Case Information: 10-CF-0924 | |||
Short Caption: | LESTER R. SIMPSON, JR. V. UNITED STATES | Classification: | Appeals - Criminal Felony - Weapons Related |
Superior Court or Agency Case Number: | CF2-1829-10 | Filed Date: | 07/21/2010 |
| |||
Opening Event Date: | 07/21/2010 | Case Status: | Decided/Dismissed |
Record Completed: | 08/26/2010 | Post-Decision Matter Pending: | |
Briefs Completed: | |||
Argued/Submitted: | |||
Disposition: | Next Scheduled Action: | ||
Mandate Issued: | 10/18/2011 | ||
Costs Waived |
Party Information | ||||||||||||
Appellate Role | Party Name | IFP | Attorney(s) | Arguing Attorney | E-Filer | |||||||
Appellant | Lester R. Simpson, Jr. | Y |
| |||||||||
Appellee | United States | N |
|
Events | ||||
Event Date | Status | Description | Result | |
07/21/2010 | NOTICE OF APPEAL | |||
08/10/2010 | SUPPLEMENTAL RECORD - #1 (10 pgs/tape) 4/28/10 proc. w/cd | |||
08/11/2010 | On consideration of the notice of appeal and it appearing that appellant has been found eligible for court appointed counsel, it is ORDERED that James W. Klein, Esquire, is hereby appointed to represent appellant in this appeal. It is FURTHER ORDERED that counsel for appellant shall immediately take the necessary steps to review the trial court record and to ensure that the transcripts necessary to the appeal have been ordered and shall, within 30 days from the date of this order complete and file with this court a single copy of the statement regarding transcript available for completion online. Where transcript(s) necessary for this appeal have been ordered and completed for non-appeal purposes, appellant must advise the Court Reporting and Recording Division to forward said transcript(s) for inclusion in the record on appeal. (JAC) | |||
08/18/2010 | STATEMENT REGARDING TRANSCRIPT(S) (RT ordered/needed (pii)) | |||
08/26/2010 | RECORD INDEX | |||
08/26/2010 | RECORD COPIES | |||
08/26/2010 | RECORD COMPLETED | |||
09/22/2010 | It appearing that the complete record on appeal has been filed with this court, it is ORDERED that appellant's brief and the limited appendix including the documents required by D.C. App. R. 30 (f), shall be filed within 40 days from the date of this order, and appellee's brief shall be filed within 30 days thereafter. See D.C. App. R. 31. (Castillo) | |||
11/01/2010 | APPELLANT'S MOTION TO EXTEND TIME TO FILE BRIEF to 90 days. no oppo | |||
11/03/2010 | On consideration of appellant's motion for an extension of time within which to file the brief, to which no opposition has been filed, it is ORDERED that the motion is granted, and appellant's brief and the limited appendix shall be filed on or before January 31, 2011. (JAC) | |||
01/31/2011 | APPELLANT'S MOTION TO EXTEND TIME TO FILE BRIEF to 90 days. no oppo | |||
02/03/2011 | On consideration of appellant's motion for an extension of time within which to file the brief, to which no opposition has been filed, it is ORDERED that the motion is granted and appellant's brief and the limited appendix shall be filed on or before May 2, 2011. Any further requests for extensions of time will be looked upon with disfavor and granted only upon a showing of good cause. (JAC) | |||
05/02/2011 | APPELLANT'S MOTION TO EXTEND TIME TO FILE BRIEF 90 days no oppo | |||
05/06/2011 | On consideration of appellant's unopposed motion for an extension of time within which to file the brief, it is ORDERED that the motion is granted and appellant's brief and the limited appendix shall be filed on or before August 1, 2011. No further re quests for extensions of time will be granted absent a showing of good cause.(ETW) | |||
08/01/2011 | Filed | Motion For Extension Of Time to File Appendix, Brief (Appellant) | ||
08/15/2011 | Filed | GRANT - Order Granting Appellant's motion for extension of time within which to file the brief and limited appendix to 10/22/11. | ||
09/08/2011 | Filed | Motion To Dismiss Appeal - with waiver attached (Appellant) | ||
09/15/2011 | Filed | Supplemental Record specify - #1 (4 pgs/tape) 4/28/10 proc. w/cd | ||
09/23/2011 | Filed | Order Granting Appellant's motion to dismiss | ||
09/23/2011 | Filed | Dismissed | ||
10/18/2011 | Filed | Mandate |