judyrecords
search tips
630 million+
United States Court Cases

District Of Columbia Court Of Appeals Record

IRON GATE INN INC. GENERAL FEDERATION OF WOMEN'S

Case Information: 86-CV-0811
Short Caption:IRON GATE INN INC. GENERAL FEDERATION OF WOMEN'SClassification:Appeals - Civil - Other Civil
Lead:86-CV-0811Consolidated: 86-CV-0900
Superior Court or Agency Case Number:CA15651-82Filed Date:05/23/1986

Opening Event Date:05/23/1986Case Status:Closed
Record Completed:04/14/1987Post-Decision Matter Pending:
Briefs Completed:06/10/1987
Argued/Submitted:11/19/1987
Disposition:Next Scheduled Action:
Mandate Issued:03/10/1988

Party Information
Appellate RoleParty NameIFPAttorney(s)Arguing AttorneyE-Filer
AppellantJohn Doe N
David J. Frantz YN
AppelleeJohn Doe N
Ronald L. Plesser YN
AppelleeJohn Doe N
Alan R. Schwartz NN
AppelleeJohn Doe N
David E. Giamporcaro NN

Events
Event DateStatusDescriptionResult
01/01/1901IRON GATE INN INC. ET AL GENERAL FEDERATION OF WOMEN'S CLUBS
01/01/1903NOTE - 01 CON 86-900 *THIS IS LEAD CASE* NOTE - 01 NOTE - 02 050187 ORDER GRANT MO OF APLT- NOTE - 02 X-APLE FOR EXT TO FILE BR; BR NOTE - 03 OF APLT-X-APLE (GEN FED OF NOTE - 03 WOMEN) DUE W/IN 10 DAYS & BR NOTE - 04 OF APLES-X-APLT (IRON GATE INN NOTE - 04 DUE 30 DAYS THEREAFTER.
01/01/1905TRDATE- 87/11/19 ACTION - ARG ATTY 1 - PLESSERR FOR - GENL FEDERATION ATTY 2 - FRANTZD FOR - IRON GATE
01/01/1906 SCHWARTZA VACATED 12/23/87
05/23/1986FiledOPENING EVENT - Opening Event
06/04/1986RECEIVED CIVIL APPEAL STATEMENT RJG PANEL SCDATE 000000 SCHPRD
06/05/1986CIVIL APPEAL STATEMENT RJG PANEL SCDATE 060986 SCHPRD CAS
06/05/1986$50.00 DOCKETING FEE PANEL SCDATE 060986 SCHPRD CHECK
06/06/1986$5 PAID TO DC TREASURER VS PANEL SCDATE 000000 SCHPRD
07/29/1986ORDER CONS W/86-900; NO 7A; APLT TO FL DR/SRT IN 10 DAYS W/CLERK OF SUPER CRT & WITH THIS CRT. PANELPY SCDATE 061786 SCHPRD CHECK
08/08/1986DESIGNATION OF RECORD AND STATEMENT REGARDING TRANSCRIPT (APPELLEE) JB PANEL SCDATE 080886 SCHPRD DR
11/17/1986ORDER APLT-X-APLE TO TAKE NEC STEPS TO CAUSE REC TO BE PREPARED & TRANSMITTED FORTHWITH. EBP PANELPY SCDATE 092986 SCHPRD R
11/20/1986STATEMENT OF APPELLEE IN RESPONSE TO NOVEMBER 17TH COURT ORDER JB PANEL SCDATE 000000 SCHPRD
03/09/1987RECORD ON APPEAL (EXHIBITS 1 ENVELOPE) PB PANEL SCDATE 121786 SCHPRD R
04/09/1987SUPPLEMENTAL RECORD #1 (DEPOSITIONS) PB PANEL SCDATE 000000 SCHPRD
04/09/1987SUPPLEMENTAL RECORD #2 (EXHIBIT A) PB PANEL SCDATE 000000 SCHPRD
04/14/1987FiledRecord Completed
04/15/1987APLE-X-APLT MOTION TO EXTEND TIME TO FILE BRIEF UNTIL 10 DAYS AFTER TRANSCRIPT IS FILED (NO OPPO) JB PANEL SCDATE 042087 SCHPRD BEA
04/30/1987SUPPLEMENTAL RECORD #3 (286 PGS TOOBY - 118 PGS TOOBY - 476 PGS MACK) JB PANEL SCDATE 000000 SCHPRD
05/01/1987ORDER SEE NOTE FIELDS 02 - 04. EBP PANELPY SCDATE 042787 SCHPRD CHECK
05/08/1987SUPPLEMENTAL RECORD #4 (49 PGS - MACK) JB PANEL SCDATE 000000 SCHPRD
05/11/1987APPELLEE/CROSS-APPELLANT'S BRIEF PB PANEL SCDATE 051187 SCHPRD BEA
06/05/1987SUPPLEMENTAL RECORD #5 (MEMORANDUM & ORDER,PLAIN- TIFF'S SUPPLEMENTAL MEMO) PB PANEL SCDATE 000000 SCHPRD
06/10/1987FiledBriefing Completed
06/10/1987APPELLANT/CROSS-APPELLEE'S BRIEF JB PANEL SCDATE 061087 SCHPRD BAE
06/24/1987APPELLEE-CROSS-APPELLANT REPLY BRIEF PB PANEL SCDATE 000000 SCHPRD
11/16/1987APPEARANCE OF DAVID E. GIAMPORCARO FOR APPELLEE MLH PANEL SCDATE 000000 SCHPRD
11/19/1987FiledACTION - Argued / Submitted
11/19/1987ARGUED PANELPYFEBE SCDATE 000000 SCHPRD
12/17/1987MISCELLANEOUS PROCEDURAL MOTION OF APPELLEE CROSS-APPELLANT TO WITHDRAW APPR OF ALAN R. SCHWARTZ & ENTR RONALD PLESSER PANEL SCDATE 000000 SCHPRD
02/18/1988AFFIRMED IN PART/REVERSED IN PART JUDGMENT AF/RV IN PART...CAUSE REMANDED FOR FURTHER PRCDGS PANELPYFEBE SCDATE 000000 SCHPRD
02/18/1988DISP NO - 01 DISP - AFRV METH -OPN JUDGE -FE CITE 537 A.2d 1123
02/18/1988OPINION TYPE M JUDGE - FE PAGE # - 0293
03/10/1988MANDATE ISSUED PANEL SCDATE 000000 SCHPRD