judyrecords
search tips
630 million+
United States Court Cases

Texas Supreme Court Record

CITY OF TAYLOR, ET AL. v. H. A. HODGES, COUNTY AUDITOR, ET AL.

Case: A-401
A-401
12/08/1944
Application for Writ of Error
CITY OF TAYLOR, ET AL.
H. A. HODGES, COUNTY AUDITOR, ET AL.
Appellate Briefs
Date Event TypeDescriptionRemarksDocument
03/20/1945Motion for RehearingRespondent
01/31/1945Reply to ResponsePetitioner
01/25/1945Response to PetitionRespondent
12/08/1944Application for Writ of Error - FiledPetitioner
Case Events
DateEvent TypeDispositionRemarksDocument
03/22/1945Conditional motion for rehearingOverruled
03/20/1945Motion for RehearingOverruled
03/09/1945Letter Filed
01/31/1945Reply to Response
01/25/1945Response to Petition
12/30/1944Document received (See Remarks)
12/08/1944Application for Writ of Error - FiledFiling granted
12/08/1944Document received (See Remarks)
Calendars
Set DateCalendar TypeReason SetRemarks
No Calendar.
Parties
PartyPartyTypeRepresentative
H. A. Hodges, County Auditor, et al.Respondent
City of Taylor, et al.Petitioner
Court of Appeals Information:
Trial Court Information