judyrecords
search tips
630 million+
United States Court Cases

District Of Columbia Court Of Appeals Record

CHRIS J. BUTLER V. UNITED STATES

Case Information: 88-CF-1257
Short Caption:CHRIS J. BUTLER V. UNITED STATESClassification:Appeals - Criminal Felony - Drug Related
Superior Court or Agency Case Number:F2230-88Filed Date:09/27/1988

Opening Event Date:09/27/1988Case Status:Closed
Record Completed:03/10/1989Post-Decision Matter Pending:
Briefs Completed:07/12/1991
Argued/Submitted:12/16/1991
Disposition:Next Scheduled Action:
Mandate Issued:01/09/1992

Party Information
Appellate RoleParty NameIFPAttorney(s)Arguing AttorneyE-Filer
AppellantChris J. Butler N
Reginald G. Addison YN
AppelleeUnited StatesN
John R. Fisher YN

Events
Event DateStatusDescriptionResult
01/01/1901BUTLER, CHRIS J. UNITED STATES
01/01/1903NOTE - 01 12/01/89 ORD: NAME OF RPTR; NOTE - 01 DATE ORDERED; EST DATE OF NOTE - 02 COMPLETION. NOTE - 02 NOTE - 03 1/8/91 ORD: HIS APPOINTMENT NOTE - 03 SHOULD NOT BE VACATED & NAME NOTE - 04 REMOVED FROM LIST OF ATTORNEYS NOTE - 04 AUTHORIZED TO RECEIVE APPTS. NOTE - 05 6/20/91 ORD: DENIED APLT'S MO NOTE - 05 TO EXT TO FILE BRF, F/O BRF OF NOTE - 06 APLT SHALL BE FILED W/IN 10 NOTE - 06 DAYS OR ADVISE THIS COURT OF NOTE - 07 ACTION TAKEN TO OBTAIN RT, NOTE - 07 FAILURE TO COMPLY MAY RESULT NOTE - 08 IN APPT BEING VACATED & NAME NOTE - 08 REMOVED FROM CJA LIST.
09/27/1988FiledOPENING EVENT - Opening Event
10/18/1988APPOINTING COUNSEL/CO REFERRAL (CJA) REGINALD G. ADDISON, ESQ. PANEL SCDATE 000000 SCHPRD
11/29/1988ORDER APLT DSA DUE IN 10 DAYS - NFX. EBP PANELRO SCDATE 102888 SCHPRD DSA
12/02/1988APPELLANT'S DOCKETING STATEMENT RJG PANEL SCDATE 120988 SCHPRD DSA
03/10/1989FiledRecord Completed
03/10/1989RECORD ON APPEAL RTC AD PANEL SCDATE 112888 SCHPRD R
04/14/1989SUPPLEMENTAL RECORD #1 (14 PAGES TRANSCRIPT- HAWKINS) MLR PANEL SCDATE 063089 SCHPRD RT
06/05/1989ORDER BRF OF APLT DUE IN 20 DAYS. DAS PANELRO SCDATE 052489 SCHPRD BA
09/08/1989ORDER DIRG THAT APLT'S BR BE FILED W/IN 20 DAYS OR APPEAL MAY STAND DISMISSED. FVH PANELRO SCDATE 000000 SCHPRD
10/10/1989APPELLANT'S MOTION TO EXTEND TIME TO FILE BRIEF UNTIL COMPLETE TRANSCRIPT IS FILED JB PANEL SCDATE 092889 SCHPRD BA
12/01/1989ORDER DIRG COUNSEL FOR APLT, W/IN 15 DAYS, TO FILE STMT RE TRANSC; (SEE NOTE FIELDS 1 - 2) FVH PANELRBH SCDATE 000000 SCHPRD
10/02/1990ORDER APLT BRF SHALL BE FILD W/IN 40 DAYS FROM THE DATE OF THIS ORD. NFX GR PANELFF SCDATE 080990 SCHPRD U
01/08/1991ORDER APLT'S COUNSEL TO FILE BRIEF W/IN 10 DAYS OR SHOW CAUSE WHY (SEE NOTES 3 & 4) JB PANELRO SCDATE 111690 SCHPRD U
01/23/1991APPELLANT'S MOTION TO EXTEND TIME TO FILE BRIEF TO 1/28/91 AJ PANEL SCDATE 011891 SCHPRD BA
02/08/1991ORDER APLT BRF TO BE FILED W/IN 10 DYS FRM DT OF THIS ORD. PANELRBH SCDATE 020691 SCHPRD GR
04/19/1991ORDER DIR. APLT TO FL BRF W/IN 10 DAYS OF CASE DISMISSED. AD PANELRO SCDATE 021891 SCHPRD BA
04/29/1991APPELLANT'S MOTION TO EXTEND TIME TO FILE BRIEF TO 20 DAYS PMB PANEL SCDATE 042991 SCHPRD BA
06/11/1991RECEIVED APPELLANT'S BRIEF (MXBA STILL PENDING) RJG PANEL SCDATE 000000 SCHPRD
06/20/1991ORDER (SEE NOTES 5 THRU 8) JB PANELRO SCDATE 053091 SCHPRD U
07/12/1991FiledBriefing Completed
07/12/1991APPELEE'S BRIEF AJ PANEL SCDATE 000000 SCHPRD
07/15/1991NOTICE OF APLT PMB PANEL SCDATE 000000 SCHPRD
08/02/1991APPELLANT'S BRIEF JB PANEL SCDATE 000000 SCHPRD
08/02/1991ORDER THIS CT'S 6/20/91 ORD VACATED, LODGED APLT BRF FLD, SCHD CASE BEFORE DIV AS CAL PERMIT JB PANELRO SCDATE 000000 SCHPRD
10/10/1991SUPPLEMENTAL RECORD #1 (24 PGS. -- FRANKLIN) (9/12/88 PROC.) PR PANEL SCDATE 000000 SCHPRD
12/16/1991FiledACTION - Argued / Submitted
12/16/1991SUBMITTED RJG PANELSCWABE SCDATE 000000 SCHPRD
12/18/1991AFFIRMED MOJ AFFIRMING JUDGEMENT ON APPEAL RJG PANEL SCDATE 000000 SCHPRD
12/18/1991DISP NO - 01 DISP - AF METH -MOJ JUDGE -PC CITE
01/09/1992MANDATE ISSUED PANEL SCDATE 000000 SCHPRD