judyrecords
search tips
630 million+
United States Court Cases

District Of Columbia Court Of Appeals Record

FIRST AMERICAN BANK V. TRANSPORTATION MANAGEMENT INC.

Case Information: 86-CV-0741
Short Caption:FIRST AMERICAN BANK V. TRANSPORTATION MANAGEMENT INC.Classification:Appeals - Civil - Other Civil
Superior Court or Agency Case Number:CA10566-82Filed Date:05/02/1986

Opening Event Date:05/02/1986Case Status:Closed
Record Completed:06/30/1986Post-Decision Matter Pending:
Briefs Completed:12/22/1988
Argued/Submitted:07/13/1989
Disposition:Next Scheduled Action:
Mandate Issued:02/06/1991

Party Information
Appellate RoleParty NameIFPAttorney(s)Arguing AttorneyE-Filer
AppellantJohn Doe N
Stephen A. Trimble NN
AppellantFirst American BankN
John M. Clifford YN
AppelleeDistrict of ColumbiaN
James C. McKay, Jr.YY
Charles L. Reischel YN
AppelleeTransportation Management Inc.N
William S. Hopkins NN
AppelleeJohn Doe N
Ronald K. Jaicks YN

Events
Event DateStatusDescriptionResult
01/01/1901FIRST AMERICAN BANK TRANSPORTATION MANAGEMENT INC. DISTRICT OF COLUMBIA, ET AL
01/01/1905TRDATE- 89/07/13 ACTION - ARG ATTY 1 - CLIFFORDJ FOR - APPELLANT ATTY 2 - MCKAYJAM FOR - APPELLEE DC ATTY 3 - JAICKSR FOR - APLE TM
01/01/1906 HOPKINSW FOR TRANS. MANAGEMENT INC. JAICKSR TRANSPORTATION MGMT INC.
05/02/1986FiledOPENING EVENT - Opening Event
05/27/1986MO TO EXTEND TIME TO FILE CIVIL APPEAL STATEMENT TO MAY 27, 1986; AND ANSWER TO OTSC RJG PANEL SCDATE 060686 SCHPRD ANSA
05/27/1986ORDER APLT IN 10 DAYS OTSC WHY CASE SHLD NOT BE DISMISSED. (NO CAS & FEE) EBP PANELPY SCDATE 051986 SCHPRD CAS
05/27/1986$50.00 DOCKETING FEE PB PANEL SCDATE 000000 SCHPRD
05/27/1986RECEIVED CIVIL APPEAL STATEMENT & $50 DOCKETING FEE PAID PB PANEL SCDATE 000000 SCHPRD
05/30/1986$5 PAID TO DC TREASURER VS PANEL SCDATE 000000 SCHPRD
06/05/1986ORDER NO 7A; APLT IN 10 DAYS TO FILE DR/SRT W/CLK OF SUP.CT. AND SERVE CLK OF THIS CT. & APLES PANELPY SCDATE 060986 SCHPRD CHECK
06/13/1986DESIGNATION OF RECORD & SRT GG PANEL SCDATE 061686 SCHPRD DR
06/30/1986FiledRecord Completed
06/30/1986RECORD ON APPEAL (EXHIBIT: 1 BROWN ENVELOPE) (RTC) GG PANEL SCDATE 080486 SCHPRD R
06/30/1986SUPPLEMENTAL RECORD (DEPOSITIONS) GG PANEL SCDATE 000000 SCHPRD
07/27/1988SUPPLEMENTAL RECORD #1 (346 PGS RT - BRADLEY) GT PANEL SCDATE 073088 SCHPRD RT
08/12/1988ACTION SLIP MAILED GT PANEL SCDATE 000000 SCHPRD
08/24/1988APPELLANT'S MOTION TO EXTEND TIME TO FILE BRIEF TO OCTOBER 5TH (NO OPPO) JB PANEL SCDATE 092188 SCHPRD BA
08/31/1988ORDER GRANT MO OF APLT TO EXT TM TO FL BRF TO 10/5/88. DAS PANELPY SCDATE 090688 SCHPRD CHECK
10/05/1988APPELLANT'S BRIEF AD PANEL SCDATE 100588 SCHPRD BA
11/07/1988APPELLEE'S MOTION TO EXTEND TIME TO FILE BRIEF OF (D.C.) TO DECEMBER 23RD (NO OPPO) JB PB PANEL SCDATE 000000 SCHPRD
11/07/1988RECEIVED APPELLEE'S BRIEF AD PANEL SCDATE 000000 SCHPRD
11/18/1988APPELEE'S BRIEF PB PANEL SCDATE 111788 SCHPRD CHECK
12/22/1988FiledBriefing Completed
12/22/1988APPELEE'S BRIEF DISTRICT OF COLUMBIA AD PANEL SCDATE 000000 SCHPRD
01/10/1989APPELLANT'S REPLY BRIEF GT PANEL SCDATE 000000 SCHPRD
07/13/1989FiledACTION - Argued / Submitted
07/13/1989ARGUED PANELFEBEFA SCDATE 000000 SCHPRD
12/11/1990REVERSED AND REMANDED JUDGMENT RV JUDGMENT ON APPEAL /CAUSE RM FOR FURTHER PRCDGS AS SET FORTH IN OPINION FILED. PANELFEBEFA SCDATE 000000 SCHPRD
12/11/1990DISP NO - 01 DISP - RVRM METH -OPN JUDGE -BE CITE 583 A.2d 993
12/11/1990OPINION TYPE M JUDGE - BE PAGE # - 3707 OPINION TYPE D JUDGE - FA PAGE # - 0000
12/20/1990MOTION TO EXT TM TO FILE PET FOR REH/REH EN BANC TO 1/15/91 (NO OPPO) AJ PANEL SCDATE 000000 SCHPRD
12/21/1990APPELLANT'S PETITION FOR REHEARING AND OR RECONSIDERATION AJ PANEL SCDATE 000000 SCHPRD
12/28/1990ORDER GRT MO OF APLE, D.C., TO EXT TM TO FL PET FOR REH/REH EB ON OR BEFORE 1/15/91 SL PANELRO SCDATE 000000 SCHPRD
01/17/1991LETTER OF APLE DOES NOT WANT TO FILED PET. FOR REHEARING AD PANEL SCDATE 000000 SCHPRD
01/29/1991ORDER DENIYNG PETITION FOR REHEARING AND/OR RECONSIDERATION SL PANELFEBEFA SCDATE 122790 SCHPRD VS
02/06/1991MANDATE ISSUED PANEL SCDATE 000000 SCHPRD