judyrecords
600 million+
United States Court Cases

Wyoming Supreme/Appellate Court Record

MARVIN WELLS DANIELS v. THE STATE OF WYOMING

Case Heading (06-224)
Case Number:06-224Case Docketed On:10/02/2006
Status:Closed
Original Court:Seventh Judicial District Natrona CountyCase Type:Direct Appeal - Criminal - Sentencing 6-10-101 - 6-10-301
Short Title:MARVIN WELLS DANIELS v. THE STATE OF WYOMING
Full Title:MARVIN WELLS DANIELS, Appellant (Defendant), v. THE STATE OF WYOMING, Appellee (Plaintiff).

- Party Information
RoleParty NameAttorney(s)
AppellantMarvin Wells DanielsD. Terry Rogers
Donna D. Domonkos
Ryan R. Roden
AppelleeThe State of WyomingPatrick J. Crank
Paul S. Rehurek
D. Michael Pauling

- Case Decision Information
Issues:
Opinion Number:
Citation:

Docketing Filter View
Display:

Docket Information
Filing DateDocument DescriptionDocket Entry TypeDocket Entry SubtypeStatus
10/02/2006Event - Docketed and indexedEventDocketed and indexedFinal
10/02/2006Notice-Incoming - Record completion notice from district courtNotice-IncomingRecord completion notice from district courtFinal
10/02/2006Notice-Outgoing - Docketing letterNotice-OutgoingDocketing letterFinal
11/17/2006Motion - Extension of time - briefMotionExtension of time - briefFinal
11/20/2006Order - Grant - extension of time - brief of appellantOrderGrant - extension of timeFinal
01/03/2007Motion - Extension of time - briefMotionExtension of time - briefFinal
01/04/2007Order - Grant - extension of time - brief of appellantOrderGrant - extension of timeFinal
02/20/2007Motion - Extension of time - briefMotionExtension of time - briefFinal
02/21/2007Order - Grant - third extension of time - brief of appellant - no furtherOrderGrant - third extension of timeFinal
03/08/2007Motion - Dismiss - voluntary with waiver (FAX)MotionDismiss - voluntary with waiverFinal
03/09/2007Order - Dismiss - voluntary or stipulatedOrderDismiss - voluntary or stipulatedFinal
03/09/2007Event - Case closedEventCase closedFinal
03/14/2007Notice-Incoming - Waiver of appeal - originalNotice-IncomingWaiver of appealFinal