judyrecords
search tips
630 million+
United States Court Cases

District Of Columbia Court Of Appeals Record

LARRY GREENE V. UNITED STATES

Case Information: 87-CF-0223
Short Caption:LARRY GREENE V. UNITED STATESClassification:Appeals - Criminal Felony - Robbery Related
Superior Court or Agency Case Number:F8766-85Filed Date:02/27/1987

Opening Event Date:02/27/1987Case Status:Closed
Record Completed:04/29/1987Post-Decision Matter Pending:
Briefs Completed:06/15/1988
Argued/Submitted:12/06/1988
Disposition:Next Scheduled Action:
Mandate Issued:12/30/1988

Party Information
Appellate RoleParty NameIFPAttorney(s)Arguing AttorneyE-Filer
AppellantLarry Greene N
J. Andrew Chopivsky YN
AppelleeUnited StatesN
John R. Fisher YN
W. Mark Nebeker YN

Events
Event DateStatusDescriptionResult
01/01/1901GREENE, LARRY UNITED STATES
02/27/1987FiledOPENING EVENT - Opening Event
04/15/1987APPOINTING COUNSEL/CO REFERRAL (CJA) J. ANDREW CHOPIVSKY, ESQ. PANEL SCDATE 000000 SCHPRD
04/27/1987APPELLANT'S DOCKETING STATEMENT PB PANEL SCDATE 042787 SCHPRD DSA
04/29/1987FiledRecord Completed
04/29/1987RECORD ON APPEAL GG PANEL SCDATE 042887 SCHPRD R
08/21/1987SUPPLEMENTAL RECORD #1 (210 PGS. - MITCHELL) PM PANEL SCDATE 000000 SCHPRD
01/05/1988ORDER APLT BR DUE W/IN 40 DAYS. EBP PANELPY SCDATE 123187 SCHPRD EBP
02/09/1988APPELLANT'S MOTION TO EXTEND TIME TO FILE BRIEF TO MARCH 15TH (NO OPPO) JB (EBP) PANEL SCDATE 021688 SCHPRD BA
03/15/1988APPELLANT'S BRIEF RJG PANEL SCDATE 031588 SCHPRD BA
04/18/1988APPELLEE'S MOTION TO EXTEND TIME TO FILE BRIEF TO 5//19/88 (NO OPA) MLH PANEL SCDATE 041988 SCHPRD BE
04/21/1988ORDER GRT APLE MO FO EXT OF TM TO FL BRF TO 5/19/88-NFX PB PANELPY SCDATE 041988 SCHPRD V
05/17/1988APPELLEE'S MOTION TO EXTEND TIME TO FILE BRIEF TO JUNE 16TH (NO OPPO) JB PANEL SCDATE 051988 SCHPRD BE
05/20/1988ORDER GRANT MO OF APLE TO EXT TM TO FL BRF TO 6/16/88; NFX. DAS PANELPY SCDATE 051888 SCHPRD V
06/15/1988FiledBriefing Completed
06/15/1988APPELEE'S BRIEF GT PANEL SCDATE 061688 SCHPRD BE
12/06/1988FiledACTION - Argued / Submitted
12/06/1988SUBMITTED PANELRGMKRY SCDATE 000000 SCHPRD
12/09/1988AFFIRMED MOJ AF CONVICTION ON APPEAL PANELRGMKRY SCDATE 000000 SCHPRD
12/09/1988DISP NO - 01 DISP - AF METH -MOJ JUDGE -PC CITE
12/30/1988MANDATE ISSUED PANEL SCDATE 000000 SCHPRD