judyrecords
600 million+
United States Court Cases

Wyoming Supreme/Appellate Court Record

VINCENT B. MEISTER v. THE STATE OF WYOMING

Case Heading (06-180)
Case Number:06-180Case Docketed On:08/07/2006
Status:Closed
Original Court:Fifth Judicial District Park CountyCase Type:Direct Appeal - Criminal - Offenses Against Property 6-3-101 - 6-3-901
Short Title:VINCENT B. MEISTER v. THE STATE OF WYOMING
Full Title:VINCENT B. MEISTER, Appellant (Defendant), v. THE STATE OF WYOMING, Appellee (Plaintiff).

- Party Information
RoleParty NameAttorney(s)
AppellantVincent B . MeisterMichael S. Messenger
AppelleeThe State of WyomingPatrick J. Crank
Paul S. Rehurek
D. Michael Pauling
Christopher Levi Martin

- Case Decision Information
Issues:
Opinion Number:
Citation:

Docketing Filter View
Display:

Docket Information
Filing DateDocument DescriptionDocket Entry TypeDocket Entry SubtypeStatus
08/07/2006Event - Docketed and indexedEventDocketed and indexedFinal
08/07/2006Notice-Incoming - Record completion notice from district courtNotice-IncomingRecord completion notice from district courtFinal
08/07/2006Fees - Docket fee receivedFeesDocket fee receivedFinal
08/07/2006Notice-Outgoing - Docketing letterNotice-OutgoingDocketing letterFinal
08/07/2006Order - Sanction - notice of appealOrderSanction - notice of appealFinal
08/14/2006Fees - Sanctions received - NOAFeesSanctions received - NOAFinal
08/14/2006Response/Objection - Other - to Appellant's Notice of AppealResponse/ObjectionOtherFinal
08/15/2006Service - Certificate of service, amended, for appellant's notice of appealServiceCertificate of serviceFinal
08/22/2006Order - Dismiss - jurisdictionOrderDismiss - jurisdictionFinal
08/23/2006Response/Objection - Other - reply to appellee's response to appellant's "notice of appeal"Response/ObjectionOtherFinal
09/01/2006Petition - ReinstatementPetitionReinstatementFinal
09/01/2006Memorandum - In support of petition to reinstateMemorandumIn support of petitionFinal
09/22/2006Order - Denying petition for reinstatement of appealOrderDenyFinal
09/22/2006Event - Case closedEventCase closedFinal