judyrecords
search tips
630 million+
United States Court Cases

District Of Columbia Court Of Appeals Record

CARL HENDERSON V. UNITED STATES

Case Information: 87-CF-0225
Short Caption:CARL HENDERSON V. UNITED STATESClassification:Appeals - Criminal Felony - Assault Related
Superior Court or Agency Case Number:F9036-85Filed Date:03/03/1987

Opening Event Date:03/03/1987Case Status:Closed
Record Completed:12/29/1987Post-Decision Matter Pending:
Briefs Completed:10/27/1988
Argued/Submitted:04/06/1989
Disposition:Next Scheduled Action:
Mandate Issued:07/28/1989

Party Information
Appellate RoleParty NameIFPAttorney(s)Arguing AttorneyE-Filer
AppellantCarl Henderson N
James W. KleinNY
AppellantCarl Henderson N
Bernard Jay Williams YN
AppelleeUnited StatesN
John R. Fisher YN
Su Zann Lamb YN

Events
Event DateStatusDescriptionResult
01/01/1901HENDERSON, CARL AKA ABDUL K. TAWAAB UNITED STATES
01/01/1903NOTE - 01 6/28/88 ORD: GRANT MO TO W/D NOTE - 01 PENDG MO TO PROCEED PRO SE OF NOTE - 02 APLT; GRANT MO OF COUNSEL FORA NOTE - 02 APLT TO W/D & VACATE APPMT OF NOTE - 03 JAMES KLEIN & APPT BERNARD JAY NOTE - 03 WILLIAMS FOR APLT; BRF OF APLT NOTE - 04 DUE IN 40 DAYS. NOTE - 04
01/01/1904JUDGE - FA AUTHOR - RECUSED - Y
01/01/1906 PDS VACATED 6/28/88.
03/03/1987FiledOPENING EVENT - Opening Event
03/27/1987ORDER APPOINTING JAMES KLEIN, ESQ. AS COUNSEL FOR APLT. DOCKETING STATEMENT DUE IN 10 DAYS GG PANELPY SCDATE 000000 SCHPRD
04/14/1987RECEIVED NOTICE OF TRANSCRIPT ORDERED BY APPELLANT JB PANEL SCDATE 000000 SCHPRD
04/14/1987RECEIVED APLT'S DOCKETING STATEMENT PANEL SCDATE 000000 SCHPRD
04/17/1987APPELLANT'S MOTION FOR LEAVE TO FILE DS TTC PANEL SCDATE 000000 SCHPRD
04/29/1987RECORD ON APPEAL GG PANEL SCDATE 050487 SCHPRD R
05/19/1987APPELLANT'S DOCKETING STATEMENT TTC PANEL SCDATE 000000 SCHPRD
12/29/1987FiledRecord Completed
12/29/1987ACTION SLIP MAILED JB PANEL SCDATE 000000 SCHPRD
12/29/1987SUPPLEMENTAL RECORD #1 (313 PGS - BURNEY) JB PANEL SCDATE 051987 SCHPRD RT
02/05/1988APPELLANT'S MOTION TO EXTEND TIME TO FILE BRIEF TO 3/8/88 (NO OPE) MLH PANEL SCDATE 020888 SCHPRD BA EXTDTE 030888
03/08/1988APPELLANT'S MOTION TO EXTEND TIME TO FILE BRIEF TO 4/7/88 (NO OPPO) PB PANEL SCDATE 030888 SCHPRD BA
03/21/1988ORDER GRT APLT'S MO FOR EXT OF TM TO FILE BRF TO 4/7/88 - NFX PB PANELPY SCDATE 031088 SCHPRD N
04/07/1988APPELLANT'S MOTION TO EXTEND TIME TO FILE BRIEF TO 5/7/88 (NO OPPO) GT PANEL SCDATE 040788 SCHPRD BA
04/18/1988ORDER GRT APLT MO FO EXT OF TM TO FL BRF ONLY TO EXTENT THAT BRF TO BE FILED IN 10 DAYS.-ANFX PB PANELPY SCDATE 041388 SCHPRD V
04/28/1988COUNSEL'S MOTION TO WITHDRAW FOR BUSINESS REASONS FOR APPELLANT & TO ALLOW AP- PELLANT TO FILE BRIEF PRO SE MLH PANEL SCDATE 042888 SCHPRD BA
06/10/1988COUNSEL'S MOTION TO WITHDRAW FOR BUSINESS REASONS FOR APPOINTMENT OF SUCCESSOR COUNSEL & TO WITHDRAW MOTION TO PRECEES PRO SE JB PANEL SCDATE 050988 SCHPRD OPE
06/28/1988APPOINTING COUNSEL/CO REFERRAL (CJA) BERNARD JAY WILLIAMS, ESQ. PANEL SCDATE 000000 SCHPRD
06/28/1988ORDER SEE NOTE FIELDS 01-04. DAS PANELPY SCDATE 062188 SCHPRD GG
07/29/1988APPELLANT'S BRIEF RJG PANEL SCDATE 080888 SCHPRD BA
08/23/1988APPELLEE'S MOTION TO EXTEND TIME TO FILE BRIEF TO 9/29/88 GT PB PANEL SCDATE 090188 SCHPRD BE
09/22/1988APPELLEE'S MOTION TO EXTEND TIME TO FILE BRIEF TO OCTOBER 27TH (NO OPPO) JB PANEL SCDATE 092988 SCHPRD BE
09/28/1988ORDER GRT APLE'S MO FO EXT OF TM TO FL BRF TO 10/27/88-NFX PB PANELPY SCDATE 092688 SCHPRD V
10/27/1988FiledBriefing Completed
10/27/1988APPELEE'S BRIEF AD PANEL SCDATE 102788 SCHPRD BE
04/06/1989FiledACTION - Argued / Submitted
04/06/1989SUBMITTED PANELNWSTPY SCDATE 000000 SCHPRD
04/17/1989AFFIRMED MOJ AF JUDGMENT ON APPEAL PANELNWSTPY SCDATE 000000 SCHPRD
04/17/1989DISP NO - 01 DISP - AF METH -MOJ JUDGE -PC CITE
05/01/1989MOTION TO EXT TM TO FILE PET FOR REH/REH EN BANC UNTIL APPELLANT IS TRANSFERED TO ANOTHER INSTITUTION GT PANEL SCDATE 000000 SCHPRD
05/08/1989ORDER GRT APLT'S MO TO FILE PETITION AND THE PET FOR REH/REH EB SHALL BE FILED W/I 30 DAYS SL PANELRO SCDATE 051589 SCHPRD OPE
06/02/1989MOTION TO EXT TM TO FILE PET FOR REH/REH EN BANC APPELLANT, PRO SE, TO 7/7/89 MLR PANEL SCDATE 000000 SCHPRD
06/26/1989ORDER GRT APLT'S PRO SE MOTION AND THE PET FOR REH/REH EB SHALL BE FILED BY 7/7/89 (NFX) SL PANELRO SCDATE 061989 SCHPRD CHECK
07/10/1989RECEIVED APPELLANT'S PRO SE PETITION FOR REHEARING EN BANC MLR PANEL SCDATE 070789 SCHPRD MRRB
07/13/1989RECEIVED LETTER FROM APPELLANT RE: NEW ADDRESS & REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF TIME GT PANEL SCDATE 000000 SCHPRD
07/28/1989MANDATE ISSUED PANEL SCDATE 000000 SCHPRD
11/03/1989NOTICE OF FILING A PETITION FOR WRIT OF CERTIORARIFILED IN U.S. SUPREME COURT ON 10-28-89 #89-5918 AD DENIED 12/11/89 PANEL SCDATE 000000 SCHPRD