judyrecords
search tips
630 million+
United States Court Cases

District Of Columbia Court Of Appeals Record

BOBBY D. MORGAN V. UNITED STATES

Case Information: 88-CF-1297
Short Caption:BOBBY D. MORGAN V. UNITED STATESClassification:Appeals - Criminal Felony - Robbery Related
Superior Court or Agency Case Number:F5261-88Filed Date:09/26/1988

Opening Event Date:09/26/1988Case Status:Closed
Record Completed:09/20/1990Post-Decision Matter Pending:
Briefs Completed:03/15/1991
Argued/Submitted:09/27/1991
Disposition:Next Scheduled Action:
Mandate Issued:10/22/1991

Party Information
Appellate RoleParty NameIFPAttorney(s)Arguing AttorneyE-Filer
AppellantBobby D. Morgan N
Robert M. Greenspan YN
AppelleeUnited StatesN
John R. Fisher NN
Julie G. Weidenbruch YN

Events
Event DateStatusDescriptionResult
01/01/1901MORGAN, BOBBY D. UNITED STATES
01/01/1903NOTE - 01 CODEF: TERRENCE INGRAM NOTE - 01
01/01/1905TRDATE- 91/09/27 ACTION - ARG ATTY 1 - GREENSPANR FOR - APPELLANT ATTY 2 - WEIDENBRUCHJ FOR - APPELLEE
09/26/1988FiledOPENING EVENT - Opening Event
10/21/1988$5 PAID TO DC TREASURER PANEL SCDATE 000000 SCHPRD
10/24/1988APPOINTING COUNSEL/CO REFERRAL (CJA) ROBERT M. GREENSPAN, ESQ. PANEL SCDATE 000000 SCHPRD
11/01/1988APPELLANT'S DOCKETING STATEMENT MLR PANEL SCDATE 110388 SCHPRD DSA
03/10/1989RECORD ON APPEAL AD RTC PANEL SCDATE 112588 SCHPRD R
07/10/1989SUPPLEMENTAL RECORD #1 (241 PGS - RHOADES) JB PANEL SCDATE 000000 SCHPRD
08/07/1989ORDER GRANT MO OF COURT REPORTER JANIFER TO EXT TM TO FL RT BY 10/31/89; NFX. DAS PANELMK SCDATE 070189 SCHPRD RT
09/25/1989SUPPLEMENTAL RECORD #2 (1009 PGS - RHOADES) JB PANEL SCDATE 000000 SCHPRD
09/20/1990FiledRecord Completed
09/27/1990ORDER APLT BRF SHALL BE FLD W/IN 40 DAYS FROM THE DATE OF THIS ORD. NFX GR PANELRBH SCDATE 082190 SCHPRD GR
11/08/1990APPELLANT'S MOTION TO EXTEND TIME TO FILE BRIEF TO DECEMBER 14, 1990 PANEL SCDATE 110690 SCHPRD BA
11/26/1990ORDER GRNT APLT MO X TM TO FILE BRF TO 12/14/90. NFX GR PANELRBH SCDATE 111590 SCHPRD GR
12/17/1990APPELLANT'S MOTION TO EXTEND TIME TO FILE BRIEF TO JANUARY 7, 1991 (NO OPPO) RJG PANEL SCDATE 121490 SCHPRD BA
01/09/1991APPELLANT'S MOTION TO EXTEND TIME TO FILE BRIEF TO 1/31/91 (NO OPPO) AJ PANEL SCDATE 000000 SCHPRD
01/18/1991ORDER APLT MOTIONS GRNT TO EXT BRF SHALL BE FLD ON OR BEFORE 01-22-91. NFX PANELRBH SCDATE 011491 SCHPRD GR
01/23/1991APPELLANT'S MOTION FOR LEAVE TO FILE BRIEF AND MO TO EXCEED PAGE LIMIT AD PANEL SCDATE 012291 SCHPRD BA
01/23/1991RECEIVED APPELLANT'S BRIEF AD PANEL SCDATE 000000 SCHPRD
01/29/1991APPELLANT'S BRIEF PANEL SCDATE 000000 SCHPRD
01/29/1991ORDER ON CONSD OF 1/18/91 ORD WHICH WAS INADVERTLY MAILD TO COUNSL APLT BRF IS HEREBY FILED. GR PANELRBH SCDATE 000000 SCHPRD
02/13/1991APPELLANT'S BRIEF GW PANEL SCDATE 000000 SCHPRD
02/13/1991ORDER GRANTG APLT'S MO FOR LV TO FL BRF & LODGED BRF IS FL; BRF OF APLE DUE W/IN 30 DAYS. GW PANELRBH SCDATE 020691 SCHPRD CHECK
03/15/1991FiledBriefing Completed
03/15/1991APPELEE'S BRIEF AD PANEL SCDATE 000000 SCHPRD
09/11/1991CERTIFICATE PER RULE 28 RJG PANEL SCDATE 000000 SCHPRD
09/12/1991MEMORANDUM TRANSMITTING RULE 28(K) CITE OF APLE TO DIVISION. MEH PANELJAC SCDATE 000000 SCHPRD
09/27/1991FiledACTION - Argued / Submitted
09/27/1991ARGUED PANELFEWGPY SCDATE 000000 SCHPRD
09/30/1991AFFIRMED MOJ AF JUDGMENT ON APPEAL PANELFEWGPY SCDATE 000000 SCHPRD
09/30/1991DISP NO - 01 DISP - AF METH -MOJ JUDGE -PC CITE
10/22/1991MANDATE ISSUED PANEL SCDATE 000000 SCHPRD