judyrecords
search tips
630 million+
United States Court Cases

District Of Columbia Court Of Appeals Record

JOHN E. THOMAS, JR. V. UNITED STATES

Case Information: 88-CF-1299
Short Caption:JOHN E. THOMAS, JR. V. UNITED STATESClassification:Appeals - Criminal Felony - Drug Related
Superior Court or Agency Case Number:F5804-87Filed Date:10/12/1988

Opening Event Date:10/12/1988Case Status:Closed
Record Completed:06/02/1989Post-Decision Matter Pending:
Briefs Completed:
Argued/Submitted:
Disposition:Next Scheduled Action:
Mandate Issued:02/20/1990

Party Information
Appellate RoleParty NameIFPAttorney(s)Arguing AttorneyE-Filer
AppellantJohn E. Thomas, Jr.N
Hugh O'Neill NN
AppellantJohn Doe N
Robert J. Dowlut YN
AppelleeUnited StatesN
John R. Fisher YN
Kirby D. Behre YN

Events
Event DateStatusDescriptionResult
01/01/1901THOMAS JR, JOHN E. UNITED STATES
01/01/1903NOTE - 01 3/1/89 ORD: GRANT MO OF COUNSL NOTE - 01 FOR APLT TO W/D & VACATE APPMT NOTE - 02 OF HUGH O'NEILL & APPT ROBERT NOTE - 02 J. DOWLUT FOR APLT; CLK OF NOTE - 03 SUPER CRT TO PREPARE & TRANS- NOTE - 03 MIT REC FORTHWITH. NOTE - 04 01/30/90 ORD: APLT SEEKING NOTE - 04 RELIEF IN TRIAL COURT TO EXPAN NOTE - 05 TIME FOR NOTING AN APPEAL NUNC NOTE - 05 PRO TUNC TO 10/12/88.
01/01/1906 O'NEILLH VACATED 3/1/89.
10/12/1988FiledOPENING EVENT - Opening Event
10/24/1988APPOINTING COUNSEL/CO REFERRAL (CJA) HUGH O'NEILL, ESQ. PANEL SCDATE 000000 SCHPRD
11/18/1988APPELLANT'S DOCKETING STATEMENT JB PANEL SCDATE 110388 SCHPRD DSA
02/17/1989COUNSEL'S MOTION TO WITHDRAW FOR BUSINESS REASONS OF (HUGH O'NEILL) AS COUNSEL FOR APPELLANT JB PANEL SCDATE 000000 SCHPRD
03/01/1989APPOINTING COUNSEL/CO REFERRAL (CJA) ROBERT J. DOWLUT, ESQ. PANEL SCDATE 000000 SCHPRD
03/01/1989ORDER SEE NOTE FIELDS 01-03. DAS PANELRO SCDATE 022189 SCHPRD GG
03/02/1989RECORD ON APPEAL (133 PGS/PIRFO) AD (RTC) PANEL SCDATE 121288 SCHPRD R
03/02/1989SUPPLEMENTAL RECORD #2(129 PGS/SALAZAR) AD (RTC) PANEL SCDATE 000000 SCHPRD
06/01/1989SUPPLEMENTAL RECORD #3(62 PGS/PAVLISH) AD PANEL SCDATE 021089 SCHPRD RT
06/02/1989FiledRecord Completed
06/02/1989ACTION SLIP MAILED AD PANEL SCDATE 000000 SCHPRD
07/10/1989APPELLANT'S MOTION TO EXTEND TIME TO FILE BRIEF TO AUGUST 10, 1989 (NO OPPO) RJG PANEL SCDATE 071289 SCHPRD BA
08/02/1989ORDER GRT APLT'S MO TO FILE BRF ON OR BEF 8/10/89 SL PANELRBH SCDATE 071289 SCHPRD N
08/10/1989APPELLANT'S BRIEF (LIST & APPENDIX) RJG PANEL SCDATE 081089 SCHPRD BA
09/11/1989APPELLEE'S MOTION TO DISMISS/WITHDRAW APPEAL AD PANEL SCDATE 000000 SCHPRD
09/11/1989APPELLEE'S MOTION TO EXTEND TIME TO FILE BRIEF TO 10-2-89 (NO OPPO) AD PANEL SCDATE 091189 SCHPRD BE
09/19/1989APPELLANT'S OPPOSITION TO MDSE FILED 9-11-89 AD PANEL SCDATE 092589 SCHPRD OPA
10/02/1989RECEIVED APPELLEE'S BRIEF JB PANEL SCDATE 000000 SCHPRD
10/11/1989APLT MOTION TO EXTEND TIME TO FILE REPLY BRIEF (APPELLANT'S) TO OCTOBER 31, 1989 (NO OPPO) RJG PANEL SCDATE 000000 SCHPRD
10/31/1989RECEIVED APPELLANT'S REPLY BRIEF AD PANEL SCDATE 000000 SCHPRD
01/30/1990FiledOUTCOME/DISPOSITION - Outcome-Disposition
01/30/1990ORDER APLE'S MOT TO DISMISS GRTD; APPEAL DISMISSED W/OUT PREJ TO (SEE NOTES 4 & 5) FVH PANELFESTPY SCDATE 000000 SCHPRD
01/30/1990DISP NO - 01 DISP - DS METH -ORD JUDGE -PC CITE
02/20/1990MANDATE ISSUED PANEL SCDATE 000000 SCHPRD