judyrecords
search tips
630 million+
United States Court Cases

District Of Columbia Court Of Appeals Record

EVANS, PAUL G. CIVIL MOTIONS COMMISSIONER

Case Information: 86-CV-0744
Short Caption:EVANS, PAUL G. CIVIL MOTIONS COMMISSIONERClassification:Appeals - Civil - Other Civil
Superior Court or Agency Case Number:CA12240-84Filed Date:04/20/1986

Opening Event Date:04/20/1986Case Status:Closed
Record Completed:10/30/1986Post-Decision Matter Pending:
Briefs Completed:03/25/1987
Argued/Submitted:07/15/1987
Disposition:Next Scheduled Action:
Mandate Issued:

Party Information
Appellate RoleParty NameIFPAttorney(s)Arguing AttorneyE-Filer
AppellantPaul G NPro SeN
AppelleeJohn Doe N
Charles L. Reischel NN
AppelleeJohn Doe N
Karen S. Dworkin YN

Events
Event DateStatusDescriptionResult
01/01/1901EVANS, PAUL G. CIVIL MOTIONS COMMISSIONER OF SUPERIOR COURT
04/20/1986FiledOPENING EVENT - Opening Event
10/30/1986FiledRecord Completed
03/25/1987FiledBriefing Completed
07/15/1987FiledACTION - Argued / Submitted
07/16/1987FiledOUTCOME/DISPOSITION - Outcome-Disposition