judyrecords
search tips
630 million+
United States Court Cases

District Of Columbia Court Of Appeals Record

WOODRUFF, MARGUERITE MCCONKEY, C.K.

Case Information: 86-CV-0724
Short Caption:WOODRUFF, MARGUERITE MCCONKEY, C.K.Classification:Appeals - Civil - Other Civil
Lead:86-CV-0724Consolidated: 86-CV-0725
Superior Court or Agency Case Number:CA7016-85Filed Date:05/06/1986

Opening Event Date:05/06/1986Case Status:Closed
Record Completed:06/05/1986Post-Decision Matter Pending:
Briefs Completed:08/18/1986
Argued/Submitted:01/07/1987
Disposition:Next Scheduled Action:
Mandate Issued:

Party Information
Appellate RoleParty NameIFPAttorney(s)Arguing AttorneyE-Filer
AppellantJohn Doe N
Margaret A. Beller YN
AppelleeJohn Doe N
Jay S. Weiss YN

Events
Event DateStatusDescriptionResult
01/01/1901WOODRUFF, MARGUERITE MCCONKEY, C.K.
05/06/1986FiledOPENING EVENT - Opening Event
06/05/1986FiledRecord Completed
08/18/1986FiledBriefing Completed
01/07/1987FiledACTION - Argued / Submitted
04/21/1987FiledOUTCOME/DISPOSITION - Outcome-Disposition