judyrecords
search tips
630 million+
United States Court Cases

District Of Columbia Court Of Appeals Record

BUSSELL, HELEN L. BERKSHIRE ASSOCIATES

Case Information: 86-CV-0739
Short Caption:BUSSELL, HELEN L. BERKSHIRE ASSOCIATESClassification:Appeals - Civil - Other Civil
Superior Court or Agency Case Number:CA8019-84Filed Date:05/02/1986

Opening Event Date:05/02/1986Case Status:Closed
Record Completed:06/26/1986Post-Decision Matter Pending:
Briefs Completed:09/22/1986
Argued/Submitted:01/22/1987
Disposition:Next Scheduled Action:
Mandate Issued:

Party Information
Appellate RoleParty NameIFPAttorney(s)Arguing AttorneyE-Filer
AppellantHelen L. Bussell NPro SeN
AppelleeJohn Doe N
Charles R. Lyons YN
AppelleeJohn Doe N
Richard R. Rhodes NN
AppelleeJohn Doe N
Mary T. Porter NN

Events
Event DateStatusDescriptionResult
01/01/1901BUSSELL, HELEN L. BERKSHIRE ASSOCIATES ET AL
05/02/1986FiledOPENING EVENT - Opening Event
06/26/1986FiledRecord Completed
09/22/1986FiledBriefing Completed
01/22/1987FiledACTION - Argued / Submitted
08/25/1987FiledOUTCOME/DISPOSITION - Outcome-Disposition