judyrecords
search tips
630 million+
United States Court Cases

Wyoming Supreme/Appellate Court Record

DOROTHY RODRIGUEZ v. STATE OF WYOMING, ex rel., WYOMING WORKERS' SAFETY AND COMPENSATION DIVISION

Case Heading (06-46)
Case Number:06-46Case Docketed On:03/07/2006
Status:Closed
Original Court:First Judicial District Laramie CountyCase Type:Direct Appeal - Civil - Labor and Employment (Title 27)
Short Title:DOROTHY RODRIGUEZ v. STATE OF WYOMING, ex rel., WYOMING WORKERS' SAFETY AND COMPENSATION DIVISION
Full Title:DOROTHY RODRIGUEZ, Appellant (Petitioner), v. STATE OF WYOMING, ex rel., WYOMING WORKERS' SAFETY AND COMPENSATION DIVISION, Appellee (Respondent).

- Party Information
RoleParty NameAttorney(s)
AppellantDorothy RodriguezGuy Patrick Cleveland
AppelleeDepartment of Employment - Workers' Safety and Compensation DivisionPatrick J. Crank
John William Renneisen
Steven R. Czoschke
Kristi Marie Radosevich

- Case Decision Information
Issues:
Opinion Number:2006 WY 146
Citation:146 P.3d 487

Docketing Filter View
Display:

Docket Information
Filing DateDocument DescriptionDocket Entry TypeDocket Entry SubtypeStatus
03/07/2006Event - Docketed and indexedEventDocketed and indexedFinal
03/07/2006Notice-Incoming - Record completion notice from district courtNotice-IncomingRecord completion notice from district courtFinal
03/07/2006Fees - Docket fee receivedFeesDocket fee receivedFinal
03/07/2006Notice-Outgoing - Docketing letterNotice-OutgoingDocketing letterFinal
03/24/2006Notice-Incoming - Attorney substitution (Radosevich)Notice-IncomingAttorney substitutionFinal
04/24/2006Brief - Petitioner (Appellant's)BriefPetitionerFinal
06/07/2006Brief - Appellee; received copy of brief on disk; and received copy of designation of record.BriefAppelleeFinal
06/26/2006Notice-Outgoing - Request for transmitted record on appealNotice-OutgoingRequest for transmitted record on appealFinal
06/28/2006Order - Assigning to expedited docketOrderAssigning to brief only docketFinal
07/10/2006Record - Transmitted record on appeal, two volumes: Volume I, original papers; Volume II, agency record.RecordTransmitted record on appealFinal
11/13/2006Opinion - Opinion and journal order affirming. Justice Burke writing for the court.OpinionOpinion and journal orderFinal
11/30/2006Notice-Outgoing - MandateNotice-OutgoingMandateFinal
11/30/2006Record - Record returned to district courtRecordRecord returned to district courtFinal
11/30/2006Notice-Outgoing - Record return letterNotice-OutgoingRecord return letterFinal
11/30/2006Event - Case closedEventCase closedFinal
12/04/2006Service - Certified mail signature return cardServiceCertified mail signature return cardFinal