judyrecords
search tips
630 million+
United States Court Cases

District Of Columbia Court Of Appeals Record

ROBERT L. WHITTAKER V. UNITED STATES

Case Information: 88-CF-1260
Short Caption:ROBERT L. WHITTAKER V. UNITED STATESClassification:Appeals - Criminal Felony - Drug Related
Superior Court or Agency Case Number:F4313-88Filed Date:09/26/1988

Opening Event Date:09/26/1988Case Status:Closed
Record Completed:02/16/1989Post-Decision Matter Pending:
Briefs Completed:06/15/1989
Argued/Submitted:12/04/1989
Disposition:Next Scheduled Action:
Mandate Issued:12/29/1989

Party Information
Appellate RoleParty NameIFPAttorney(s)Arguing AttorneyE-Filer
AppellantRobert L. Whittaker N
Ralph Thomas Mabry YN
AppelleeUnited StatesN
John R. Fisher YN
Steven W. Pelak YN

Events
Event DateStatusDescriptionResult
01/01/1901WHITTAKER, ROBERT L. UNITED STATES
09/26/1988FiledOPENING EVENT - Opening Event
10/18/1988APPOINTING COUNSEL/CO REFERRAL (CJA) RALPH THOMAS MABRY, ESQ. PANEL SCDATE 000000 SCHPRD
11/03/1988APPELLANT'S MOTION FOR LEAVE TO FILE DS RJG PB PANEL SCDATE 102888 SCHPRD DSA
11/03/1988RECEIVED APPELLANT'S DOCKETING STATE- MENT RJG PANEL SCDATE 000000 SCHPRD
11/28/1988APPELLANT'S DOCKETING STATEMENT PB PANEL SCDATE 112388 SCHPRD V
02/16/1989FiledRecord Completed
02/16/1989ACTION SLIP MAILED AD PANEL SCDATE 000000 SCHPRD
02/16/1989RECORD ON APPEAL (109 PGS/RONAN) AD PANEL SCDATE 112588 SCHPRD R
03/28/1989APPELLANT'S MOTION TO EXTEND TIME TO FILE BRIEF TO 4-12-89 (NO OPPO) AD PANEL SCDATE 032889 SCHPRD BA
03/31/1989ORDER GRANT MO OF APLT TO EXT TM TO FL BRF TO 4/12/89. DAS PANELRBH SCDATE 040789 SCHPRD CHECK
04/12/1989APPELLANT'S BRIEF AD PANEL SCDATE 041289 SCHPRD BA
05/16/1989APPELLEE'S MOTION TO EXTEND TIME TO FILE BRIEF TO 6-16-89 (NO OPPO) AD PANEL SCDATE 051789 SCHPRD BE
06/09/1989ORDER GRANT MO OF APLE TO EXT TM TO FL BRF TO 6/16/89. DAS PANELRBH SCDATE 052689 SCHPRD CHECK
06/15/1989FiledBriefing Completed
06/15/1989APPELEE'S BRIEF AD PANEL SCDATE 061689 SCHPRD BE
12/04/1989FiledACTION - Argued / Submitted
12/04/1989SUBMITTED PANELFESTRY SCDATE 000000 SCHPRD
12/07/1989AFFIRMED MOJ AF JUDGMENT ON APPEAL PANELFESTRY SCDATE 000000 SCHPRD
12/07/1989DISP NO - 01 DISP - AF METH -MOJ JUDGE -PC CITE
12/29/1989MANDATE ISSUED PANEL SCDATE 000000 SCHPRD