judyrecords
search tips
630 million+
United States Court Cases

District Of Columbia Court Of Appeals Record

JAMES LEAK, JR. V. UNITED STATES

Case Information: 88-CF-1263
Short Caption:JAMES LEAK, JR. V. UNITED STATESClassification:Appeals - Criminal Felony - Weapons Related
Superior Court or Agency Case Number:F10657-87Filed Date:09/23/1988

Opening Event Date:09/23/1988Case Status:Closed
Record Completed:09/05/1989Post-Decision Matter Pending:
Briefs Completed:11/16/1989
Argued/Submitted:02/28/1990
Disposition:Next Scheduled Action:
Mandate Issued:05/17/1990

Party Information
Appellate RoleParty NameIFPAttorney(s)Arguing AttorneyE-Filer
AppellantJames Leak, Jr.N
James W. KleinNY
John M. Mott YN
AppelleeUnited StatesN
John R. Fisher YN
Patricia Stewart YN

Events
Event DateStatusDescriptionResult
01/01/1901LEAK JR., JAMES UNITED STATES
01/01/1905TRDATE- 90/02/28 ACTION - ARG ATTY 1 - MOTTJ FOR - APPELLANT ATTY 2 - STEWARTP FOR - APPELLEE
09/23/1988FiledOPENING EVENT - Opening Event
10/18/1988ORDER APPOINTING JAMES KLEIN, ESQ. AS COUNSEL FOR APLT. DOCKETING STATEMENT DUE IN 10 DAYS. GG PANELPY SCDATE 000000 SCHPRD
10/20/1988STATEMENT OF APPELLANT RE TRANSCRIPTS RJG PANEL SCDATE 000000 SCHPRD
10/28/1988APPELLANT'S DOCKETING STATEMENT AD PANEL SCDATE 102888 SCHPRD DSA
02/06/1989RECORD ON APPEAL (95 PGS/TANNER) AD RTC PANEL SCDATE 112288 SCHPRD R
09/05/1989FiledRecord Completed
09/11/1989APPELLANT'S BRIEF AD PANEL SCDATE 091589 SCHPRD BA
10/10/1989APPELLEE'S MOTION TO EXTEND TIME TO FILE BRIEF TO 11-16-89 NO OPPO AD PANEL SCDATE 101689 SCHPRD BE
10/13/1989ORDER GRANT MO OF APLE TO EXT TM TO FL BRF TO 11/16/89. DAS PANELRBH SCDATE 101189 SCHPRD M
11/16/1989FiledBriefing Completed
11/16/1989APPELEE'S BRIEF AD PANEL SCDATE 111689 SCHPRD BE
02/09/1990APPELLANT'S MOTION FOR LEAVE TO FILE REPLY BRIEF NO OPPO AD PANEL SCDATE 000000 SCHPRD
02/09/1990RECEIVED APPELLANT'S REPLY BRIEF AD PANEL SCDATE 000000 SCHPRD
02/22/1990SUPPLEMENTAL RECORD (99 PGS RT ALLISON/TANNER) MEH PANEL SCDATE 000000 SCHPRD
02/23/1990SUPPLEMENTAL RECORD #2(139 PGS/ALLISON) AD PANEL SCDATE 000000 SCHPRD
02/26/1990ORDER GRANT MO OF APLT FOR LV TO FL REPLY BRF & REPLY BRF FL. DAS PANELRBH SCDATE 021290 SCHPRD VS
02/26/1990APPELLANT'S REPLY BRIEF DAS PANEL SCDATE 000000 SCHPRD
02/28/1990FiledACTION - Argued / Submitted
02/28/1990ARGUED PANELBETESC SCDATE 000000 SCHPRD
03/06/1990AFFIRMED MOJ AF APPELLANT'S CONVICTION PANELBETESC SCDATE 000000 SCHPRD
03/06/1990DISP NO - 01 DISP - AF METH -MOJ JUDGE -PC CITE
03/26/1990RECEIVED APLTS MO TO STAY MANDATE & TO EX TM TO FILE PET FOR REHEARIN (NO ATTY SIGNATURE) AJ PANEL SCDATE 000000 SCHPRD
03/28/1990APPELLANT'S MOTION FOR STAY MANDATE AND TO EX TM TO FILE MO FOR REHEARING AJ PANEL SCDATE 000000 SCHPRD
04/06/1990ORDER GRT APLT'S MO TO STAY ISS. OF MAND & TO FILE PET AND PET FOR REH/REH EB DUE IN 21 DAYS SL PANELRO SCDATE 040290 SCHPRD N
04/12/1990PETITION FOR REHEARING/REHEARING EN BANC OF APPELLANT IN LETTER FORM SL PANEL SCDATE 000000 SCHPRD
04/12/1990RECEIVED PRO SE LETTER FROM APPELLANT REQ. LETTER TO BE ACCEPTED AS PETITION FOR REHEARING ETC.RJG PANEL SCDATE 000000 SCHPRD
05/17/1990MANDATE ISSUED PANEL SCDATE 000000 SCHPRD