judyrecords
search tips
630 million+
United States Court Cases

District Of Columbia Court Of Appeals Record

HAGNER MANAGEMENT CORPORATION LAWSON, SUSANNA

Case Information: 86-CV-0745
Short Caption:HAGNER MANAGEMENT CORPORATION LAWSON, SUSANNAClassification:Appeals - Civil - Landlord And Tenant
Superior Court or Agency Case Number:LT13679-86Filed Date:04/29/1986

Opening Event Date:04/29/1986Case Status:Closed
Record Completed:07/30/1986Post-Decision Matter Pending:
Briefs Completed:06/30/1987
Argued/Submitted:10/20/1987
Disposition:Next Scheduled Action:
Mandate Issued:

Party Information
Appellate RoleParty NameIFPAttorney(s)Arguing AttorneyE-Filer
AppellantJohn Doe N
Stephen H. Abraham YN
AppelleeJohn Doe N
Nigel L. ScottNY

Events
Event DateStatusDescriptionResult
01/01/1901HAGNER MANAGEMENT CORPORATION LAWSON, SUSANNA
04/29/1986FiledOPENING EVENT - Opening Event
07/30/1986FiledRecord Completed
06/30/1987FiledBriefing Completed
10/20/1987FiledACTION - Argued / Submitted
12/04/1987FiledOUTCOME/DISPOSITION - Outcome-Disposition