judyrecords
search tips
630 million+
United States Court Cases

Nevada Supreme/Appellate Court Record

FRONTIER PACIFIC INSURANCE VS. AHERN RENTALS

Case Information: 38103
Short Caption:FRONTIER PACIFIC INSURANCE VS. AHERN RENTALSCourt:Supreme Court
Lower Court Case(s):Clark Co. - Eighth Judicial District - A403040
Clark Co. - Eighth Judicial District - A403411
Classification:Civil Appeal - General - Other
Disqualifications:ParraguirreCase Status:Remittitur Issued/Case Closed
Replacement:Panel Assigned: Panel
To SP/Judge:07/09/2001 / Berkson, LesterSP Status:Completed
Oral Argument:Oral Argument Location:
Submission Date:How Submitted:

+ Party Information

Docket Entries
DateTypeDescriptionPending?Document
06/29/2001Filing FeeReceived Filing Fee Paid on Filing. $200.00 from Faux & Associates--check no. 5064.
06/29/2001Notice of Appeal DocumentsFiled Certified Copy of Notice of Appeal/Settlement. Notice re: settlement conference program/suspension of rules mailed to all counsel. (Docketing statement mailed to counsel for appellant.) 01-11065
07/09/2001Settlement NoticeIssued Notice: Assignment to Settlement Program. Settlement Judge: Lester H. Berkson. (Briefing and preparation of transcripts suspended pending further order of this court.)
09/04/2001Order/ProceduralFiled Order. To date, appellant has failed to file the docketing statement. Appellant shall, within 10 days of the date of this order, file and serve the docketing statement. Failure to file a complete and accurate docketing statement in a timely manner may result in the imposition of sanctions. (Docketing statement mailed to counsel for appellant.) 01-14915
09/17/2001MotionFiled Motion. Frontier Pacific Insurance Company's Notice of Order Appointing California Insurance Commissioner as Conservator and Restraining Orders; and Request for Stay. 01-15704
02/25/2002Settlement Program ReportFiled Interim Settlement Program Report. The parties were unable to agree to a settlement of this matter. 02-03495
05/06/2002Order/ProceduralFiled Order. Order Staying Appeal. Cause appearing, we hereby stay this appeal pending further order of this court. Additionally, we vacate that portion of our September 4, 2001, order directing appellant to file a docketing statement. We direct appellant to serve a copy of this order upon the California Insurance Commissioner and the New York Superintendent, and to file proof of such service within 15 days. Appellant shall file a status report within 90 days informing this court whether the stay should continue. 02-07859
05/21/2002Notice/IncomingFiled Notice. Notice of Entry of Order. (Served on California Insurance Commissioner and New York Superintendent of Insurance.) 02-08946
08/29/2002Order/ProceduralFiled Order. As of the date of this order appellant has not filed a status report with this court. Accordingly, appellant shall have 20 days from the date of this order to file a status report. The report shall indicate whether this matter continues to be stayed and inform this court of the status of the California and New York court proceedings. If appellant informs this court that this matter is no longer stayed, appellant shall provide this court with supporting documentation, including any relevant orders of the California or New York courts. 02-15012
09/20/2002Notice/IncomingFiled Status Report. Frontier Pacific Insurance Company's Status Report Pursuant to the Court's Order. 02-16380
02/24/2003Order/ProceduralFiled Order/Status Report. Follow-up status report due from appellant: 90 days from the date of this order. If appellant informs this court that this matter is no longer stayed, appellant shall provide this court with supporting documentation, including any relevant orders of the California or New York court. 03-03020
06/27/2003Order/ProceduralFiled Order/Status Report. Because this case remains on this court's active docket, appellant shall file a follow-up status report within 30 days from the date of this order. We caution counsel for appellant that failure to comply timely with this order may result in the imposition of sanctions. 03-10833
06/27/2003MotionFiled Motion. Motion to Withdraw as Attorney of Record for Frontier Insurance Company. 03-10861
01/15/2004Order/ProceduralFiled Order. Re: Conclusion of Settlement Proceedings and Directing the Filing of a Status Report. The settlement judge has filed a report indicating that the parties were unable to agree to a settlement of this appeal. Accordingly, the settlement proceedings are concluded. On May 6, 2002, this court entered an order staying this appeal pursuant to appellant's request. That request was made due to orders entered in courts in the states of New York and California, respectively, that stayed all actions involving appellant. We have entered two other orders directing counsel for appellant to file a status report regarding the stay. As of the date of this order, counsel has not filed any such report. On June 27, 2003, however, counsel for appellant did file a motion to withdraw as counsel of record in this appeal. We note that any motion to withdraw as counsel must be served upon the client. While counsel's previous reports indicated that the Superintendent of Insurance for the State of New York was named as the 'temporary rehabilitator' of appellant, those reports also indicated that the Commissioner of Insurance of the State of California was appointed as 'conservator' of appellant for the legal action in that state. Accordingly, it appears that service upon only the New York State Insurance Department may not be adequate under Womack. Further, this appeal remains on this court's active docket. Accordingly, we deny counsel's motion to withdraw. This denial, however, is without prejudice to counsel's right to file a motion to withdraw after the stay has been lifted. Counsel for appellant shall file a status report with this court within 30 days informing this court whether the stay should continue. That report shall include any relevant orders from the California or New York state courts that may effect the status of this appeal. 04-00919
02/17/2004Notice/IncomingFiled Status Report. Frontier Pacific Insurance Company's Status Report Pursuant to the Court's Order. 04-02964
02/17/2004Notice/IncomingFiled Status Report. Frontier Pacific Insurance Company's Status Report Pursuant to the Court's Order. 04-03017
12/29/2004OtherDisqualification of Justice Parraguirre. Sat in district court proceedings.
07/31/2006Order/DispositionalFiled Order Dismissing Appeal. "We dismiss this appeal." This dismissal is without prejudice to appellant's right to mover for reinstatement of this appeal upon final resolution of the liquidation proceedings, if appellant deems such a motion appropriate at that time. SNP06-WM/MG/JH 06-15907
08/25/2006RemittiturIssued Remittitur. 06-16660
08/25/2006Case Status Update Remittitur Issued/Case Closed.
08/31/2006RemittiturFiled Remittitur. Received by County Clerk on August 28, 2006. 06-16660