judyrecords
search tips
630 million+
United States Court Cases

District Of Columbia Court Of Appeals Record

MILFORD E. WARE V. UNITED STATES

Case Information: 88-CF-1274
Short Caption:MILFORD E. WARE V. UNITED STATESClassification:Appeals - Criminal Felony - Drug Related
Superior Court or Agency Case Number:F4699-88Filed Date:10/11/1988

Opening Event Date:10/11/1988Case Status:Closed
Record Completed:03/27/1989Post-Decision Matter Pending:
Briefs Completed:02/12/1990
Argued/Submitted:05/15/1990
Disposition:Next Scheduled Action:
Mandate Issued:07/23/1990

Party Information
Appellate RoleParty NameIFPAttorney(s)Arguing AttorneyE-Filer
AppellantMilford E. Ware N
Betty J. Clark NN
AppellantJohn Doe N
Calvin Steinmetz NN
AppelleeUnited StatesN
John R. Fisher YN
Richard L. Chamovitz YN

Events
Event DateStatusDescriptionResult
01/01/1901WARE, MILFORD E. UNITED STATES
01/01/1903NOTE - 01 CODEF: JOYCE A. MANIS & NOTE - 01 PHILLIPA M. VACTOR NOTE - 02 IS APPT AS COUNSEL TO NOTE - 02 REPRESENT APLT & THAT NOTE - 03 SUBSTITUTE COUNSEL SHALL FILE NOTE - 03 A SUPP BRIEF W/I 30 DAYS FROM NOTE - 04 DTD OF THIS ORDER. NOTE - 04
01/01/1906 CLARKB VACATED 12-1-89
10/11/1988FiledOPENING EVENT - Opening Event
10/17/1988APPELLANT'S DOCKETING STATEMENT RJG PANEL SCDATE 000000 SCHPRD
10/21/1988APPOINTING COUNSEL/CO REFERRAL (CJA) BETTY J. CLARK, ESQ. PANEL SCDATE 000000 SCHPRD
11/29/1988ORDER APLT DSA DUE IN 10 DAYS - NFX. EBP PANELRO SCDATE 103188 SCHPRD DSA
12/23/1988ORDER APLT BR DUE 40 DAYS AFTER REC & RT HAVE BEEN FILED W/THIS CT EBP PANELRO SCDATE 000000 SCHPRD
03/27/1989FiledRecord Completed
03/27/1989RECORD ON APPEAL (110 PGS/TREMEL)(40 PGS/RUST) AD PANEL SCDATE 121288 SCHPRD R
03/29/1989ACTION SLIP MAILED AD PANEL SCDATE 000000 SCHPRD
05/09/1989APPELLANT'S MOTION TO EXTEND TIME TO FILE BRIEF TO 5/29/89 MLR PANEL SCDATE 050889 SCHPRD BA
05/16/1989ORDER GRANT APLT MO TO EXT TM TO FL BRF TO 5/29/89. MEH PANELDDW SCDATE 051289 SCHPRD M
06/02/1989COUNSEL'S MOTION TO WITHDRAW (ANDERS) OF BETTY J. CLARK MLR PANEL SCDATE 052989 SCHPRD BA
06/02/1989RECEIVED APPELLANT'S PRO SE BRIEF MLR PANEL SCDATE 000000 SCHPRD
06/12/1989LETTER ANDERS LTR TO APLT, RESPONSE DUE BY 7/12/89. DAS PANELRBH SCDATE 060789 SCHPRD X
12/01/1989APPOINTING COUNSEL/CO REFERRAL (CJA) CALVIN STEINMETZ, ESQ. PANEL SCDATE 000000 SCHPRD
12/01/1989ORDER ORD; BETTY J. CLARK MO TO W/D IS GRTNG & FO;CALVIN STEINMETZ (SEE NOTE FIELDS 2 THRU 4) JJ PANELNWTESC SCDATE 000000 SCHPRD
12/29/1989APPELLANT'S SUPPLEMENTAL BRIEF/MEMORANDUM AJ PANEL SCDATE 010290 SCHPRD SMA
01/12/1990ORDER DIRG CLK TO FILE APLT'S LODGED SMA; FO BE TO BE FILED W/IN 30 DAYS. FVH PANELRO SCDATE 000000 SCHPRD
02/12/1990FiledBriefing Completed
02/12/1990APPELEE'S BRIEF AD PANEL SCDATE 021290 SCHPRD BE
05/15/1990FiledACTION - Argued / Submitted
05/15/1990SUBMITTED PANELRGFERY SCDATE 000000 SCHPRD
06/29/1990AFFIRMED MOJ AFFIRMING JUDGEMENT ON APPEAL RJG PANELROFERY SCDATE 000000 SCHPRD
06/29/1990DISP NO - 01 DISP - AF METH -MOJ JUDGE -PC CITE
07/23/1990MANDATE ISSUED PANEL SCDATE 000000 SCHPRD