judyrecords
search tips
630 million+
United States Court Cases

District Of Columbia Court Of Appeals Record

DONALD J. HATCH V. UNITED STATES

Case Information: 88-CF-1229
Short Caption:DONALD J. HATCH V. UNITED STATESClassification:Appeals - Criminal Felony - Other Felony
Lead:88-CF-1229Consolidated: 89-CO-0438 , 95-CO-0431
Superior Court or Agency Case Number:F12698-87Filed Date:09/20/1988

Opening Event Date:09/20/1988Case Status:Closed
Record Completed:02/22/1991Post-Decision Matter Pending:
Briefs Completed:08/19/1991
Argued/Submitted:
Disposition:Next Scheduled Action:
Mandate Issued:11/09/1995
Costs Waived

Party Information
Appellate RoleParty NameIFPAttorney(s)Arguing AttorneyE-Filer
AppellantDonald J. Hatch YPro SeN
AppelleeUnited StatesN
John R. Fisher NN

Events
Event DateStatusDescriptionResult
01/01/1901HATCH, DONALD J. UNITED STATES
01/01/1902SCRND/REG PRO SE--IF ANY SCHD BE FOR 30 DAYS IF BA FLD
01/01/1903NOTE - 01 FELONY: CPWL NOTE - 01 NOTE - 02 5/4/89 ORD: GRANT MO OF COUNSL NOTE - 02 FOR APLT TO W/D & VACATE APPMT NOTE - 03 OF WILLIAM M. WHELAN & APPT NOTE - 03 WILLIAM L. PETERS FOR APLT; NOTE - 04 NEWLY-APPTD COUNSEL TO FL A NOTE - 04 STATUS REPORT IN 10 DAYS ON NOTE - 05 THE 23-110 MO PENDING IN THE NOTE - 05 TRIAL COURT. NOTE - 06 5/12/89 ORD: SS, CONS 88-1229 NOTE - 06 & 89-438; WILLIAM L, PETERS NOTE - 07 APPTD FOR APLT IN 89-438; APLT NOTE - 07 TO FL DSA IN 89-438 IN 10 DAYS NOTE - 08 CON 89-438 NOTE - 08 NOTE - 09 7/16/90 ORD: VACATING APPT OF NOTE - 09 WILLIAM L. PETER, ESQ; APPTG NOTE - 10 WILLIAM T. MORRISON, ESQ. TO NOTE - 10 REPRESENT APLT HEREIN; BRIEF NOTE - 11 OF APPELLANT DUE W/IN 40 DAYS. NOTE - 11 NOTE - 12 4/17/91 ORD: BRF OF APLT DUE NOTE - 12 6/4/91; BRF OF APLE DUE 7/9/91 NOTE - 13 REPLY BRF DUE 7/29/91; SCHED NOTE - 13 ON SEPT. 1991 CAL; NFX. NOTE - 14 8/19/91 ORD: GRNTD APLT MO FOR NOTE - 14 LV TO FILE BRF, DENIED APLT NOTE - 15 MO FOR APPT OF NEW COUNSEL, NOTE - 15 GRNTD APLT MO TO AMEND THE MO NOTE - 16 FOR AN ORD REQUIRING RELEASE NOTE - 16 OF PHYSICAL EVIDENCE FOR TEST- NOTE - 17 ING, DENIED APLT AMENDED MO NOTE - 17 FOR AN ORDER REQUIRING RELEASE NOTE - 18 OF PHYSICAL EVIDENCE FOR TEST- NOTE - 18 ING, THE LODGED APLE BRF AND NOTE - 19 APLT REPLY BRF IS HEREBY FILED NOTE - 19 CLK SHALL SCHD THIS CASE FOR NOTE - 20 CONSIDERATION AS SOON AS THE NOTE - 20 CALENDAR PERMITS. NOTE - 21 3/4/92 ORD: MO OF COUNSEL TO NOTE - 21 W/DRAW AND THE REQUEST OF NOTE - 22 APLT PROSE FOR APPT OF NEW NOTE - 22 COUNSEL ARE DENIED. APLT PRO NOTE - 23 SE MAY FILE A SUPP. BRF W/IN NOTE - 23 30 DAYS. APLE MAY FL A SUPP NOTE - 24 BRF IN RESPONSE W/IN 30 DAYS NOTE - 24 OF SERVICE OF APLT PROSE BRF.
01/01/1906 WHELANW VACATED 5/4/89. PETERSW VACATED 7/16/90
09/20/1988NOTICE OF APPEAL in 88-CF-1229.
10/18/1988APPOINTING COUNSEL/CO REFERRAL (CJA) WILLIAM M. WHELAN, JR., ESQ. PANEL SCDATE 000000 SCHPRD
10/27/1988APPELLANT'S DOCKETING STATEMENT JB PANEL SCDATE 102888 SCHPRD DSA
02/09/1989ACTION SLIP MAILED AD PANEL SCDATE 000000 SCHPRD
02/09/1989RECORD ON APPEAL AD PANEL SCDATE 112188 SCHPRD R
02/16/1989APPELLANT'S MOTION FOR STAY APPEAL UNTIL TRIAL COURT RULES ON 23-110 MOTION RJG PANEL SCDATE 032189 SCHPRD BA
03/10/1989SUPPLEMENTAL RECORD #1(399 PGS/KACZOROWSKI) AD PANEL SCDATE 000000 SCHPRD
03/24/1989COUNSEL'S MOTION TO WITHDRAW FOR BUSINESS REASONS (WM. MICHAEL WHELAN JR.) GT PANEL SCDATE 040189 SCHPRD CHECK
05/04/1989APPOINTING COUNSEL/CO REFERRAL (CJA) WILLIAM L. PETERS, ESQ. PANEL SCDATE 000000 SCHPRD
05/04/1989ORDER SEE NOTE FIELDS 02-05. DAS PANELRO SCDATE 040789 SCHPRD GG
05/12/1989ORDER SEE NOTE FIELDS 07 & 07. DAS PANELRO SCDATE 051589 SCHPRD ANSA
05/15/1989STATEMENT OF APPELLANT'S COUNSEL RE: 23-110 MOTION IN TRIAL COURT RJG PANEL SCDATE 051589 SCHPRD ANSA
06/13/1989SUPPLEMENTAL RECORD #2 (343 PGS. -- VAN BREMEN) RJG PANEL SCDATE 112289 SCHPRD RT
06/29/1989SUPPLEMENTAL RECORD #2(79 PGS/HART)(21 PGS/ WATKINS) AD PANEL SCDATE 000000 SCHPRD
09/01/1989SUPPLEMENTAL RECORD ORDER -SHUKER-8/16/89 AD PANEL SCDATE 000000 SCHPRD
09/06/1989SUPPLEMENTAL RECORD #4 (5 PGS. -- MOLLICHELLI) RJG PANEL SCDATE 000000 SCHPRD
10/27/1989COURT REPORTER'S TRANSCRIPT (142 PGS/CALHOUN) AD PANEL SCDATE 000000 SCHPRD
12/12/1989SUPPLEMENTAL RECORD #7(12 PGS/JANIFER) AD PANEL SCDATE 000000 SCHPRD
03/29/1990RECORD ON APPEAL (73 AND 75 PGS/GRAYBILL) AD IN 89-438 PANEL SCDATE 120289 SCHPRD RT
04/12/1990LETTER FROM APLT (PRO-SE) REQUESTING TRANSCRIPT AJ PANEL SCDATE 000000 SCHPRD
05/01/1990MISCELLANEOUS PROCEDURAL MOTION APLT REQUEST FOR APPOINTMENT OF NEW COUNSEL AJ PANEL SCDATE 000000 SCHPRD
06/04/1990SUPPLEMENTAL RECORD #1 (87-PGS/SCHERTZER) AJ PANEL SCDATE 000000 SCHPRD
06/15/1990LETTER TO COUNSEL FOR APLT RE REQUEST FOR APPTMT OF NEW COUNSEL SL PANELDDW SCDATE 000000 SCHPRD
07/05/1990COUNSEL'S MOTION TO WITHDRAW FOR BUSINESS REASONS APLT AD PANEL SCDATE 070590 SCHPRD ANSA
07/16/1990APPOINTING COUNSEL/CO REFERRAL (CJA) WILLIAM T. MORRISON, ESQ. PANEL SCDATE 000000 SCHPRD
07/16/1990ORDER SEE NOTE FIELDS 09-11. CWC PANELRO SCDATE 070990 SCHPRD GG
07/31/1990APPELLANT'S MOTION TO EXTEND TIME TO FILE BRIEF TO 40 DAY AFTER 8-22-90 AD PANEL SCDATE 082790 SCHPRD BA
08/30/1990ORDER GRANTG APLT'S MO TO EXT TM TO FL BRF W/IN 30 DAYS; NFX. GW PANELRBH SCDATE 082990 SCHPRD V
09/24/1990APPELLANT'S MOTION TO EXTEND TIME TO FILE BRIEF UNTIL COMPLETION OF TRANSCRIPT AJ (30)DAYS AJ PANEL SCDATE 100190 SCHPRD BA
10/19/1990APPELLANT'S MOTION TO EXTEND TIME TO FILE BRIEF COMPLETION OF TRANSCRIPT AD PANEL SCDATE 000000 SCHPRD
01/16/1991RECEIVED LETTER OF APLT RE: CASE AJ PANEL SCDATE 000000 SCHPRD
01/25/1991ORDER GRANT APLT MOTIONS TO EXTEND, APLT'S BRIEF DUE W/IN 40 DAYS AFTER RT FILED JB PANELRBH SCDATE 110990 SCHPRD U
02/22/1991SUPPLEMENTAL RECORD #6 (81 PGS. -- QUINONES) RJG PANEL SCDATE 031791 SCHPRD RT
02/22/1991RECORD COMPLETED (both appeals).
04/17/1991ORDER SEE NOTE FIELDS 12 THRU 13. JJ PANELRBH SCDATE 030891 SCHPRD GR
04/22/1991MISCELLANEOUS PROCEDURAL MOTION APLT REQUEST FOR APT. OF NEW COUNSEL PMB PANEL SCDATE 000000 SCHPRD
06/05/1991APPELLANT'S MOTION FOR LEAVE TO FILE BRIEF AJ PANEL SCDATE 060491 SCHPRD BA
06/05/1991RECEIVED APLT'S BRIEF AJ PANEL SCDATE 000000 SCHPRD
06/07/1991MISCELLANEOUS SUBSTANTIVE MOTION OF APLT FOR ORD REQ. GOVT. TO RELEASE EVIDENCE FOR INSPEC. ETC. (SEE MOTION) RJG PANEL SCDATE 000000 SCHPRD
06/19/1991APPELLEE'S OPPOSITION TO MOTION FOR ORD REQ. GOV'T TO RELEASE EVIDENCE FOR DNA TESTING, ETC. RJG PANEL SCDATE 000000 SCHPRD
07/09/1991RECEIVED APLE'S BRIEF AJ PANEL SCDATE 000000 SCHPRD
07/17/1991RECEIVED APPELLANT'S REPLY BRIEF RJG PANEL SCDATE 000000 SCHPRD
07/25/1991MISCELLANEOUS PROCEDURAL MOTION OF APLT TO AMEND GOV'T TO RELEASE EVIDENCE FOR THE DNA ETC.... AJ PANEL SCDATE 000000 SCHPRD
08/07/1991APPELLEE'S OPPOSITION TO APLT MOTION FOR AN ORDER REQUIRING APLE TO RELEASE EVIDENCE PMB PANEL SCDATE 000000 SCHPRD
08/19/1991APPELLANT'S BRIEF JB PANEL SCDATE 000000 SCHPRD
08/19/1991APPELEE'S BRIEF JB PANEL SCDATE 000000 SCHPRD
08/19/1991MISCELLANEOUS PROCEDURAL MOTION OF APLT REQUEST FOR APPOINTMENT OF COUNSEL AJ PANEL SCDATE 000000 SCHPRD
08/19/1991ORDER (SEE NOTES 14 THRU 20) JB PANELTESTPR SCDATE 072691 SCHPRD VS
08/19/1991APPELLANT'S REPLY BRIEF JB PANEL SCDATE 000000 SCHPRD
08/19/1991BRIEFS COMPLETED (both appeals).
10/07/1991RECEIVED LTR FROM APLT REQUESTING ADEQUATE REPRESENTATION PMB PANEL SCDATE 000000 SCHPRD
10/08/1991RECEIVED REQUEST FOR STAY OF THE APP. PMB PANEL SCDATE 000000 SCHPRD
10/08/1991RECEIVED LTR FROM APLT REQUESTING ADEQUATE REPRESENTATION PMB PANEL SCDATE 000000 SCHPRD
10/30/1991LETTER TO COUNSEL REFERRING MO FROM APLT. COUNSEL TO RESPOND IN 10 AD PANELJAC SCDATE 102291 SCHPRD K
11/13/1991LETTER FROM APPELLANT'S COUNSEL IN RESPONSE TO COURT'S 10/30/91 LETTER RJG PANEL SCDATE 111191 SCHPRD ANSA
01/13/1992COUNSEL'S MOTION TO WITHDRAW FOR BUSINESS REASONS APPELLANT'S RJG PANEL SCDATE 000000 SCHPRD
01/17/1992MISCELLANEOUS PROCEDURAL MOTION OF APPELLANT FOR LEAVE TO FILE CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE RJG PANEL SCDATE 000000 SCHPRD
02/21/1992RECEIVED PRO SE RESPONSE TO APLT'S COUNSEL'S MOTION TO WITHDRAW RJG PANEL SCDATE 000000 SCHPRD
03/04/1992ORDER SEE NOTE FIELDS 21-24. AC PANELSTMABE SCDATE 000000 SCHPRD
04/02/1992LETTER forwarding correspondence received from appellant to his attorney. (JAC)
05/07/1992ordered sua sponte that the above-captioned appealis hereby removed from the regular calendar of Wednesday, June 3, 1992.
05/22/1992ORDER The motion for an extension of time within which to file a supplemental brief is granted to the extent that if the appellant's motion for additional transcript is granted by the trial court, the supplemental brief shalll be filed within 30 days after the transcript has been filed in this ct; if themotion for additional RT is denied by trial courtthe supplemental brief shall be filed within 30 days after the trial court's denial of appellant's motion for transcript. Further ordered that the Clerk, shall, upon resolution by the trial court of the appellant's motion for additional transcript, advise this court whether the motion for transcript was granted or denied. It is further ordered that the motion for appointment of counsel for argument and the motion for leave to argue pro se shall be referred to a merits division upon the calendaring of this appeal.
05/27/1992SUPPLEMENTAL RECORD #8 (139-pgs/simms 8/17/88)
06/29/1992Received
07/07/1992Received
09/10/1992LETTER to Fred Beane, Clerk of Superior Court, requesting that he treat the copy of the motion to produce transcript received in this court as the original copy to be filed in Superior Court. Copy of motion was not received there. Trial court to certify copy of decision on motion to this court when rendered. (JAC)
09/15/1992RECEIVED appellant's, pro se, request for appointment of new counsel.
09/17/1992TMC Request for appointment of new counsel
09/18/1992VOTE SHEET request for appt. of new counsel
09/21/1992LETTER from Fred Beane in response to this court's letter of 9/10/92.
10/13/1992Order Denying
11/12/1992Supplemental Record specify
11/27/1992ORDER that appellant's supplemental brief shall be filed within 30 days from the date of this order and appellee may file a supplemental brief within 30 days thereafter. (ROSUPY)
12/21/1992APLT MOTION TO EXT TIME TO FILE SUPLEMENTAL BRIEF for 30 days after filing of readable copies of the aforementioned transcripts &/ or to reserve the right to amend the brief.
12/23/1992RECEIVED from aplt addendum to motion for an extention of time within which to file aplt's supplemental appeal brief and or reserve the right to amend the brief
01/08/1993SECOND ADDENDUM OF THE APPELLANT TO: MOTION FOR AN EXTENSTION OF TIME WITHIN WHICH TO FILE APPELLANTS SUPPLEMENTAL APPEAL BRIEF AND/OR TO RESERVE THE RIGHT TO AMEND THE BRIEF.
03/04/1993VOTE SHEET - Motion for an extension of time within which to file appellant's supplemental appeal brief - Addendum to motion - Second addendum
03/04/1993VOTE SHEET
04/01/1993READY TO BE CALENDARED
04/23/1993ORDER that the Clerk shall send appellant pro se a copy of the transcript of proceedings of August 18 and 19, 1988, and a copy of pages 8-37 of the transcript of proceedings of August 22, 1988. (by: STMKBE)
04/23/1993ORD GRANT APLT MO TO EXT TIME TO FILE SUPPL BRIEF and appellant's supplemental (pro se) brief shall be filed within 45 days from the date of this order. (by: STMKBE)
06/07/1993APPELLANT'S MISCELLANEOUS PROCEDURAL MOTION for an order requiring the government and it's agents to release physical evidence for the purpose of inspection to determine the feasibility of performing dna testing, & if dna testing is possible, performance of such testing; an order appointing defense experts for this purpose & for leave to supplement the appellants appellant record.
06/23/1993APPELLANT'S MOTION FOR STAY pending motion to vacate conviction in superior court
07/02/1993APLE MOTION TO EXTEND TIME TO FILE ANSWER/RESPONSEto July 9, 1993 (no oppo)
07/09/1993RECEIVED - aple's response to aplt's motion to stay appeal
07/23/1993RECEIVED - copy of aplt's affidavit filed in Superior Court
07/30/1993ORDER GRANTING APPELLANT MOTION FOR STAY and this appeal is hereby stayed
07/30/1993ORD GRT APLE MO TO EXT TM TO FILE ANSWER/RESPONSE and the lodged response is hereby filed. F/O counsel for appellant shall advise this court within 30 days from the date of this order as to the status of the pending motion filed in the trial court pursuant to D.C Code 23-110. (BY RO)
10/05/1993ORDER - ORDERED that counsel for appellant shall advise this court within 15 days from the date of this order as to the status of the pending motion filed in the trial court pursuant to D.C. Code 23-110, or the stay entered in this appeal in this court's order of July 30, 1993, shall be vacated. (By WHN)
10/18/1993LETTER in re to the 23-110 motion filed in superior court. (motion)
12/29/1993LETTER from appellant (pro se) re: appointment of new counsel
01/10/1994ORDER GRANTING APPELLANT MOTION FOR STAY and this appeal is hereby stayed pending further order of this court. If the motion in the trial court is denied, review of that denial may be sought only by filing a separate notice of appeal, after which the two appeals will be consolidated. See Hall v U.S., 559 A. 2d 1321, 1322 (D.C. 1989. F/O that counsel for appellant shall advise this court within 30 days from the date of this order as to the status of the proceedings in the trial court (by: Rogers)
03/15/1994RECEIVED courtesy copy of appellant pro-se letter he sent to his appointed attorney, Mr. William T. Morrison.
03/17/1994ORDER - ORDERED that counsel for appellant shall advise this court, within 15 days from the date of this order, as to the status of the pending motion filed in the trial court pursuant to D.C. Code 23-110. If the motion in the trial court is denied, review of that denial may be sought only by fili9ng a separate notice of that denial may be sought only by filing a separate notice of appeal, after which the two appeals will be consolidated. See Hall v. United States, 559 A.2d 1321, 1322 (D.C. 1989). (By WHN)
04/19/1994LETTER from appellant in response to the March 17, 1994 order of the court to advise the court as to the status of the pending 23-110 motion.
08/11/1994ORDER: Counsel for appellant shall advise this court within 30 days from the date of this order as to the status of the pending motion filed in the trial court pursuant to D.C. Code 23-110. If the motin in the trial court is denied, review of that denial may be sought only by filing a separate notice of appeal, after which the two appeals will be consolidated. See Hall v. US, 559 A.2d 1321, 1322 (D.C. 1989). (BY WHN)
10/20/1994ORDER: Counsel for appellant shall advise this co urt within 15 days from the date of this order as to the status of the pending motion filed in the trial court pursuant to D.C. Code 23-110. If the motion in the trial court is denied, review of that denial may be sought only by filing a separate notice of appeal, after which the two appeals will be consolidated. See Hall v. US, 559 A.2d 1321, 1322 (D.C. 1989) (BY WHN)
10/28/1994SUPPLEMENTAL RECORD #11 (32-pgs/kacorwski 8/24/88 proc.)
11/01/1994COUNSEL'S MOTION TO WITHDRAW FOR BUSINESS REASONS Granted
11/01/1994APPELLANT'S ANSWER/RESPONSE -to Oct. 20, 1994 order
11/04/1994SUPPLEMENTAL RECORD#12 (30-pgs/artis 6/6/88 proc.)
11/04/1994TMC - Counsel for the aplt, motion to withdraw 11/1 - Aplt's response to DCCA's order 10/20/94
01/09/1995ORD GRT COUNSEL MO TO WITHDRAW FOR BUSINESS REASONS. F/O that no new counsel for appellant will be appointed in these appeals or in any appeal arising from the denial of the motion pending in the trial court and appellant shall proceed on appeal prose. F/O that the stay issued by this court on January 10, 1994, shall remain in effect. F/O that appellee shall advise this court, within 30 days from the date of this order, as to the status of the pending motion for a new trial filed in the trial court. F/O that if the motion for a new trial is denied, and appellant wishes to preserve his rights, review of that denial may be sought only by filing a separate notice of appeal, after which the two appeals will be consolidated. See Hall v. US. (By: TE, ST, MK)
01/18/1995STMT/STATUS REPORT RE PENDING TRIAL COURT MOTION
03/01/1995ORDER: Appellee shall advise this court, within 30 days from the date of this order, as to the status of the pending motion for a new trial. If the motion is denied, review of that denial may be sought only by filing a separate notice of appeal, after which the two appeals will be consolidated. See Hall v. US. (By: WHN)
04/11/1995APPELLANT'S MISCELLANEOUS PROCEDURAL MOTION for a temporary restraining order and/or preliminary injunction.
04/18/1995TMC - MAMP 4/11 (Aplt's motion for temp. restraining order and/or preliminary injunction
05/10/1995PROCEED WITH APPEAL, NO LONGER ON HOLD/STAYED
05/10/1995ORDER DENYING APLT MISCELLANEOUS PROCEDURAL MOTION in appeals nos. 88-CF-1229 and 89-CO-438 for injunctive relief is denied. F/O, sua sponte, that the stay entered by this court on January 4, 1994, in appeals nos. 88-CF-1229 and 89-CO-438 is hereby vacated. F/O, sua sponte, that appeal no 95-CO-431 is consolidated with appeals nos. 88-CF-1229 and 89-CO-438 for all purposes herein. F/O that the Clerk of the Superior Court shall prepare and transmit the record on appeal in appeal no. 95-CO-431, to this court forthwith. F/O that appellant in appeal no. 95-CO-431 shall, within 15 days from the date of this order, file the docketing statement. (BY KG, PR, MK)
05/17/1995RECORD ON APPEAL
05/30/1995APPELLANT'S MOTION FOR STAY in 88-CF-1229
06/13/1995LETTER from pro se appellant stating that he did not recvd a copy of the MWBIZ filed by atty William T. Morrison and that he would like a copy of that motion, also appellant request that a copy of the record on appeal be sent to him.
06/14/1995TMC - Ltr from appellant dated 6/12/95
09/05/1995RECEIVED - ADS (will need MALDS)
09/06/1995NOTICE SENT to pro se aplt for MALDS
09/22/1995APPELLANT'S MOTION FOR LEAVE TO FILE DS
09/22/1995RECEIVED - ADS (unsigned)
10/18/1995ORDER that appeals nos. 88-CF-1229, 89-CO-438, and 95-CO-431 are hereby remanded to the trial court for the reentry of the March 3, 1995, order granting, in part, the relief requested by appellant. See Smith v. Pollin, 194 F.2d 349 (D.C. Cir. 1952). Appellant may note a new appeal from the reentry of the order upon remand, including any previously raised issues unresolved by the remand. F/O that all remaining motion are denied as moot. (by: FERDNM)
10/18/1995REMANDED
11/09/1995MANDATE ISSUED
11/09/1995MISCELLANEOUS - petition for reconsideration of previous order
11/14/1995TMC - Petition for reconsideration
12/08/1995RECEIVED letter from appellant, in reference to this case.
12/19/1995ORDER DENY APPELLANT MOTION FOR RECONSIDERATION of this court's October 18, 1995, order. (by: FERDNM)
12/19/1995ORDER that appellant's letter shall be construed as a noticeo of appeal from the October 26, 1995, order, and docketed as appeal no. 95-CF-1735. This appeal shall include all issues, both direct and collateral, arising from the non-vacated convictions. (by: FERDNM)
01/17/1996LETTER filed by appellant, in reference to this case.
01/19/1996APPELLANT'S PETITION FOR REHEARING EN BANC
01/22/1996TMC - Aplt's petition for rehearing en banc (motion to reconsider)
02/05/1996ORDER DENY APPELLANT MOTION FOR RECONSIDERATION (by: FERDGA)
12/23/1996LETTER - from aplt (Hatch) re: motion filed by attorney
05/28/1997LETTER to appellant forwarding a copy of the motion filed by former counsel, William Morrison, on 11/1/94 to withdraw. (JAC)
11/12/1997APPELLANT'S REPLY - to unoppsed motion to withdraw as appellate counsel
04/28/1998error
08/12/1999MOTION TO RECALL THE MANDATE