judyrecords
search tips
630 million+
United States Court Cases

District Of Columbia Court Of Appeals Record

CAREY M. SANDERS V. UNITED STATES

Case Information: 88-CF-1270
Short Caption:CAREY M. SANDERS V. UNITED STATESClassification:Appeals - Criminal Felony - Other Felony
Superior Court or Agency Case Number:F8797-88Filed Date:10/13/1988

Opening Event Date:10/13/1988Case Status:Closed
Record Completed:Post-Decision Matter Pending:
Briefs Completed:
Argued/Submitted:
Disposition:Next Scheduled Action:
Mandate Issued:12/06/1988

Party Information
Appellate RoleParty NameIFPAttorney(s)Arguing AttorneyE-Filer
AppellantCarey M. Sanders N
Wendell C. RobinsonNY
AppelleeUnited StatesN
John R. Fisher NN

Events
Event DateStatusDescriptionResult
01/01/1901SANDERS, CAREY M. UNITED STATES
10/13/1988FiledOPENING EVENT - Opening Event
10/13/1988APPELLANT'S DOCKETING STATEMENT JB PANEL SCDATE 000000 SCHPRD
10/13/1988MISCELLANEOUS PROCEDURAL MOTION OF APPELLANT REQUESTING PRETRIAL RELEASE (TRANSCRIPT ATTACHED) JB PANEL SCDATE 000000 SCHPRD
10/20/1988APPELLEE'S MOTION FOR SUMMARY AFFIRMANCE APPELLEE'S RJG PANEL SCDATE 000000 SCHPRD
11/15/1988AFFIRMED JUDGMENT GRANTING MO FOR SUMM AFFIRMANCE & AFFIRMING THE ORD ON APPEAL. ACG PANELNWTE SCDATE 110188 SCHPRD VS
11/15/1988DISP NO - 01 DISP - AF METH -JDG JUDGE -PC CITE
12/06/1988MANDATE ISSUED PANEL SCDATE 000000 SCHPRD