judyrecords
600 million+
United States Court Cases

District Of Columbia Court Of Appeals Record

TEDROSE BERAKI V. YODIT ZERABRUKE

Case Information: 10-FM-0921
Short Caption:TEDROSE BERAKI V. YODIT ZERABRUKEClassification:Appeals - Family - Domestic Relations
Superior Court or Agency Case Number:DRB1185-03Filed Date:07/16/2010

Opening Event Date:07/16/2010Case Status:Closed
Record Completed:Post-Decision Matter Pending:
Briefs Completed:
Argued/Submitted:
Disposition:Next Scheduled Action:
Mandate Issued:11/09/2010
Costs Waived

Party Information
Appellate RoleParty NameIFPAttorney(s)Arguing AttorneyE-Filer
AppellantTedrose Beraki YPro SeN
AppelleeYodit Zerabruke N
Timothy Brightbill NN

Events
Event DateStatusDescriptionResult
07/16/2010NOTICE OF APPEAL
08/09/2010RECORD INDEX (filed in 10-FM-486)
08/09/2010RECORD COPIES (filed in 10-FM-486)
08/12/2010 ORDERED that appellant shall, w/n 20 days from the date of this order, SHOW CAUSE why this appeal should not be dismissed for having been taken from a NON-FINAL and NON-APPEALABLE order...See DC Code 11-721 (2001). (BY: ETW)
08/12/2010TMC - OTSC - ROTSC
08/31/2010RESPONSE TO ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE - dated 8/12/10
10/18/2010 ORDERED that the APPEAL IS HEREBY DISMISSED for lack of jurisdiction as having been taken from a NON-FINAL ORDER... (RDBETE) (jl)
10/18/2010DISMISSED
11/09/2010MANDATE ISSUED
04/17/2014FiledArchived