judyrecords
600 million+
United States Court Cases

Nevada Supreme/Appellate Court Record

TAM VS. STATE GAMING COMMISSION

Case Information: 38102
Short Caption:TAM VS. STATE GAMING COMMISSIONCourt:Supreme Court
Lower Court Case(s):Clark Co. - Eighth Judicial District - A428015Classification:Civil Appeal - Administrative Agency - General
Disqualifications:RoseCase Status:Remittitur Issued/Case Closed
Replacement:Panel Assigned: Panel
To SP/Judge:07/09/2001 / Berkson, LesterSP Status:Completed
Oral Argument:Oral Argument Location:
Submission Date:How Submitted:

+ Party Information

Docket Entries
DateTypeDescriptionPending?Document
06/29/2001Filing Fee Filing Fee due.
06/29/2001Notice of Appeal DocumentsFiled Certified Copy of Notice of Appeal/Settlement. Notice re: settlement conference program/suspension of rules mailed to all counsel. (Docketing statement mailed to counsel for appellant.) 01-11050
06/29/2001Notice/OutgoingIssued Notice to Pay Supreme Court Filing Fee. Due Date: 10 days
06/29/2001Notice/OutgoingIssued Notice to File Case Appeal Statement. Due Date: 10 days
07/02/2001OtherDisqualification of Justice Young. Gaming related case.
07/02/2001OtherDisqualification of Justice Rose. Gaming related case.
07/09/2001Settlement NoticeIssued Notice: Assignment to Settlement Program. Settlement Judge: Lester H. Berkson. (Briefing and preparation of transcripts suspended pending further order of this court.)
08/14/2001Order/ProceduralFiled Order. To date, appellant has failed to comply with our notices of June 29, 2001. Appellant shall have 10 days from the date of this order to (1) pay the filing fee and (2) file the case appeal statement in the district court clerk's office and file two certified copies of the case appeal statement with the clerk of this court. Failure to comply with this order may result in the dismissal of this appeal as abandoned. 01-13803
08/23/2001Filing FeeReceived Filing Fee Paid on Filing. $200.00 from Benson Lee - check no. 1308.
08/23/2001Notice of Appeal DocumentsFiled Case Appeal Statement. Filed in district court on: August 22, 2001. 01-14311
08/27/2001Notice/Outgoing Letter. Lester H. Berkson.
09/04/2001Order/ProceduralFiled Order. To date, appellant has failed to file the docketing statement. Appellant shall, within 10 days of the date of this order, file and serve the docketing statement. Failure to file a complete and accurate docketing statement in a timely manner may result in the imposition of sanctions. (Docketing statement mailed to counsel for appellant.) 01-14912
09/25/2001Docketing StatementFiled Docketing Statement. 01-16150
09/26/2001Notice/Outgoing Letter. Lester H. Berkson.
10/01/2001Settlement Program ReportFiled Interim Settlement Program Report. Parties agreed to continue for approx. 90-120 days for further negotiation. 01-16492
04/01/2002Settlement Program ReportFiled Interim Settlement Program Report. The parties were unable to agree to a settlement of this matter. 02-05798
04/18/2002Settlement Order/ProceduralFiled Order: No Settlement/Briefing Reinstated. The parties were unable to agree to a settlement. We reinstate the time deadlines for requesting transcripts and filing briefs. Appellant: 15 days to comply with NRAP 9(a); 120 days to file and serve opening brief and appendix. Briefing shall proceed in accordance with NRAP 31(a)(1). 02-06910
05/23/2002Order/ProceduralFiled Order. Appellant shall, within 10 days of the date of this order, file and serve either a transcript request form or a certificate indicating that no transcripts are being requested. 02-09102
08/07/2002Order/ProceduralFiled Order. To date, appellant has failed to file the either a transcript request form or a certificate indicating that no transcripts are being requested. Appellant shall, within 10 days of the date of this order, file and serve the required document or show cause why sanctions should not be imposed. 02-13475
09/13/2002Order/ProceduralFiled Order. As of the date of this order, appellant has failed to comply with NRAP 9(a) and has failed to file an opening brief and appendix by their due dte or otherwise communicated with this court concerning this appeal. We conclude that the imposition of sanctions agains counsel for appellant, attorney Benson Lee, is appropriate. Mr. Lee shall personally pay the sum of $500 to the Supreme Court Law Library within 15 days from the date of this order and file with this court a certificate indicating that such payment has been made. Appellant shall comply with NRAP 9(a) within 10 days from the date of this order, and shall file and serve the opening brief and appendix within 20 days from the date of this order. fn1[In the event appellant will be requesting the preparation of transcripts for this appeal, he may file an appropriate motion seeking a sufficient extension of time after receipt of the transcripts to prelpare the opening brief and appendix.] Briefing shall proceed in accordance with NRAP 31(a)(1). 02-15935
01/23/2004Order/DispositionalFiled Order Dismissing Appeal. On December 10, 2002, Mr. Lee untimely paid the $500.00 sanction to the Supreme Court Law Library. We note, however, that Mr. Lee failed to file a certificate with this court indicating that such payment had been made. To date, appellant has failed to comply with NRAP 9(a), failed to file and serve the opening brief and appendix, failed to file a certificate indicating that Mr. Lee's personal sanction has been paid, and failed to respond to our previous orders or otherwise communicate with this court. "We dismiss this appeal as abandoned." See NRAP 9(a)(3). NNP04-NB/DA/MG 04-01384
02/18/2004RemittiturIssued Remittitur. 04-01509
02/18/2004Case Status Update Remittitur Issued/Case Closed.
03/08/2004RemittiturFiled Remittitur. Received by County Clerk on February 20, 2004. 04-01509