judyrecords
600 million+
United States Court Cases

Nevada Supreme/Appellate Court Record

BOYTER VS. SOUTHERN PACIFIC

Case Information: 38132
Short Caption:BOYTER VS. SOUTHERN PACIFICCourt:Supreme Court
Lower Court Case(s):Clark Co. - Eighth Judicial District - A384648Classification:Civil Appeal - General - Other
Disqualifications:Case Status:Disposition Filed/Case Closed
Replacement:Panel Assigned: Panel
To SP/Judge:07/18/2001 / Reed, NathanielSP Status:Completed
Oral Argument:Oral Argument Location:
Submission Date:How Submitted:

+ Party Information

Docket Entries
DateTypeDescriptionPending?Document
07/06/2001Filing FeeReceived Filing Fee Paid on Filing. $200.00 from Rossi, Cox, Kiker & Inderwish, P.C.--check no. 77851.
07/06/2001Notice of Appeal DocumentsFiled Certified Copy of Notice of Appeal/Settlement. Notice re: settlement conference program/suspension of rules mailed to all counsel. (Docketing statement mailed to counsel for appellant.) 01-11371
07/18/2001Settlement NoticeIssued Notice: Assignment to Settlement Program. Settlement Judge: Nathaniel J. Reed. (Briefing and preparation of transcripts suspended pending further order of this court.)
07/24/2001Docketing StatementFiled Docketing Statement. 01-12528
07/25/2001Notice/Outgoing Letter. Nathaniel J. Reed.
09/10/2001Settlement Program ReportFiled Interim Settlement Program Report. The parties were unable to agree to a settlement of this matter. 01-15262
09/24/2001Settlement Order/ProceduralFiled Order: No Settlement/Briefing Reinstated. The parties were unable to agree to a settlement of this matter. This court shall conduct a preliminary jurisdictional review of this appeal. Appellant: 15 days to comply with NRAP 9(a); 120 days to file and serve opening brief and appendix. Briefing shall proceed in accordance with NRAP 31(a)(1). 01-16052
10/11/2001Transcript RequestFiled Request for Transcript of Proceedings. Transcripts requested: January 8, 2001, January 17, 2001, January 18, 2001, January 19, 2001, January 22, 2001, January 23, 2001 and January 24, 2001. To Court Reporter: Kristine Cornelius. 01-17134
11/15/2001TranscriptFiled Transcript. Proceedings: February 27, 2001. Court Reporter: Kris Cornelius. 01-19103
01/18/2002MotionFiled Stipulation and Order. Brief due: February 25, 2002. 02-01316
02/22/2002MotionFiled Stipulation. Stipulated Motion for 90-Day Extention to file Appellant's Opening Brief. 02-03386
02/26/2002Order/ProceduralFiled Order Granting Motion. We elect to treat the stipulation filed on February 22, 2002, as a joint motion for a 60-day extension. Appellant shall file and serve the opening brief and appendix by May 28, 2002. No further extensions of time shall be permitted absent demonstration of extreme and unforeseeable circumstances. 02-03567
05/24/2002Notice/IncomingFiled Notice. Notice of Settlement of All Claims. 02-09198
08/29/2002Order/ProceduralFiled Order. On May 24, 2002, appellant filed a notice informing this court that the parties reached a settlement of all claims and that they were in the process of preparing the appropriate documents to have this appeal dismissed with prejudice. To date, the parties have not filed a stipulation to dismiss, or otherwise communicated with this court regarding the status of this appeal. Accordingly, if appellant does not intend to continue to prosecute this appeal, he shall file either a stipulation to dismiss this appeal or a voluntary motion to withdraw this appeal pursuant to NRAP 42(b) within 20 days from the date of this order. If appellant intends to prosecute this appeal, he shall file the opening brief and appendix within 30 days from the date of this order. Thereafter, briefing shall proceed in accordance with NRAP 31(a)(1). 02-15017
09/27/2002MotionFiled Stipulation/Dismiss Appeal. 02-16772
10/15/2002Order/DispositionalFiled Stipulated Dismissal. Pursuant to the stipulation of the parties and cause appearing, " . . . this appeal is dismissed." The parties shall bear their own costs and attorney fees. NRAP 42(b). NNP/CLK 02-17785
10/15/2002Case Status Update Case Closed. No remittitur issued.