judyrecords
search tips
720 million+
United States Court Cases

Wyoming Supreme/Appellate Court Record

COLTEN CHRISTOPHER ROPER v. THE STATE OF WYOMING

Case Heading (06-225)
Case Number:06-225Case Docketed On:10/03/2006
Status:Closed
Original Court:Eighth Judicial District Converse CountyCase Type:Direct Appeal - Criminal - Offenses Against the Person 6-2-101 - 6-2-509
Short Title:COLTEN CHRISTOPHER ROPER v. THE STATE OF WYOMING
Full Title:COLTEN CHRISTOPHER ROPER, Appellant (Defendant), v. THE STATE OF WYOMING, Appellee (Plaintiff).

- Party Information
RoleParty NameAttorney(s)
AppellantColten Christopher RoperD. Terry Rogers
Donna D. Domonkos
AppelleeThe State of WyomingPatrick J. Crank
Paul S. Rehurek
D. Michael Pauling

- Case Decision Information
Issues:
Opinion Number:
Citation:

Docketing Filter View
Display:

Docket Information
Filing DateDocument DescriptionDocket Entry TypeDocket Entry SubtypeStatus
10/03/2006Event - Docketed and indexedEventDocketed and indexedFinal
10/03/2006Notice-Incoming - Record completion notice from district courtNotice-IncomingRecord completion notice from district courtFinal
10/03/2006Notice-Outgoing - Docketing letterNotice-OutgoingDocketing letterFinal
11/17/2006Motion - Extension of time - briefMotionExtension of time - briefFinal
11/20/2006Order - Grant - extension of time - brief of appellantOrderGrant - extension of timeFinal
01/03/2007Motion - Dismiss - voluntary with wavier (FAX)MotionDismiss - voluntary with waiverFinal
01/04/2007Order - Dismiss - voluntary or stipulatedOrderDismiss - voluntary or stipulatedFinal
01/04/2007Event - Case closedEventCase closedFinal
01/08/2007Notice-Incoming - Waiver of appeal - originalNotice-IncomingWaiver of appealFinal