judyrecords
search tips
630 million+
United States Court Cases

District Of Columbia Court Of Appeals Record

LINWOOD GRAY III V. UNITED STATES

Case Information: 88-CF-1284
Short Caption:LINWOOD GRAY III V. UNITED STATESClassification:Appeals - Criminal Felony - Other Felony
Superior Court or Agency Case Number:F11986-87Filed Date:10/18/1988

Opening Event Date:10/18/1988Case Status:Closed
Record Completed:06/30/1989Post-Decision Matter Pending:
Briefs Completed:03/22/1990
Argued/Submitted:09/05/1990
Disposition:Next Scheduled Action:
Mandate Issued:10/12/1990

Party Information
Appellate RoleParty NameIFPAttorney(s)Arguing AttorneyE-Filer
AppellantLinwood Gray, IIIN
John Edward Williams YN
AppelleeUnited StatesN
John R. Fisher YN
Leslie A. Blackmon YN

Events
Event DateStatusDescriptionResult
01/01/1901GRAY III, LINWOOD UNITED STATES
01/01/1903NOTE - 01 3/22/90 ORD: THIS APPEAL SHALL NOTE - 01 BE SCHD FOR CONSIDERATION AS NOTE - 02 SOON AS THE CALENDAR PERMITS. NOTE - 02
10/18/1988FiledOPENING EVENT - Opening Event
10/18/1988APPELLANT'S DOCKETING STATEMENT JB PANEL SCDATE 000000 SCHPRD
10/21/1988APPOINTING COUNSEL/CO REFERRAL (CJA) JOHN EDWARD WILLIAMS, ESQ. PANEL SCDATE 000000 SCHPRD
11/29/1988ORDER APLT DSA DUE IN 10 DAYS - NFX. EBP PANELRO SCDATE 103188 SCHPRD DSA
12/21/1988APPELLANT'S ANSWER/RESPONSE TO ORDER 11/29/88 MLR PANEL SCDATE 120988 SCHPRD DSA
12/21/1988RECEIVED APPELLANT'S DOCKETING STATE- MENT MLR PANEL SCDATE 120999 SCHPRD DSA
02/21/1989ORDER DISMISSING 88-1615 AS DUPLICATE OF 88-1284. FVH PANELRO SCDATE 000000 SCHPRD
06/30/1989FiledRecord Completed
06/30/1989ACTION SLIP MAILED GT PANEL SCDATE 000000 SCHPRD
06/30/1989RECORD ON APPEAL GT PANEL SCDATE 121988 SCHPRD R
08/11/1989APPELLANT'S MOTION TO EXTEND TIME TO FILE BRIEF FOR 40 DAYS AFTER TRANSCRIPT IS FILED JB PANEL SCDATE 080989 SCHPRD BA
09/08/1989SUPPLEMENTAL RECORD #1 (12 PGS RT - BURNEY) GT PANEL SCDATE 090489 SCHPRD RT
09/12/1989ORDER EXTENDING TIME FOR FILING BA UNTIL 40 DAYS AFTER TRANSCRIPT DOCKETED. ACG PANELRO SCDATE 000000 SCHPRD
09/27/1989ACTION SLIP MAILED GT PANEL SCDATE 000000 SCHPRD
09/27/1989SUPPLEMENTAL RECORD #2 (64 PGS RT - JANIFER) GT PANEL SCDATE 090589 SCHPRD RT
11/08/1989APPELLANT'S BRIEF AD PANEL SCDATE 110889 SCHPRD BA
11/30/1989APPELLEE'S MOTION TO EXTEND TIME TO FILE BRIEF TO JANUARY 11, 1990 RJG PANEL SCDATE 111389 SCHPRD BE
12/19/1989ORDER EXTG TIME FOR FILING APLE'S BR TO AND INCLUDING 1/11/90. FVH PANELRBH SCDATE 000000 SCHPRD
01/11/1990APPELLEE'S MOTION TO EXTEND TIME TO FILE BRIEF TO 10 DAYS AFTER RECVD RT. AD PANEL SCDATE 011190 SCHPRD BE
01/24/1990SUPPLEMENTAL RECORD #3(94 PGS/RHOADES) AD PANEL SCDATE 000000 SCHPRD
01/29/1990RECEIVED APPELLEE'S BRIEF PANEL SCDATE 000000 SCHPRD
03/22/1990FiledBriefing Completed
03/22/1990APPELEE'S BRIEF JB PANEL SCDATE 030290 SCHPRD U
03/22/1990ORDER THAT THE LODGED APPELLEE'S BRIEF IS HEREBY FILED, F/O THAT (SEE NOTES 1 & 2) JB PANELRBH SCDATE 012690 SCHPRD U
09/05/1990FiledACTION - Argued / Submitted
09/05/1990SUBMITTED PANELRGSTRY SCDATE 000000 SCHPRD
09/18/1990AFFIRMED MOJ AF JUDGMENT ON APPEAL PANELRGSTRY SCDATE 000000 SCHPRD
09/18/1990APPOINTING COUNSEL/CO REFERRAL (CJA) JOHN EDWARD WILLIAMS, ESQ. PANEL SCDATE 000000 SCHPRD
09/18/1990DISP NO - 01 DISP - AF METH -MOJ JUDGE -PC CITE
10/12/1990MANDATE ISSUED PANEL SCDATE 000000 SCHPRD
11/13/1990NOTICE OF FILING A PETITION FOR WRIT OF CERTIORARIFILED IN SUPREME COURT (# 90-6201) PANEL SCDATE 000000 SCHPRD
11/19/1990NOTICE OF FILING A PETITION FOR WRIT OF CERTIORARIIN SUPREME COURT #90-6201 PANEL SCDATE 000000 SCHPRD Denied