judyrecords
search tips
630 million+
United States Court Cases

District Of Columbia Court Of Appeals Record

RONALD R. DAVIS V. UNITED STATES

Case Information: 88-CF-1292
Short Caption:RONALD R. DAVIS V. UNITED STATESClassification:Appeals - Criminal Felony - Homicide
Lead:88-CF-1292Consolidated: 89-CF-0224
Superior Court or Agency Case Number:F2943-87Filed Date:09/26/1988

Opening Event Date:09/26/1988Case Status:Closed
Record Completed:Post-Decision Matter Pending:
Briefs Completed:
Argued/Submitted:09/09/1993
Disposition:Next Scheduled Action:
Mandate Issued:11/03/1993

Party Information
Appellate RoleParty NameIFPAttorney(s)Arguing AttorneyE-Filer
AppellantRonald R. Davis N
Stuart F. JohnsonYY
AppelleeUnited StatesN
John R. Fisher NN

Events
Event DateStatusDescriptionResult
01/01/1901DAVIS, RONALD R. UNITED STATES
01/01/1902PP 10/29/90 REG CAL RESCHD WITH 91-101 & 88-1292
01/01/1903NOTE - 01 4/24/89 ORD: SS, CONS 88-1292 NOTE - 01 & 89-224; STUART F. JOHNSON NOTE - 02 APPTD FOR APLT; APLT IN 89-224 NOTE - 02 TO FL DSA IN 10 DAYS. NOTE - 03 CON 89-224 NOTE - 03 NOTE - 04 05/31/90 ORD: GRT APLE MO X TM NOTE - 04 TO FL LODGED BRF & APPEAL NOTE - 05 SHALL BE SCHEDULED FOR NOTE - 05 CONSIDERATION BEFORE A MERITS NOTE - 06 DIVISION AS SOON AS THE NOTE - 06 CALENDAR PERMITS. NOTE - 07 102690 ORD: GRANT APLT'S MOT NOTE - 07 TO PP, CASE REMOVED FROM 10/29 NOTE - 08 CALENDAR; F/O COUNSEL MAY FILE NOTE - 08 MOT TO REMAND TO SUP CT. UPON NOTE - 09 INDICATION OF WILLINGNESS OF NOTE - 09 TRIAL CT TO GRANT; COUNSEL TO NOTE - 10 NOTIFY THIS COURT IN WRITING NOTE - 10 UPON RESOLUTION OF MOTION. NOTE - 11 03/04/91 ORD: SS, NOS. 88-1292 NOTE - 11 89-224, & 91-121 ARE CONS; F/O NOTE - 12 STUART F. JOHNSON, ESQ, IS NOTE - 12 APPNTD TO REPRESENT APLT IN NOTE - 13 NO. 91-121; F/O COUNS FOR APLT NOTE - 13 TO FL DSA IN NO 91-121 W/IN 10 NOTE - 14 DAYS. NOTE - 14 NOTE - 15 CONS: 91-121 (DISMISSED||) NOTE - 15
09/26/1988NOTICE OF APPEAL
10/24/1988APPOINTING COUNSEL/CO REFERRAL (CJA) STUART F. JOHNSON, ESQ. PANEL SCDATE 000000 SCHPRD
10/27/1988APPELLANT'S DOCKETING STATEMENT JB PANEL SCDATE 110388 SCHPRD DSA
02/15/1989RECORD ON APPEAL AD PANEL SCDATE 112588 SCHPRD R
02/15/1989SUPPLEMENTAL RECORD #1(525 PGS/BREMEN)(16 PG/HART) (558 PGS/RAMOS) AD PANEL SCDATE 110788 SCHPRD RT
02/24/1989SUPPLEMENTAL RECORD #2(ORDER JUDGE KESSLER 10-19-88 AND ORIGINAL EXHIBITS AD PANEL SCDATE 000000 SCHPRD
03/24/1989ORDER SEE NOTE FIELDS 01 & 02. DAS PANELMK SCDATE 000000 SCHPRD
04/03/1989APPELLANT'S DOCKETING STATEMENT IN 89-224 JB PANEL SCDATE 040389 SCHPRD DSA
07/12/1989ACTION SLIP MAILED AD PANEL SCDATE 000000 SCHPRD
07/12/1989SUPPLEMENTAL RECORD #3(482 PGS/SIMMS) AD PANEL SCDATE 063089 SCHPRD RT
08/17/1989APPELLANT'S MOTION TO EXTEND TIME TO FILE BRIEF TO 9-20-89 AD PANEL SCDATE 082189 SCHPRD BA
08/24/1989ORDER GRANT APLT MO TO EXT TM TO FL BRF TO 9/20/89. MEH PANELRBH SCDATE 081889 SCHPRD V
09/19/1989APPELLANT'S MOTION TO EXTEND TIME TO FILE BRIEF TO 10/20/89 (NO OPPO) GG PANEL SCDATE 092089 SCHPRD BA
10/02/1989ORDER GRANT APLT MO TO EXT TM TO FL BRF TO 10/20/89; NFX. MEH PANELRBH SCDATE 092189 SCHPRD M
10/20/1989APPELLANT'S MOTION TO EXTEND TIME TO FILE BRIEF TO 11-10-89 NO OPPO AD PANEL SCDATE 102089 SCHPRD BA
10/24/1989LETTER FROM APPELLANT'S COUNSEL RE: THE FILING OF THE BRIEF RJG PANEL SCDATE 000000 SCHPRD
10/30/1989LETTER FROM APLT'S COUNSEL W/ATTACH- MENTS RE: BRIEF RJG PANEL SCDATE 000000 SCHPRD
11/01/1989ORDER GRANT APLT MO TO EXT TM TO FL BRF TO 11/10/89; NFX. GW PANELRBH SCDATE 102389 SCHPRD V
11/13/1989APPELLANT'S MOTION TO EXTEND TIME TO FILE BRIEF TO NOVEMBER 20, 1989 NO OPPO AJ PANEL SCDATE 111089 SCHPRD BA
11/20/1989APPELLANT'S MOTION TO EXTEND TIME TO FILE BRIEF TO 11-21-89 AD PANEL SCDATE 000000 SCHPRD
11/21/1989APLT MO FOR LEAVE TO FILE BRIEF IN EXCESS OF PAGESAD PANEL SCDATE 000000 SCHPRD
11/21/1989RECEIVED APPELLANT'S BRIEF AD PANEL SCDATE 000000 SCHPRD
12/21/1989ORDER DENY APLT'S MO FOR LV TO EX- CEED PG LIMIT; APLT TO FL IN 15 DAYS BRF IN CONFORMANCE. MH PANELRO SCDATE 112089 SCHPRD CHECK
01/05/1990APPELLANT'S MOTION TO EXTEND TIME TO FILE BRIEF TO FEBRUARY 5, 1990 (NO OPPO) RJG PANEL SCDATE 010890 SCHPRD BA
01/18/1990ORDER GRANT APLT'S MO TO EXT TM TO FILE BRIEF TO 2/5/90; NFX. GW PANELRBH SCDATE 010890 SCHPRD M
02/05/1990APPELLANT'S MOTION TO EXTEND TIME TO FILE BRIEF TO FEBRUARY 9, 1990 (NO OPPO) RJG PANEL SCDATE 020590 SCHPRD BA
02/12/1990APPELLANT'S MOTION FOR LEAVE TO FILE BRIEF AND MOTION TO EXCEED PAGE LIMIT TO BA AD PANEL SCDATE 000000 SCHPRD
02/12/1990RECEIVED BA AND APDX AD PANEL SCDATE 000000 SCHPRD
03/09/1990APPELLANT'S BRIEF & APDX MEH PANEL SCDATE 000000 SCHPRD
03/09/1990ORDER GRANT APLT'S MO TO FL BRF & APDX IN EXCESS OF PG LIMIT; APLE BRF DUE IN 30 DAYS. MEH PANELRO SCDATE 030590 SCHPRD K
04/09/1990APPELLEE'S MOTION TO EXTEND TIME TO FILE BRIEF TO MAY 9, 1990 (NO OPPO) RJG PANEL SCDATE 040990 SCHPRD BE
04/20/1990ORDER GRT APLE'S MO X TM TO FL BRF TO 05/09/90. NFX JJ PANEL SCDATE 041390 SCHPRD B
05/09/1990APPELLEE'S MOTION TO EXTEND TIME TO FILE BRIEF TO 5-16-90 NO OPPO AD PANEL SCDATE 050990 SCHPRD BE
05/17/1990RECEIVED APPELLEE'S BRIEF AD PANEL SCDATE 000000 SCHPRD
05/31/1990APPELEE'S BRIEF JJ PANEL SCDATE 000000 SCHPRD
05/31/1990ORDER SEE NOTE FIELDS 04 THRU 06. JJ PANELRBH SCDATE 051190 SCHPRD B
10/22/1990MEMORANDUM TRANSMITTING RBA TO DIVISION. MEH PANELFF SCDATE 000000 SCHPRD
10/22/1990APPELLANT'S REPLY BRIEF AJ PANEL SCDATE 000000 SCHPRD
10/24/1990MISCELLANEOUS PROCEDURAL MOTION OF APLT TO CONTINUE ORAL ARGUMENT AD PANEL SCDATE 000000 SCHPRD
10/25/1990APPELLEE'S REPLY TO APPELLANT'S REQUEST TO CONTINUE ORAL ARGUMENT RJG PANEL SCDATE 000000 SCHPRD
10/26/1990ORDER SEE NOTE FIELDS 07-10. MEH PANELFESCWA SCDATE 102590 SCHPRD VS
03/05/1991ORDER SEE NOTE FIELDS 11 THRU 14 GW PANELRO SCDATE 000000 SCHPRD
05/23/1991ORDER BA IN 90-121 DUE 7/31/91, BE IN 90-121 DUE 9/4/91, RBA IN 90-121 DUE 9/23/91, DEC CAL. PANEL SCDATE 000000 SCHPRD
07/31/1991APPELLANT'S MOTION TO EXTEND TIME TO FILE BRIEF IN 91-121 TO AUGUST 2, 1991 UNOPPOSED RJG PANEL SCDATE 073191 SCHPRD BA
08/23/1991APPELLANT'S BRIEF IN 91-121. EVH PANEL SCDATE 000000 SCHPRD
08/23/1991ORDER GR MO OF APLT FR 2 DAY EXT TO FL BRF IN NO. 91-121; LDGD BRF FILED. EVH PANELRBH SCDATE 082191 SCHPRD V
09/04/1991APPELLEE'S MOTION TO DISMISS/WITHDRAW APPEAL IN 91-121 PMB PANEL SCDATE 090491 SCHPRD BE
09/13/1991APPELLANT'S OPPOSITION TO MDSE IN 91-121 PMB PANEL SCDATE 000000 SCHPRD
09/23/1991ORDER MO OF APLE REFERRED TO MO DIV; CRT'S 5/23/91 ORD IS VACATED. EVH PANELRO SCDATE 091291 SCHPRD V
01/10/1992ORDER GRANT MO OF APLE TO DISMISS 91-121; SCHED 89-224 & 88-1292 AS SOON AS CAL PERMITS. DAS PANELTEKGBE SCDATE 000000 SCHPRD
03/31/1992ORDER-Grant appellant's motion to continue oral argument and that these appeals are hereby removed from the regular calendar of Wednesday, April 1, 1992, at 9:30 a.m. (TEKGMK)
02/22/1993ORDER - Counsel for appellant shall advise this court within 30 days of the date of this order as to the status of the trial court proceedings JWR
02/22/1993CHECK
03/22/1993STATEMENT of aplt in response to 2/22/93 order
03/24/1993MEMORANDUM - Transmitting to division appellant's response to this court's order of February 22, 1993. JAC
04/27/1993APPELLANT'S MOTION REQUESTING ORAL ARGUMENT
07/26/1993ORDER - Deny appellant's notice and motion to calendar for oral argument the above appeals. JWR
09/03/1993CERTIFICATE PER RULE 28
09/07/1993CERTIFICATE PER RULE 28
09/08/1993MEMORANDUM - Transmitting to division correspondence received from counsel for appellant pursuant to Rule 28 (k)
09/09/1993FiledACTION - Argued / Submitted
09/09/1993ARGUED (RO,ST,KG) Stuart Fisk Johnson, Esquire, for appellant. Leslie Blackmon, Esquire, for appellee.
10/12/1993AFFIRMED (RO, ST, KG) MOJ
11/03/1993MANDATE ISSUED