judyrecords
search tips
630 million+
United States Court Cases

District Of Columbia Court Of Appeals Record

JARVIS A. WESTON V. UNITED STATES

Case Information: 87-CF-0129
Short Caption:JARVIS A. WESTON V. UNITED STATESClassification:Appeals - Criminal Felony - Drug Related
Superior Court or Agency Case Number:F3237-85Filed Date:01/30/1987

Opening Event Date:01/30/1987Case Status:Closed
Record Completed:08/25/1987Post-Decision Matter Pending:
Briefs Completed:
Argued/Submitted:
Disposition:Next Scheduled Action:
Mandate Issued:

Party Information
Appellate RoleParty NameIFPAttorney(s)Arguing AttorneyE-Filer
AppellantJarvis A. Weston N
Anita Isicson NN
AppelleeUnited StatesN
John R. Fisher NN

Events
Event DateStatusDescriptionResult
01/01/1901WESTON, JARVIS A. UNITED STATES
01/01/1903NOTE - 01 080187 MEMO: RT ORDERED ON NOTE - 01 5/13/87 FOR APPEAL - SCHOCH NOTE - 02 5/29/86 proc.(completed 5/21/ NOTE - 02 87); GRAYBILL 11/6 thru 11/12/ NOTE - 03 86 proc.; TREMEL 1/30/87 proc. NOTE - 03 & VAN BREMAN 11/10/86 proc.
01/30/1987FiledOPENING EVENT - Opening Event
03/30/1987RECORD ON APPEAL JB PANEL SCDATE 033187 SCHPRD R
03/31/1987APPOINTING COUNSEL/CO REFERRAL (CJA) ANITA ISICSON, ESQ. PANEL SCDATE 000000 SCHPRD
04/01/1987APPELLANT'S DOCKETING STATEMENT JB PANEL SCDATE 041087 SCHPRD DSA
05/11/1987APPELLANT'S MOTION TO EXTEND TIME TO FILE BRIEF UNTIL 40 DAYS AFTER TRANSCRIPT IS FILED JB (EBP) PANEL SCDATE 051887 SCHPRD BA
07/28/1987SUPPLEMENTAL RECORD #1 (6 PGS. - SCHOCH) PM PANEL SCDATE 000000 SCHPRD
08/21/1987SUPPLEMENTAL RECORD #2 (196 PGS - BREMEN) JB PANEL SCDATE 080187 SCHPRD RT
08/25/1987FiledRecord Completed
08/25/1987ACTION SLIP MAILED JB PANEL SCDATE 000000 SCHPRD
10/05/1987APPELLANT'S MOTION TO EXTEND TIME TO FILE BRIEF TO 40 DAYS AFTER COMPLETION OF TRANSCRIPTS MLH (EBP) PANEL SCDATE 100587 SCHPRD BA
02/12/1988SUPPLEMENTAL RECORD #3 (23 PGS TR - TREMEL) GT PANEL SCDATE 022088 SCHPRD RT
02/25/1988SUPPLEMENTAL RECORD #4 (159 PGS - WHALEN) PB PANEL SCDATE 013088 SCHPRD RT
03/01/1988ACTION SLIP MAILED (NO RTC) PB PANEL SCDATE 000000 SCHPRD
03/14/1988APPELLANT'S MOTION TO DISMISS/WITHDRAW APPEAL RJG PANEL SCDATE 041188 SCHPRD BA
03/15/1988FiledOUTCOME/DISPOSITION - Outcome-Disposition
03/15/1988ORDER DISMISSING APPEAL. PB PANELPY SCDATE 032488 SCHPRD CHECK
03/15/1988DISP NO - 01 DISP - DS METH -ORD JUDGE -PY CITE