judyrecords
search tips
630 million+
United States Court Cases

District Of Columbia Court Of Appeals Record

RANSOM, RAYMOND A. 3900 WATSON PLACE N.W. INC.

Case Information: 86-CV-0810
Short Caption:RANSOM, RAYMOND A. 3900 WATSON PLACE N.W. INC.Classification:Appeals - Civil - Other Civil
Superior Court or Agency Case Number:CA9470-83Filed Date:05/23/1986

Opening Event Date:05/23/1986Case Status:Closed
Record Completed:08/07/1987Post-Decision Matter Pending:
Briefs Completed:
Argued/Submitted:
Disposition:Next Scheduled Action:
Mandate Issued:07/19/1988

Party Information
Appellate RoleParty NameIFPAttorney(s)Arguing AttorneyE-Filer
AppellantJohn Doe N
William J. Bethune YN
AppelleeJohn Doe N
Paul M. ToulouseNY

Events
Event DateStatusDescriptionResult
01/01/1901RANSOM, RAYMOND A. ET AL 3900 WATSON PLACE N.W. INC. A CORPORATION
01/01/1903NOTE - 01 11/7/86 ORD: GRANT MO OF APLE NOTE - 01 TO EXT TM TO FILE SRT; APLTS NOTE - 02 SHALL MAKE NECESSARY ARRANGE- NOTE - 02 MENTS TO HAVE REC FILED NOTE - 03 FORTHWITH; APLTS' BRIEF DUE NOTE - 03 40 DAYS AFTER RECORD IS FILED NOTE - 04 062487 ORDER: REFERRING THIS NOTE - 04 MATTER TO TRIAL JUDGE FOR NOTE - 05 DETERMINATION AS TO WHY COURT NOTE - 05 REPORTER PALMER HAS NOT NOTE - 06 COMPLIED W/THIS CT'S 6/1/87 NOTE - 06 ORDER, & FOR DETERMINATION OF NOTE - 07 APPROPRIATE SANCTIONS. NOTE - 07
05/23/1986FiledOPENING EVENT - Opening Event
06/09/1986CIVIL APPEAL STATEMENT PANEL SCDATE 000000 SCHPRD
06/09/1986$50.00 DOCKETING FEE JB PANEL SCDATE 000000 SCHPRD
06/16/1986APPELLEE'S ANSWER/RESPONSE (ANSE/CAS COMBINED) TO CIVIL APPEAL STATEMENT RJG PANEL SCDATE 000000 SCHPRD
06/16/1986$5 PAID TO DC TREASURER VS PANEL SCDATE 000000 SCHPRD
07/23/1986MEMORANDUM NO 7A...DR/SRT DUE AUGUST 6th PANEL SCDATE 000000 SCHPRD
08/06/1986DESIGNATION OF RECORD JB PANEL SCDATE 080686 SCHPRD DR
08/06/1986STATEMENT REGARDING TRANSCRIPT(S) JB PANEL SCDATE 000000 SCHPRD
08/15/1986COUNTER DESIGNATION OF RECORD JB PANEL SCDATE 000000 SCHPRD
09/03/1986RECEIVED COPY OF APLE MO FILED IN SUPER CRT FOR AN ORD REQUIRING APLTS TO ORDER RT. ACG PANEL SCDATE 000000 SCHPRD
09/29/1986MISCELLANEOUS PROCEDURAL MOTION OF APLE TO EXTEND TIME TO FILE STATEMENT REGARDING TRANSCRIPT TO OCTOBER 6TH JB PANEL SCDATE 000000 SCHPRD
10/02/1986RECEIVED APPELLEE'S STATEMENT RE TRANSCRIPT GG PANEL SCDATE 000000 SCHPRD
11/07/1986ORDER SEE NOTE FIELDS 1 THRU 3 SL PANELPY SCDATE 101486 SCHPRD OPA
11/07/1986STATEMENT REGARDING TRANSCRIPT(S) BY APPELLEE SL PANEL SCDATE 000000 SCHPRD
11/13/1986MISCELLANEOUS PROCEDURAL MOTION OF APLT TO EXT TIME FOR TRANS- MISSION OF THE RT AS A SUPPLE- MENTAL RECORD (NO OPPO) JB PANEL SCDATE 000000 SCHPRD
11/13/1986RECORD ON APPEAL (EXHIBIT: 2 BLACK BINDERS SEPARATE) GG PANEL SCDATE 092286 SCHPRD R
12/12/1986SUPPLEMENTAL RECORD #1 (EXHHIBITS ONLY; 2 LARGE BROWN ENVELOPE) GG PANEL SCDATE 000000 SCHPRD
03/20/1987MISCELLANEOUS PROCEDURAL MOTION OF APLT TO EXTEND TIME TO FILE TRANSCRIPT AS SUPPLEMENTAL RECORD TO MARCH 31ST JB PANEL SCDATE 000000 SCHPRD
05/08/1987MISCELLANEOUS PROCEDURAL MOTION OF APPELLANT FOR AN ORDER DIRECTING COMPLETION AND TRANSMITTAL OF TRANSCRIPT JB PANEL SCDATE 000000 SCHPRD
05/20/1987APPELLEE'S ANSWER/RESPONSE TO APLT'S MOTION FOR ORDER DIRECTING COMPLETION OF TRANSCRIPT JB PANEL SCDATE 052087 SCHPRD OPE
06/01/1987ORDER GRANT APLT MO FOR COMP OF RT TO THE EXTENT THAT CR PALMER TO FILE RT BY 6/8/87-NFX. EBP PANELPY SCDATE 040187 SCHPRD OPE
06/24/1987ORDER SEE NOTE FIELDS 04 - 07. EBP PANELPY SCDATE 000000 SCHPRD
07/27/1987RECEIVED ORDER FROM JUDGE H. TAYLOR REGARDING COURT REPORTER JAMES PALMER'S TRANSCRIPT JB PANEL SCDATE 000000 SCHPRD
08/05/1987SUPPLEMENTAL RECORD #2 (5 PGS. - PALMER) PM PANEL SCDATE 060887 SCHPRD RT
08/05/1987SUPPLEMENTAL RECORD #2A (816 PGS. - PALMER) PM PANEL SCDATE 060887 SCHPRD RT
08/07/1987FiledRecord Completed
08/07/1987ACTION SLIP MAILED PM PANEL SCDATE 000000 SCHPRD
09/15/1987APPELLANT'S MOTION TO EXTEND TIME TO FILE BRIEF TO SEPTEMBER 30, 1987 RJG PANEL SCDATE 091687 SCHPRD BA
09/30/1987RECEIVED APPELLANT'S BRIEF & APPENDIX LIST PB PANEL SCDATE 000000 SCHPRD
10/01/1987SUPPLEMENTAL RECORD #1 (172 PGS - PALMER) JB PANEL SCDATE 000000 SCHPRD
10/09/1987APPELLANT'S BRIEF SL PANEL SCDATE 000000 SCHPRD
10/09/1987ORDER GRT APLT'S MO TO FILE BRIEF; CLK DIRTD TO FILE LODGED BRIEF APLE'S BRIEF DUE IN 30 DAYS SL PANELPY SCDATE 092887 SCHPRD OPE
11/09/1987APPELLEE'S MOTION TO EXTEND TIME TO FILE BRIEF TO NOVEMBER 23RD JB PANEL SCDATE 110987 SCHPRD BE
11/23/1987APPELLEE'S MOTION TO DISMISS/WITHDRAW APPEAL PB PANEL SCDATE 000000 SCHPRD
11/23/1987APPELLEE'S MOTION TO EXTEND TIME TO FILE BRIEF TO 10 DAYS FROM ACTION ON MOTION TO DISMISS APPEAL PB PANEL SCDATE 000000 SCHPRD
12/07/1987APPELLANT'S REPLY TO MOTION TO DISMISS RJG PANEL SCDATE 120787 SCHPRD OPA
06/23/1988FiledOUTCOME/DISPOSITION - Outcome-Disposition
06/23/1988ORDER GRANT MO TO DISMISS & DISMISS APPEAL AS MOOT. ACG PANELMKRO SCDATE 121787 SCHPRD CHECK
06/23/1988DISP NO - 01 DISP - DS METH -ORD JUDGE -PC CITE
07/19/1988MANDATE ISSUED PANEL SCDATE 000000 SCHPRD
11/22/1988LETTER TO APPEALS COORDINATOR & ATTYS RETURNING EXHIBITS RJG PANEL SCDATE 000000 SCHPRD