judyrecords
search tips
630 million+
United States Court Cases

District Of Columbia Court Of Appeals Record

TYREE HARPER V. UNITED STATES

Case Information: 88-CF-1200
Short Caption:TYREE HARPER V. UNITED STATESClassification:Appeals - Criminal Felony - Drug Related
Superior Court or Agency Case Number:F13466-87Filed Date:09/16/1988

Opening Event Date:09/16/1988Case Status:Closed
Record Completed:Post-Decision Matter Pending:
Briefs Completed:
Argued/Submitted:
Disposition:Next Scheduled Action:
Mandate Issued:11/16/1989

Party Information
Appellate RoleParty NameIFPAttorney(s)Arguing AttorneyE-Filer
AppellantTyree Harper N
K. Duff Lewis NN
AppelleeUnited StatesN
John R. Fisher NN

Events
Event DateStatusDescriptionResult
01/01/1901HARPER, TYREE UNITED STATES
09/16/1988FiledOPENING EVENT - Opening Event
09/29/1988APPOINTING COUNSEL/CO REFERRAL (CJA) K. DUFF LEWIS, ESQ. PANEL SCDATE 000000 SCHPRD
10/28/1988ORDER APLT IN 10 DAYS TO FILE DSA IN 10 DAYS - NFX. EBP PANELPY SCDATE 101188 SCHPRD DSA
11/08/1988APPELLANT'S DOCKETING STATEMENT JB PANEL SCDATE 110788 SCHPRD DSA
01/25/1989RECORD ON APPEAL GT PANEL SCDATE 112288 SCHPRD R
04/12/1989SUPPLEMENTAL RECORD #1(194 PGS/MOORE) AD PANEL SCDATE 063089 SCHPRD RT
06/16/1989SUPPLEMENTAL RECORD #2 (344 PGS. -- CALHOUN) RJG PANEL SCDATE 040189 SCHPRD RT
09/22/1989ORDER COUNSEL FOR APLT TO FL BRF IN 10 OR REFERRED TO BPR. DAS PANELRBH SCDATE 072689 SCHPRD BA
10/02/1989APPELLANT'S MOTION TO EXTEND TIME TO FILE BRIEF TO 10-16-89 AD PANEL SCDATE 100289 SCHPRD BA
10/12/1989ORDER GRANT APLT MO TO EXT TM TO FL BRF TO 10/16/89; NFX. MEH PANELRBH SCDATE 101089 SCHPRD M
10/16/1989APPELLANT'S MOTION TO DISMISS/WITHDRAW APPEAL RJG PANEL SCDATE 101689 SCHPRD BA
10/26/1989FiledOUTCOME/DISPOSITION - Outcome-Disposition
10/26/1989ORDER GRANT MO TO DISMISS & DISMISS APPEAL. MEH PANELRO SCDATE 102489 SCHPRD M
10/26/1989DISP NO - 01 DISP - DS METH -ORD JUDGE -RO CITE
11/16/1989MANDATE ISSUED PANEL SCDATE 000000 SCHPRD