judyrecords
search tips
630 million+
United States Court Cases

District Of Columbia Court Of Appeals Record

WILLIE J. DEMONIA V. UNITED STATES

Case Information: 88-CF-1232
Short Caption:WILLIE J. DEMONIA V. UNITED STATESClassification:Appeals - Criminal Felony - Other Felony
Superior Court or Agency Case Number:F2418-88Filed Date:09/20/1988

Opening Event Date:09/20/1988Case Status:Closed
Record Completed:08/11/1989Post-Decision Matter Pending:
Briefs Completed:03/21/1990
Argued/Submitted:03/26/1990
Disposition:Next Scheduled Action:
Mandate Issued:05/09/1990

Party Information
Appellate RoleParty NameIFPAttorney(s)Arguing AttorneyE-Filer
AppellantWillie J. Demonia N
Dale Chance Saliba YN
AppelleeUnited StatesN
Brenda J. Johnson YN
John R. Fisher YN

Events
Event DateStatusDescriptionResult
01/01/1901DEMONIA, WILLIE J. UNITED STATES
09/20/1988FiledOPENING EVENT - Opening Event
10/21/1988APPOINTING COUNSEL/CO REFERRAL (CJA) DALE CHANCE SALIBA, ESQ. PANEL SCDATE 000000 SCHPRD
10/31/1988APPELLANT'S DOCKETING STATEMENT JB PANEL SCDATE 103188 SCHPRD DSA
02/03/1989RECORD ON APPEAL AD RTC PANEL SCDATE 112188 SCHPRD R
05/11/1989MISCELLANEOUS PROCEDURAL MOTION APPELLANT'S MOTION TO AUGMENT RECORD ON APPEAL AD PANEL SCDATE 000000 SCHPRD
06/15/1989ORDER GRANT MO OF APLT TO SUPP REC & CLK OF SUPER CRT TO FL GOVT EXHIBIT 1A AS SUPP REC. DAS PANELRO SCDATE 060689 SCHPRD Q
07/20/1989SUPPLEMENTAL RECORD #1 (173 PGS - CALHOUN) GT PANEL SCDATE 021589 SCHPRD RT
08/11/1989FiledRecord Completed
08/11/1989ACTION SLIP MAILED AD PANEL SCDATE 000000 SCHPRD
08/11/1989SUPPLEMENTAL RECORD #2(DRUG REPORT) AD PANEL SCDATE 071789 SCHPRD SR
09/20/1989APPELLANT'S BRIEF AD PANEL SCDATE 092089 SCHPRD BA
10/11/1989APPELLEE'S MOTION TO EXTEND TIME TO FILE BRIEF TO 11/21/89 (NO OPA) GT PANEL SCDATE 102589 SCHPRD BE
10/13/1989ORDER GRANT MO OF APLE TO EXT TM TO FL BRF TO 11/21/89. DAS PANELRBH SCDATE 101289 SCHPRD M
11/22/1989APPELLEE'S MOTION FOR LEAVE TO FILE BRIEF AD PANEL SCDATE 000000 SCHPRD
11/22/1989APPELLEE'S MOTION TO EXTEND TIME TO FILE BRIEF TO 11-22-89 AD PANEL SCDATE 112189 SCHPRD BE
11/22/1989RECEIVED APPELLEE'S BRIEF AD PANEL SCDATE 000000 SCHPRD
11/27/1989APPELEE'S BRIEF GW PANEL SCDATE 120489 SCHPRD OPA
03/21/1990FiledBriefing Completed
03/21/1990APPELEE'S BRIEF JJ PANEL SCDATE 000000 SCHPRD
03/26/1990FiledACTION - Argued / Submitted
03/26/1990SUBMITTED PANELSTSCGA SCDATE 000000 SCHPRD
04/18/1990AFFIRMED MOJ AF JUDGMENT ON APPEAL PANELSTSCGA SCDATE 000000 SCHPRD
04/18/1990DISP NO - 01 DISP - AF METH -MOJ JUDGE -PC CITE
05/09/1990MANDATE ISSUED PANEL SCDATE 000000 SCHPRD