judyrecords
search tips
630 million+
United States Court Cases

District Of Columbia Court Of Appeals Record

MELVIN TATE V. UNITED STATES

Case Information: 88-CF-1234
Short Caption:MELVIN TATE V. UNITED STATESClassification:Appeals - Criminal Felony - Robbery Related
Superior Court or Agency Case Number:F5666-87Filed Date:09/19/1988

Opening Event Date:09/19/1988Case Status:Closed
Record Completed:08/01/1991Post-Decision Matter Pending:
Briefs Completed:12/19/1991
Argued/Submitted:05/26/1992
Disposition:Next Scheduled Action:
Mandate Issued:06/19/1992

Party Information
Appellate RoleParty NameIFPAttorney(s)Arguing AttorneyE-Filer
AppellantMelvin Tate N
William S. Rhyne YN
AppelleeUnited StatesN
John R. Fisher NN

Events
Event DateStatusDescriptionResult
01/01/1901TATE, MELVIN UNITED STATES
01/01/1902SCRND/REG
01/01/1903NOTE - 01 4/5/91 ORD: BRF OF APLT DUE NOTE - 01 6/11/91; BRF OF APLE DUE NOTE - 02 7/7/91; REPLY BRF DUE 8/5/91; NOTE - 02 SCHED ON SEPT. 1991 CAL; NFX NOTE - 03 4/25/91 ORD: ORD, SS, THIS NOTE - 03 CRT'S ADVANCE BRFNG ORD OF NOTE - 04 4/5/91 IS VACATED TO EXTENT NOTE - 04 THAT BRF OF APLE DUE 7/16/91; NOTE - 05 REPLY BRF OF APLT DUE 8/5/91. NOTE - 05 ALL REMAINING PROVISIONS OF NOTE - 06 THE CRT'S 4/5/91 ORD SHALL NOTE - 06 REMAIN IN EFFECT. NOTE - 07 6/20/91 ORD: 4/5/91 ORD IS NOTE - 07 VACATED; GRANT MO OF CNSL FOR NOTE - 08 APLT TO W/D & VACATE APPMT OF NOTE - 08 JAMES KLEIN & APPT WILLIAM S. NOTE - 09 RHYNE FOR APLT; BRF OF APLT NOTE - 09 DUE IN 40 DAYS.
01/01/1906 PDS VACATED 6/20/91
09/19/1988NOTICE OF APPEAL
10/18/1988ORDER APPOINTING JAMES KLEIN, ESQ. AS COUNSEL FOR APLT. DOCKETING STATEMENT DUE IN 10 DAYS. GG PANELPY SCDATE 000000 SCHPRD
10/20/1988APPELLANT'S DOCKETING STATEMENT JB PANEL SCDATE 102888 SCHPRD DSA
10/20/1988STATEMENT OF APPELLANT RE TRANSCRIPTS RJG PANEL SCDATE 000000 SCHPRD
01/25/1989RECORD ON APPEAL AD PANEL SCDATE 111888 SCHPRD R
07/18/1989ORDER DENY MO TO EXT TM TO PREPARE RT; RT DUE IN 10 DAYS. MEH PANELRO SCDATE 063089 SCHPRD RT
10/04/1989SUPPLEMENTAL RECORD #1 (338 PGS RT - MITCHELL) GT PANEL SCDATE 072889 SCHPRD RT
02/05/1990SUPPLEMENTAL RECORD #2(62 PGS/LEIDIG-TAPE) AD PANEL SCDATE 000000 SCHPRD
04/05/1991ORDER SEE NOTE FIELDS 01-02. JJ PANELRBH SCDATE 022791 SCHPRD B
04/25/1991ORDER SEE NOTE FIELDS 3 THRU 6. JJ PANELJWR SCDATE 070791 SCHPRD BE
06/05/1991COUNSEL'S MOTION TO WITHDRAW FOR BUSINESS REASONS AJ PANEL SCDATE 000000 SCHPRD
06/20/1991APPOINTING COUNSEL/CO REFERRAL (CJA) WILLIAM S. RHYNE, ESQ. PANEL SCDATE 000000 SCHPRD
06/20/1991ORDER SEE NOTE FIELDS 07-09. DAS PANELRO SCDATE 040591 SCHPRD CHECK
07/09/1991APPELLANT'S MOTION TO EXTEND TIME TO FILE BRIEF TO 40 DAYS AFTER FILING OF COMPLETE RECORD - NO OPPO PMB PANEL SCDATE 080591 SCHPRD BA
07/18/1991ORDER APLT MO X TM FL BRF GRNTED & APLT BRF DUE W/IN 40 DYS AFTER COMPLET REC FL W/CRT. GR PANELRBH SCDATE 071291 SCHPRD GR
08/01/1991SUPPLEMENTAL RECORD #3 (11 PGS/GRAYBILL) PMB PANEL SCDATE 090191 SCHPRD RT
08/01/1991RECORD COMPLETED
10/10/1991ORDER BRF OF APLT DUE W/IN 40 DYS FR DTD OF ORD & BRF OF APLE W/IN 30 DYS THEREAFTER. NFX. JJ PANELRBH SCDATE 100991 SCHPRD B
11/20/1991RECEIVED APLT BRIEF PANEL SCDATE 111991 SCHPRD BA
11/22/1991APPELLANT'S MOTION FOR LEAVE TO FILE BRIEF PMB PANEL SCDATE 000000 SCHPRD
12/19/1991APPELLANT'S BRIEF JJ PANEL SCDATE 000000 SCHPRD
12/19/1991APPELEE'S BRIEF PMB PANEL SCDATE 122791 SCHPRD BE
12/19/1991ORDER GRT APLT MO FOR LV TO FL LODGE BRF, BRF IS FL. F/O BRF OF APLE DUE 12/27/91. JJ PANELRBH SCDATE 121191 SCHPRD B
12/19/1991BRIEFS COMPLETED
05/26/1992ARGUED (FE KG BE) William S. Rhyne, Esq. for appellant; David L. Smith, Esq. for appellee.
05/29/1992AFFIRMED MOJ (FE KG BE) Printed opinion filed 7/14/92.
06/03/1992APPELLEE'S MISCELLANEOUS SUBSTANTIVE MOTION to publish opinion.
06/18/1992Appellee's motion to publish
06/19/1992MANDATE ISSUED
06/29/1992Grant appellee's motion to publish this court's memorandum opinion and judgment of May 29, 1992, and the Clerk is directed to cause the decision to be published (FEKGBE)
07/14/1992error