision along with the related appeals which are awaiting a decision. (KR,FI,KG)
09/09/2010AFFIRMED IN PART/REMANDED IN PART Opinion (Kramer, Fisher, King) and Judgment affirming the judgments and order on appeal except for the two that grant attorney's fees to Wallace, and the cause is remanded on the issue of fees for the three attorneys and the private investigator retained by Wallace.
09/23/2010RECEIVED errata sheet from appellant in response to this court's opinion filed 9/9/10
09/23/2010APPELLANT'S MISCELLANEOUS PROCEDURAL MOTION to redact address from the public record
09/23/2010APPELLANT'S PETITION FOR REHEARING EN BANC
09/23/2010APPELLANT'S PETITION FOR REHEARING
10/21/2010ORDER It appearing that appellant has filed a petition for rehearing and an errata sheet construed as a motion to amend the court's opinion filed on Sept. 9, 2010, it is ORDERED that appellee, within 20 days from the date of this order, shall file a response pertaining to the petition for rehearing and the motion to amend the court's opinion. (KR,FI,KG)
11/04/2010APPELLEE'S ANSWER/RESPONSE - to petition for rehearing and rehearing en banc
01/14/2011ORD DENY APPELLANT'S PETITION FOR REH/REH EN BANC also deny appellant's motion to redact temporary address from public record; and the motion to amend opinion is granted in part as reflected in this court's opinion cited at 3 A.3d 1148. (WHRZRDGLKRFIBRTHOBKG)
02/04/2011MANDATE ISSUED
06/20/2011NOTICE OF FILING A PETITION FOR WRIT OF CERTIORARI
10/11/2011FiledNotice Of Denial Of Pet. For Writ Of Certiorari on October 3, 2011 (Appellant)Denied