judyrecords
search tips
630 million+
United States Court Cases

District Of Columbia Court Of Appeals Record

GUTTENBERG, STEVEN A. MALAMENT, SELINE Z.

Case Information: 86-CV-0743
Short Caption:GUTTENBERG, STEVEN A. MALAMENT, SELINE Z.Classification:Appeals - Civil - Other Civil
Superior Court or Agency Case Number:CA1737-83Filed Date:04/29/1986

Opening Event Date:04/29/1986Case Status:Closed
Record Completed:11/10/1986Post-Decision Matter Pending:
Briefs Completed:
Argued/Submitted:
Disposition:Next Scheduled Action:
Mandate Issued:

Party Information
Appellate RoleParty NameIFPAttorney(s)Arguing AttorneyE-Filer
AppellantJohn Doe N
AppelleeJohn Doe N

Events
Event DateStatusDescriptionResult
01/01/1901GUTTENBERG, STEVEN A. MALAMENT, SELINE Z. ET AL
04/29/1986FiledOPENING EVENT - Opening Event
11/10/1986FiledRecord Completed
02/09/1987FiledOUTCOME/DISPOSITION - Outcome-Disposition
09/13/1990MEMORANDUM RETURNING DEPOSITIONS AJ PANEL SCDATE 000000 SCHPRD