judyrecords
search tips
630 million+
United States Court Cases

District Of Columbia Court Of Appeals Record

RONG YAO ZHOU V. JENNIFER MALL RESTAURANT

Case Information: 86-CV-0809
Short Caption:RONG YAO ZHOU V. JENNIFER MALL RESTAURANTClassification:Appeals - Civil - Other Civil
Superior Court or Agency Case Number:CA5771-84Filed Date:05/23/1986

Opening Event Date:05/23/1986Case Status:Closed
Record Completed:07/26/1986Post-Decision Matter Pending:
Briefs Completed:11/14/1986
Argued/Submitted:04/07/1987
Disposition:Next Scheduled Action:
Mandate Issued:

Party Information
Appellate RoleParty NameIFPAttorney(s)Arguing AttorneyE-Filer
Amicus-AppellantJohn Doe N
Stephen J. O'BrienYN
AppellantRong Yao Zhou N
Robert Cadeaux YN
AppellantJohn Doe N
Frederic W. Schwartz, Jr.NY
AppelleeJohn Doe N
Richard L. Fritts NN
AppelleeJennifer Mall RestaurantN
Joseph P. Clancy YN

Events
Event DateStatusDescriptionResult
01/01/1901ZHOU, RONG YAO JENNIFER MALL RESTAURANT
01/01/1906 SCHWARTZF SEND ORDERS TO SCHWARTZ OBRIENS WASH. REST. & BEV. ASSOC.
05/23/1986FiledOPENING EVENT - Opening Event
07/26/1986FiledRecord Completed
11/14/1986FiledBriefing Completed
04/07/1987FiledACTION - Argued / Submitted
12/04/1987FiledOUTCOME/DISPOSITION - Outcome-Disposition