judyrecords
search tips
630 million+
United States Court Cases

District Of Columbia Court Of Appeals Record

TENLEY & CLEVELAND PARK EMERG.DISTRICT OF COLUMBIA

Case Information: 86-CV-0813
Short Caption:TENLEY & CLEVELAND PARK EMERG.DISTRICT OF COLUMBIAClassification:Appeals - Civil - Other Civil
Superior Court or Agency Case Number:CA2251-86Filed Date:05/22/1986

Opening Event Date:05/22/1986Case Status:Closed
Record Completed:07/09/1987Post-Decision Matter Pending:
Briefs Completed:01/27/1988
Argued/Submitted:07/05/1988
Disposition:Next Scheduled Action:
Mandate Issued:12/09/1988

Party Information
Appellate RoleParty NameIFPAttorney(s)Arguing AttorneyE-Filer
AppellantJohn Doe N
Geoffrey P. Gitner NN
AppellantJohn Doe N
Philip C. Olsson YN
AppellantJohn Doe N
Nathalie V. Black YN
AppellantJohn Doe N
Brian W. Smith NN
AppellantJohn Doe N
Diane L. Olsson NN
AppellantJohn Doe N
Richard B. Nettler NN
AppelleeJohn Doe N
Whayne R. QuinYN
AppelleeJohn Doe N
Charles L. Reischel NN
AppelleeJohn Doe N
Lutz Alexander Prager YN

Events
Event DateStatusDescriptionResult
01/01/1901TENLEY & CLEVELAND PARK EMERG. COMM., ET AL DISTRICT OF COLUMBIA ET AL
01/01/1903NOTE - 01 CON 87-468 NOTE - 01 NOTE - 02 6/26/87 ORD: GRANT TO CONS NOTE - 02 NOS. 86-813 & 87-468; RESPDNT NOTE - 03 TO FL RECORD IN NO. 86-813; NOTE - 03 CNSOLIDATED BRF'S OF APLT'S & NOTE - 04 PETNR'S DUE 40 DAYS AFTER NOTE - 04 RT IN NO. 86-813 IS FILED IN NOTE - 05 THIS COURT. NOTE - 05 NOTE - 06 11/17/87 ORD: BRF OF APLE'S, NOTE - 06 D.C. DUE IN 20 DAYS; GRANT MO NOTE - 07 OF APLTS TO EXT TM TO FL REPLY NOTE - 07 BRF 10 DAYS AFTER BRF OF APLES NOTE - 08 1/27/88 ORD: GRT MO TO FILE NOTE - 08 REPLY BRIEF, MO TO FILE MEMO NOTE - 09 IN LIEU OF BRIEF, AND MOS. TO NOTE - 09 SUBSTITUTE EXHIBIT AND CORR. NOTE - 10 PAGE TO REPLY BRIEF; CLK IS NOTE - 10 DIRTD TO FILE LODGED REPLY NOTE - 11 BRIEF, MEMO IN LIEU OF APLE'S NOTE - 11 BRIEF, EXHIBIT, AND CORR. PAGE NOTE - 12 TO REPLY BRIEF. NOTE - 12
01/01/1904JUDGE - FE AUTHOR - RECUSED - Y JUDGE - ST AUTHOR - RECUSED - Y JUDGE - TE AUTHOR - RECUSED - Y
01/01/1905TRDATE- 88/07/05 ACTION - ARG ATTY 1 - SMITHBR FOR - PETITIONERS ATTY 2 - OLSSOND FOR - PETITIONERS ATTY 3 - QUINW FOR - INTERVENORS TRDATE- 88/07/05 ACTION - ARG ATTY 1 - PRAGERL FOR - RESPONDENTS
05/22/1986FiledOPENING EVENT - Opening Event
06/06/1986CIVIL APPEAL STATEMENT RJG PANEL SCDATE 060686 SCHPRD CAS
06/06/1986$50.00 DOCKETING FEE PANEL SCDATE 000000 SCHPRD
06/16/1986$5 PAID TO DC TREASURER VS PANEL SCDATE 000000 SCHPRD
07/16/1986MISCELLANEOUS SUBSTANTIVE MOTION OF APPELLANTS FOR ORAL HEARING ON MOTION TO STAY PB PANEL SCDATE 000000 SCHPRD
07/16/1986APPELLANT'S MOTION FOR STAY PB PANEL SCDATE 000000 SCHPRD
07/23/1986APPELLEE'S ANSWER/RESPONSE (DC) TO APPLICATION FOR STAY GG PANEL SCDATE 072886 SCHPRD OPE
07/23/1986APPELLEE'S OPPOSITION (DONOHOE, ET AL) TO APLT'S MOTION FOR STAY PENDING APPEAL GG PANEL SCDATE 000000 SCHPRD
07/25/1986ORDER DENYING MOTION FOR STAY. (ARGUED THIS DATE) CWC PANELPYNWBE SCDATE 071786 SCHPRD TMC
08/06/1986ORDER NO 7A; DR AND SRT DUE IN 10 DAYS. CWC PANELPY SCDATE 000000 SCHPRD
08/15/1986DESIGNATION OF RECORD PB PANEL SCDATE 081886 SCHPRD DR
08/15/1986STATEMENT REGARDING TRANSCRIPT(S) PB PANEL SCDATE 000000 SCHPRD
11/04/1986RECORD ON APPEAL (37 PGS - TOOBY)(2 LARGE BROWN ENVELOPES EXHIBIT) (RTC) PB PANEL SCDATE 100686 SCHPRD R
01/15/1987SUPPLEMENTAL RECORD #1 (283 PGS - PAVLISH) PB PANEL SCDATE 123186 SCHPRD RT
06/02/1987APPELLANT'S MOTION TO CONSOLIDATE THIS APPEAL WTIH 87-468 (NO OPPO) PB PANEL SCDATE 000000 SCHPRD
06/26/1987ORDER SEE NOTE FIELDS 02-05. DAS PANELPY SCDATE 022587 SCHPRD RT
07/01/1987RECORD ON APPEAL IN 87-468 (2 VOLS) & 1 BROWN FOLDER ORIG. EXHIBITS PM PANEL SCDATE 071387 SCHPRD R
07/09/1987FiledRecord Completed
07/09/1987ACTION SLIP MAILED PB PANEL SCDATE 000000 SCHPRD
07/09/1987SUPPLEMENTAL RECORD #2 (6 PGS - PAVLISH) PB PANEL SCDATE 022587 SCHPRD RT
08/03/1987APPELLANT'S MOTION TO EXTEND TIME TO FILE BRIEF TO SEPTEMBER 28, 1987 RJG PANEL SCDATE 081887 SCHPRD BA
08/14/1987APPEARANCE OF PHILIP C. OLSSON, DIANE L. OLSSON & NATHALIE V. BLACK AS COUNSEL FOR APPELLANT JB PANEL SCDATE 000000 SCHPRD
08/14/1987APPELLANT'S BRIEF JB PANEL SCDATE 092887 SCHPRD BA
09/15/1987APPELLEE'S MOTION TO EXTEND TIME TO FILE BRIEF 4000 WISCONSIN AVE. ASSOC. TO 10/19/87 (NO OPPO) PB PANEL SCDATE 091887 SCHPRD BE EXTDTE 101987
09/17/1987APPELLANT'S ANSWER/RESPONSE OF APLT TO APLE/INTVR DONOHOE CONSTRUCTION CO & HOLLADAY CO. EXT OF TIME TO FILE BRIEF PB PANEL SCDATE 000000 SCHPRD
09/21/1987APPELLEE'S MOTION TO EXTEND TIME TO FILE BRIEF TO 11/17/87 PB PANEL SCDATE 000000 SCHPRD
10/19/1987APPELEE'S BRIEF & (SEP) APPENDIX (4000 WISCON- SIN AVENUE ASSOCIATES MLH PANEL SCDATE 101987 SCHPRD BE
10/30/1987APLT MOTION TO EXTEND TIME TO FILE REPLY BRIEF OF APPELLANT TO DEC 3RD MLH PANEL SCDATE 000000 SCHPRD
11/17/1987ORDER SEE NOTE FIELDS 06 & 07. DAS PANELPY SCDATE 100587 SCHPRD OPA
12/07/1987MISCELLANEOUS PROCEDURAL MOTION OF APLE FOR LEAVE TO FILE MEMO IN LIEU OF BRIEF RJG PANEL SCDATE 120787 SCHPRD BE
12/07/1987RECEIVED APPELLEE'S MEMO IN LIEU OF BRIEF RJG PANEL SCDATE 000000 SCHPRD
12/17/1987MISCELLANEOUS PROCEDURAL MOTION OF APPELLANTS TO FILE REPLY BRIEF IN EXCESS OF PAGE LIMIT MLH PANEL SCDATE 000000 SCHPRD
12/17/1987RECEIVED APPELLANTS' REPLY BRIEF MLH PANEL SCDATE 000000 SCHPRD
01/07/1988MISCELLANEOUS PROCEDURAL MOTION OF APPELLEES/INTERVENOR TO SUBSTITUTE CLEAR COPY FOR EXHIBIT 4 TO BRIEF RJG PANEL SCDATE 000000 SCHPRD
01/21/1988MISCELLANEOUS PROCEDURAL MOTION OF APPELLANT TO SUBSTITUTE CORRECTED PG 14 TO APLTS REPLY BRIEF RJG PANEL SCDATE 000000 SCHPRD
01/27/1988FiledBriefing Completed
01/27/1988APPELEE'S BRIEF MEMO IN LIEU OF BRIEF SL PANEL SCDATE 000000 SCHPRD
01/27/1988ORDER SEE NOTE FIELDS 8 THRU 12 SL PANELPY SCDATE 020188 SCHPRD OPE
01/27/1988APPELLANT'S REPLY BRIEF SL PANEL SCDATE 000000 SCHPRD
06/01/1988ORDER SS, REMOVE FROM 7/7/88 REG CAL & RESCHED FOR 7/5/88 REG. DAS PANELPY SCDATE 070788 SCHPRD CREG
07/05/1988FiledACTION - Argued / Submitted
07/05/1988ARGUED PANELPYMKRG SCDATE 000000 SCHPRD
08/10/1988MISCELLANEOUS PROCEDURAL MOTION OF APPELLANTS TO CALL COURT'S ATTENTION TO RECENT DECISION MLH PANEL SCDATE 000000 SCHPRD
08/12/1988MEMORANDUM TRANSMITTING NOTICE OF APLTS CITING RECENT DECISION. DAS PANELFF SCDATE 000000 SCHPRD
08/24/1988MEMORANDUM TRANSMITTING CITATION PURSUANT TO RULE 28(K) TO DIVISION. DAS PANELDDW SCDATE 000000 SCHPRD
09/20/1988MISCELLANEOUS PROCEDURAL MOTION 0F APPELLANTS TO CALL THE COURT'S ATTENTION TO RECENT RELEVANT DECISION GT PANEL SCDATE 000000 SCHPRD
09/22/1988ORDER TRANSMITTING NOTICE OF RELEVNT DECISION TO DIVISION. DAS PANELDDW SCDATE 000000 SCHPRD
10/18/1988MISCELLANEOUS PROCEDURAL MOTION OF APPELLEE'S FOR LEAVE TO FILE STATEMENT ON RECENT ADMIN ACTIONS RJG PANEL SCDATE 000000 SCHPRD
11/01/1988RECEIVED APPELLANT'S OPPOSITION TO MOTION TO FILE STATEMENT ON RECENT ADMIN ACTIONS RJG PANEL SCDATE 103188 SCHPRD OPA
11/14/1988ORDER GRANT MO OF APLES FOR LV TO FL STATE ON RECENT ADMINISTRATIVE ACTIONS & CLK TO FL STATE. DAS PANELROMKPY SCDATE 101988 SCHPRD VS
11/14/1988STATEMENT RECENT ADMINISTRATIVE ACTIONS. DAS PANEL SCDATE 000000 SCHPRD
11/17/1988AFFIRMED JDGMT AF TRIAL COURT JDGMT (#87-468 ALSO AFFIRMED) PANELRGMKPY SCDATE 000000 SCHPRD
11/17/1988DISP NO - 01 DISP - AF METH -OPN JUDGE -RO CITE 550 A.2d 331
11/17/1988OPINION TYPE M JUDGE - RO PAGE # - 2427 -A
12/09/1988MANDATE ISSUED PANEL SCDATE 000000 SCHPRD
02/21/1989NOTICE OF FILING A PETITION FOR WRIT OF CERTIORARIFILED IN SUPREME COURT ON 2/15/89 (#88-1359) MLR PANEL SCDATE 000000 SCHPRD Denied