judyrecords
search tips
630 million+
United States Court Cases

District Of Columbia Court Of Appeals Record

DOMINIC D. RISPER V. UNITED STATES

Case Information: 88-CF-1266
Short Caption:DOMINIC D. RISPER V. UNITED STATESClassification:Appeals - Criminal Felony - Robbery Related
Superior Court or Agency Case Number:F1989-88Filed Date:09/26/1988

Opening Event Date:09/26/1988Case Status:Closed
Record Completed:07/06/1989Post-Decision Matter Pending:
Briefs Completed:05/24/1990
Argued/Submitted:11/13/1990
Disposition:Next Scheduled Action:
Mandate Issued:12/06/1990

Party Information
Appellate RoleParty NameIFPAttorney(s)Arguing AttorneyE-Filer
AppellantDominic D. Risper N
Peter N. MannYY
AppelleeUnited StatesN
John R. Fisher YN
John W. Kern YN

Events
Event DateStatusDescriptionResult
01/01/1901RISPER, DOMINIC D. UNITED STATES
01/01/1903NOTE - 01 CON: 88-1233 NOTE - 01 NOTE - 02 5/24/90 ORD: GRANTG APLE'S MOS NOTE - 02 FOR LV TO FILE BRIEF AND SUPP NOTE - 03 BRF; CLK TO FILE BRFS; DENYING NOTE - 03 MO TO STAY SCHEDULING OF ORAL NOTE - 04 ARGUMENT AS MOOT; CLK TO SCHED NOTE - 04 CASE FOR CONSIDERATION AS SN NOTE - 05 AS THE BUSINESS OF THE COURT NOTE - 05 PERMITS.
09/26/1988FiledOPENING EVENT - Opening Event
10/21/1988APPOINTING COUNSEL/CO REFERRAL (CJA) PETER N. MANN, ESQ. PANEL SCDATE 000000 SCHPRD
10/26/1988MEMORANDUM REMAIL APPOINTMENT VOUCHER TO APLT'S ATTY THIS DATE GG PANEL SCDATE 103188 SCHPRD DSA
12/05/1988APPELLANT'S MOTION FOR LEAVE TO FILE DS LATE JB PB PANEL SCDATE 110788 SCHPRD DSA
12/05/1988RECEIVED APPELLANT'S DOCKETING STATEMENT JB PANEL SCDATE 000000 SCHPRD
01/10/1989APPELLANT'S DOCKETING STATEMENT PB PANEL SCDATE 000000 SCHPRD
01/10/1989SUPPLEMENTAL RECORD #1(8 PGS/CALHOUN) AD PANEL SCDATE 011189 SCHPRD RT
03/10/1989RECORD ON APPEAL (115 PGS/SIMMS) AD RTC PANEL SCDATE 000000 SCHPRD
04/28/1989ORDER SS CONSOLIDATING 88-1233 & 88-1266 FOR ALL PURP; FO BA DUE 40 DAYS AFTER RT FLD. FVH PANELRO SCDATE 000000 SCHPRD
06/06/1989APPELLANT'S MOTION FOR STAY BRIEFING SCHEDULE UNTIL COMPLETION OF TRANSCRIPT GT PANEL SCDATE 000000 SCHPRD
07/06/1989FiledRecord Completed
07/06/1989SUPPLEMENTAL RECORD #1 (242 PGS. -- BURNEY) RJG PANEL SCDATE 063089 SCHPRD RT
07/21/1989ORDER TRANSCRIPT IS COMPLETE - APLT BRF DUE IN 40 DAYS. ACG PANELRBH SCDATE 061689 SCHPRD OPE
08/31/1989APPELLANT'S MOTION TO EXTEND TIME TO FILE BRIEF TO 10/30/89 GT PANEL SCDATE 083089 SCHPRD BA
09/15/1989ORDER GRANT MO OF APLT TO EXT TM TO FL BRF TO EXTENT BRF DUE BY 10/2/89. DAS PANELDDW SCDATE 091189 SCHPRD OPE
10/03/1989APPELLANT'S MOTION TO EXTEND TIME TO FILE BRIEF TO OCTOBER 23RD JB PANEL SCDATE 100289 SCHPRD BA
10/13/1989ORDER GRANT APLT MO TO EXT TM TO FL BRF TO 10/23/89; NFX. GW PANELRBH SCDATE 101489 SCHPRD M
10/23/1989APPELLANT'S MOTION TO EXTEND TIME TO FILE BRIEF TO NOVEMBER 6, 1989 RJG PANEL SCDATE 102389 SCHPRD BA
11/07/1989APPELLANT'S MOTION FOR LEAVE TO FILE BRIEF AD PANEL SCDATE 000000 SCHPRD
11/07/1989RECEIVED APPELLANT'S BRIEF AD PANEL SCDATE 000000 SCHPRD
11/28/1989APPELLANT'S BRIEF MEH PANEL SCDATE 000000 SCHPRD
11/28/1989ORDER GRANT APLT'S MO TO FL BRF; APLE'S CONSOLIDATED BRF DUE IN 30 DAYS. MEH PANELRBH SCDATE 112189 SCHPRD M
12/28/1989APPELLEE'S MOTION TO EXTEND TIME TO FILE BRIEF TO JANUARY 25, 1990 AJ PANEL SCDATE 122889 SCHPRD BE
01/19/1990ORDER EXTG TIME FOR FILING APLE'S BR TO AND INCLUDING 1/25/90. FVH PANELRBH SCDATE 000000 SCHPRD
01/25/1990APPELLEE'S MOTION TO EXTEND TIME TO FILE BRIEF TO 2-23-90 NO OPPO AD PANEL SCDATE 012590 SCHPRD BE
02/16/1990ORDER GRANT APLE'S MO TO EXT TM TO FILE BRIEF TO 2/23/90; NFX. GW PANELRBH SCDATE 020590 SCHPRD M
02/23/1990APPELLEE'S MOTION TO EXTEND TIME TO FILE BRIEF TO MARCH 2, 1990 (NO OPPO) AJ PANEL SCDATE 022390 SCHPRD BE
03/05/1990APPELLEE'S MOTION FOR LEAVE TO FILE BRIEF AD PANEL SCDATE 000000 SCHPRD
03/05/1990RECEIVED APPELLEE'S BRIEF AD PANEL SCDATE 000000 SCHPRD
03/09/1990APPELLEE'S MOTION FOR STAY ORAL ARGUMENT FOR 45 DAYS FROM SERVICE OF THIS MOTION RJG PANEL SCDATE 000000 SCHPRD
04/23/1990APLE MOTION FOR LV TO FILE SUPPLEMENTAL BRIEF/MEMOAD PANEL SCDATE 000000 SCHPRD
04/23/1990RECEIVED APLE'S SUPP. BRIEF AD PANEL SCDATE 000000 SCHPRD
05/24/1990FiledBriefing Completed
05/24/1990APPELEE'S BRIEF CWC PANEL SCDATE 000000 SCHPRD
05/24/1990ORDER SEE NOTE FIELDS 02-05 CWC PANELRO SCDATE 050790 SCHPRD OPA
05/24/1990APPELLEE'S SUPPLEMENTAL BRIEF/MEMORANDUM CWC PANEL SCDATE 000000 SCHPRD
11/13/1990FiledACTION - Argued / Submitted
11/13/1990SUBMITTED PANELBESCPY SCDATE 000000 SCHPRD
11/15/1990AFFIRMED MOJ AF JUDGMENT APPEALED FROM PANELBESCPY SCDATE 000000 SCHPRD
11/15/1990DISP NO - 01 DISP - AF METH -MOJ JUDGE -PC CITE
12/06/1990MANDATE ISSUED PANEL SCDATE 000000 SCHPRD