judyrecords
search tips
630 million+
United States Court Cases

District Of Columbia Court Of Appeals Record

PLOUGH INC. V. NATIONAL ACADEMY OF SCIENCE

Case Information: 86-CV-0812
Short Caption:PLOUGH INC. V. NATIONAL ACADEMY OF SCIENCEClassification:Appeals - Civil - Other Civil
Superior Court or Agency Case Number:MISC195-85Filed Date:05/22/1986

Opening Event Date:05/22/1986Case Status:Closed
Record Completed:12/03/1986Post-Decision Matter Pending:
Briefs Completed:02/11/1987
Argued/Submitted:07/08/1987
Disposition:Next Scheduled Action:
Mandate Issued:

Party Information
Appellate RoleParty NameIFPAttorney(s)Arguing AttorneyE-Filer
AppellantJohn Doe N
Bryan Jay Yolles YN
AppellantJohn Doe N
Robert L. Davis NN
AppellantJohn Doe N
AppellantJohn Doe N
AppelleeJohn Doe N
Calvin H. Cobb YN
AppelleeJohn Doe N
Joseph P. EspositoNN
AppelleeJohn Doe N
Audrey Byrd Mosley NN
AppelleeJohn Doe N
David R. Fuller NN
AppelleeJohn Doe N
AppelleeJohn Doe N
Kevin J. Dunne NN
AppelleeJohn Doe N
AppelleeJohn Doe N
AppelleeJohn Doe N
AppelleeJohn Doe N
AppelleeJohn Doe N
AppelleeJohn Doe N
AppelleeJohn Doe N
AppelleeJohn Doe N
AppelleeJohn Doe N
AppelleeJohn Doe N
Elizabeth Figueroa NN
AppelleeJohn Doe N
AppelleeJohn Doe N
AppelleeJohn Doe N
AppelleeJohn Doe N

Events
Event DateStatusDescriptionResult
01/01/1901PLOUGH INC. ET AL NATIONAL ACADEMY OF SCIENCE ET AL
01/01/1906 ESPOSITOJ NATIONAL ACADEMY OF SCIENCES MOSLEYA NAT'L ACADEMY OF SCIENCES FULLERD FOR: RHONE, POULENC INC. PORTERR FOR: MONSANTO DUNNEK FOR: BRISTOL MYERS FORGIEK STERLING DRUG, & BURROUGHS SIGGINSR FOR: AMERICAN HOME PRODUCTS FUNGL FOR: WARNER-LAMBERT LINZERK FOR: ASPRIN FOUND. OF AMERICA SPANR FOR: ASPRIN FOUND. OF AMERICA MORRISSEYJ FOR: MILES LABS CALDERT FOR:NORWICH & PROCTOR & GAMBLE ZAROR FOR:NORWICH & PROCTOR & GAMBLE GREVEC FOR: RAWSON FILICEG FOR: DOW CHEMICAL BYRDJO FOR: UPJOHN GASSAWAYS FOR:SANDOZ PHARM. & DORSEY LAB DAVISMA FOR:SMITHLINE CO./MENLEY JAMES MCGOWANC FOR: WILLIAM H. RORER COBBC FOR: NAT'L ACADEMY OF SCIENCE
05/22/1986FiledOPENING EVENT - Opening Event
12/03/1986FiledRecord Completed
02/11/1987FiledBriefing Completed
07/08/1987FiledACTION - Argued / Submitted
09/09/1987FiledOUTCOME/DISPOSITION - Outcome-Disposition